Rodriguez et al v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anibal Rodriguez, JulieAnna Muniz, Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Julian Santiago, Harold Nyanjom, Susan Lynn Harvey and Kellie Nyanjom
Defendant: Google LLC and Alphabet Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04688
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
2 Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 348 EXHIBITS re #341 Declaration in Support,,, Kevin Lam filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 347 EXHIBITS re #341 Declaration in Support,,, Kevin Lam filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ERRATA re #339 Opposition/Response to Motion, Notice of Errata for [Proposed Order] Granting Google LLC's Motion to Seal Portions of Class Certification & Daubert Briefing (Dkts. 314 & 321) (Civil Local Rule 79-5) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Google LLCs Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Google LLC. (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/18/2023)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 344 EXHIBITS Exhibit 05 (Daubert) (Hochman Transcript) [Redacted]. This is the corrected version of the document incorrectly filed at 341-9 filed byGoogle LLC. (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/18/2023)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 343 REPLY (re #314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Plaintiffs' Response to Google's Statement in Support of Motion to Seal [Dkt. 339] filed bySal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Mao, Mark) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 5, 2023, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #336 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2024. (Related documents(s) #336 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2023) Modified on 10/18/2023 (knm, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Declaration of Kevin Lam in Support of #339 Opposition/Response to Motion, Google LLC's Statement in Support of Motion to Seal Portions of Class Certification & Dauber Briefing (Dkts. 314 & 321) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 65, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 21, #17 Exhibit 70, #18 Motion for Class Certification, #19 Trial Plan, #20 Reply ISO Motion for Class Certification, #21 Opposition to Google's Motion to Exclude Opinion of Lasinski)(Related document(s) #339 ) (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Declaration of David Monsees in Support of #339 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Google LLC's Statement in Support of Motion to Seal Portions of Class Certification & Daubert Briefing (Dkts. 314 & 321) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Class Certification, #2 Exhibit 2 to Class Certification, #3 Exhibit 5 to Class Certification, #4 Exhibit 7 to Class Certification, #5 Exhibit 11 to Class Certification, #6 Exhibit 17 to Class Certification, #7 Exhibit 42 to Class Certification, #8 Exhibit 43 to Class Certification, #9 Exhibit 54 to Class Certification, #10 Exhibit 55 to Class Certification, #11 Exhibit 56 to Class Certification, #12 Exhibit 57 to Class Certification, #13 Exhibit 59 to Class Certification, #14 Exhibit 61 to Class Certification, #15 Exhibit 68 to Class Certification, #16 Exhibit 69 to Class Certification, #17 Exhibit 13 to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #18 Exhibit 71 to Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply, #19 Exhibit 9 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Motion to Exclude Lasinski Opinion)(Related document(s) #339 ) (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 339 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) (Google LLC's Statement in Support of Motion to Seal Portions of Class Certification & Daubert Briefing (Dkts. 314 & #321 ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix in Support of Google, LLC's Statement in Support of Motion to Seal Portions of Class Certification & Daubert Briefing (Dkts. 314 & 321), #2 Proposed Order)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Connection with Class Certification and Daubert Briefing filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of McGee, #2 Exhibit 6 (redacted), #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 20 (redacted), #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/05/2023 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 336 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/05/2023 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2023 re #330 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert Micheal J. Lasinksi, #326 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert Micheal J. Lasinksi #315 MOTION to Certify Class #326 . Motions taken under submission. Court to issue an order. Total Time in Court: 1 hour and 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Mao, James Lee, Logan Wright, Ryan Sila, John Yanchunis. Defendant Attorney: Benedict Hur, Simona Agnolucci, Eduardo Santacana, Noorjahan Rahman, Argemira Florez, Harris Mateen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2023)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 334 CLERK'S NOTICE: Motion Hearing re: #315, #326, #330 will be held in person on October 5, 2023 at 1:30 pm before Judge Seeborg in Courtroom #3, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2023)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 333 REPLY (re #315 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed bySal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Exhibits to Mao Declaration 70-73 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 74 to Mao Declaration, #4 Exhibit 75 to Mao Declaration, #5 Exhibit 76 to Mao Declaration, #6 Exhibit 77 to Mao Declaration, #7 Exhibits to Mao Declaration 78-80 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 81 to Mao Declaration)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 9/21/2023)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 332 REPLY (re #330 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert Micheal J. Lasinksi re #326 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert Micheal J. Lasinksi (Redacted), #326 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert Micheal J. Lasinksi ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 331 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #326 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert Micheal J. Lasinksi ) (Redacted) filed bySal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Exhibit 1 - Under seal, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3-10 - Under seal, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12-13 - Under seal, #7 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 9/7/2023)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert Micheal J. Lasinksi re #326 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert Micheal J. Lasinksi (Redacted) filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 9/8/2023. Replies due by 9/15/2023. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 9/5/2023)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 329 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #315 MOTION to Certify Class ) (Redacted) #323 Google LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byGoogle LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ***CORRECTION OF DOCKET #326 -1*** Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana In Support Of Google LLC's Motion To Exclude Opinion Of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert Michael J. Lasinski filed by Google LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ***CORRECTION OF DOCKET #324 *** DECLARATION of Eduardo E. Santacana In Support Of Google LLC's Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification And Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed by Google LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert Micheal J. Lasinksi filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 9/8/2023. Replies due by 9/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of Google LLC's Motion to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiffs' Damages Expert Michael J. Lasinski, #2 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 2 - Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 3 - Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 4 - Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 5 - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 6 - Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 7 - Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 8 - Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 9 - Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 10 - Under Seal)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 8/25/2023)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Request for Judicial Notice re #324 Declaration in Opposition filed by Google LLC. (Related document(s) #324 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 8/25/2023)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 324 DECLARATION of Eduardo E. Santacana in Opposition to #323 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Under seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Under seal, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 - Under seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Under seal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Under seal, #8 Exhibit 8 - Under seal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Under seal, #10 Exhibit 10 - Under seal, #11 Exhibit 11 - Under seal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Under seal, #13 Exhibit 13 - Under seal, #14 Exhibit 14 - Under seal, #15 Exhibit 15 - Under seal, #16 Exhibit 16 - Under seal, #17 Exhibit 17 - Under seal, #18 Exhibit 18 - Under seal, #19 Exhibit 19 - Under seal, #20 Exhibit 20 - Under seal, #21 Exhibit 21 - Under seal, #22 Exhibit 22 - Under seal, #23 Exhibit 23 - Under seal)(Related document(s) #323 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 8/24/2023)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 323 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #315 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 8/24/2023)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE by Anibal Rodriguez of Withdrawal of Attorney Alexander Justin Konik (Reblitz-Richardson, Beko) (Filed on 8/23/2023)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #320 STIPULATION REQUEST FOR OMNIBUS MOTION TO SEAL CLASS CERTIFICATION. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2023)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 320 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Joint Stipulation re Omnibus Motion to File Under Seal, with Proposed Order) filed by Google LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 8/10/2023)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #318 STIPULATION REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2023)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 318 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal (Dkt. 314) filed by Google LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 8/2/2023)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #316 STIPULATION REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 316 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Sal Cataldo, JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/24/2023. Replies due by 9/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Trial Plan - Redacted, #2 Declaration of Amanda Bonn, #3 Declaration of James Lee, #4 Declaration of John Yanchunis, #5 Declaration of Sal Cataldo, #6 Declaration of Susan Harvey, #7 Declaration of Anibal Rodriguez, #8 Declaration of Julian Santiago, #9 Keegan Report, #10 Hochman Report Redacted, #11 Schneier Report Redacted, #12 Lasinski Report Redacted, #13 Azari Report Redacted, #14 Declaration of Mark Mao, #15 Exhibit 1 to Mao Decl Redacted, #16 Exhibit 2 to Mao Decl Redacted, #17 Exhibit 3 to Mao Decl, #18 Exhibit 4 to Mao Decl Redacted, #19 Exhibit 5 to Mao Decl Redacted, #20 Exhibit 6 to Mao Decl Redacted, #21 Exhibit 7 to Mao Decl Redacted, #22 Exhibit 8 to Mao Decl Redacted, #23 Exhibit 9 to Mao Decl Redacted, #24 Exhibit 10 to Mao Decl Redacted, #25 Exhibit 11 to Mao Decl Redacted, #26 Exhibit 12 to Mao Decl, #27 Exhibit 13 to Mao Decl Redacted, #28 Exhibit 14 to Mao Decl Redacted, #29 Exhibit 15 to Mao Decl Redacted, #30 Exhibit 16 to Mao Decl Redacted, #31 Exhibit 17 to Mao Decl Redacted, #32 Exhibit 18 to Mao Decl, #33 Exhibit 19 to Mao Decl Redacted, #34 Exhibit 20 to Mao Decl Redacted, #35 Exhibit 21 to Mao Decl, #36 Exhibit 22 to Mao Decl, #37 Exhibit 23 to Mao Decl, #38 Exhibit 24 to Mao Decl, #39 Exhibit 25 to Mao Decl, #40 Exhibit 26 to Mao Decl, #41 Exhibit 27 to Mao Decl, #42 Exhibit 28 to Mao Decl, #43 Exhibit 29 to Mao Decl, #44 Exhibit 30 to Mao Decl, #45 Exhibit 31 to Mao Decl, #46 Exhibit 32 to Mao Decl, #47 Exhibit 33 to Mao Decl, #48 Exhibit 34 to Mao Decl, #49 Exhibit 35 to Mao Decl, #50 Exhibit 36 to Mao Decl, #51 Exhibit 37 to Mao Decl, #52 Exhibit 38 to Mao Decl, #53 Exhibit 39 to Mao Decl, #54 Exhibit 40 to Mao Decl, #55 Exhibit 41 to Mao Decl, #56 Exhibit 42 to Mao Decl Redacted, #57 Exhibit 43 to Mao Decl Redacted, #58 Exhibit 44 to Mao Decl, #59 Exhibit 45 to Mao Decl, #60 Exhibit 46 to Mao Decl, #61 Exhibit 47 to Mao Decl, #62 Exhibit 48 to Mao Decl, #63 Exhibit 49 to Mao Decl Redacted, #64 Exhibit 50 to Mao Decl Redacted, #65 Exhibit 51 to Mao Decl Redacted, #66 Exhibit 52 to Mao Decl, #67 Exhibit 53 to Mao Decl, #68 Exhibit 54 to Mao Decl Redacted, #69 Exhibit 55 to Mao Decl Redacted, #70 Exhibit 56 to Mao Decl Redacted, #71 Exhibit 57 to Mao Decl Redacted, #72 Exhibit 58 to Mao Decl Redacted, #73 Exhibit 59 to Mao Decl Redacted, #74 Exhibit 60 to Mao Decl Redacted, #75 Exhibit 61 to Mao Decl Redacted, #76 Exhibit 62 to Mao Decl Redacted, #77 Exhibit 63 to Mao Decl Redacted, #78 Exhibit 64 to Mao Decl, #79 Exhibit 65 to Mao Decl Redacted, #80 Exhibit 66 to Mao Decl Redacted, #81 Exhibit 67 to Mao Decl Redacted, #82 Exhibit 68 to Mao Decl Redacted, #83 Exhibit 69 to Mao Decl Redacted, #84 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of McGee, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Class Certification brief, #4 Trial Plan, #5 Hochman Report, #6 Schneier Report, #7 Lasinski Report, #8 Azari Report, #9 Exhibit 1, #10 Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 42, #27 Exhibit 43, #28 Exhibit 49, #29 Exhibit 50, #30 Exhibit 51, #31 Exhibit 54, #32 Exhibit 55, #33 Exhibit 56, #34 Exhibit 57, #35 Exhibit 58, #36 Exhibit 59, #37 Exhibit 60, #38 Exhibit 61, #39 Exhibit 62, #40 Exhibit 63, #41 Exhibit 65, #42 Exhibit 66, #43 Exhibit 67, #44 Exhibit 68, #45 Exhibit 69)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by Noorjahan Rahman obo Defendant Google LLC (Rahman, Noorjahan) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE by Anibal Rodriguez of Withdrawal of Attorney Erika Nyborg-Burch (Mao, Mark) (Filed on 6/2/2023)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #310 RELIEF FROM CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2023)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 310 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Relief from Case Management Schedule filed by Google LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Wright for Plaintiffs (Wright, Logan) (Filed on 4/28/2023)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Declaration of Mark Mao in Support of #307 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3) (Related document(s) #307 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 4/14/2023) Modified on 4/17/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL INFORMATION IN PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lori C Arakaki (Arakaki, Lori) (Filed on 2/24/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Fourth) byGoogle LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse resolving #263 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse resolving #261 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse resolving #264 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #300 JOINT STIPULATION MOOTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF (DKT. 279) AND MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 300 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #279 MOTION Relief from Case JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER MOOTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF (DKT. 279) AND MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re #278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #246 Order on Stipulation filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/12/2023) Modified on 1/13/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse resolving #266 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse resolving #262 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 297 REDACTION to #283 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5- GOOG-RDGZ-00015004 (redacted), #2 Exhibit 6 - GOOG-RDGZ-00020680 (redacted), #3 Exhibit 7 - GOOG-RDGZ-00130381 (redacted), #4 Exhibit 8 - GOOG-RDGZ-00130416 (redacted), #5 Exhibit 9 - GOOG-RDGZ-00014556 (redacted), #6 Exhibit 11- GOOG-RDGZ-00024709 (redacted), #7 Exhibit 13- GOOG-RDGZ-00130322 (redacted), #8 Exhibit 14- GOOG-RDGZ-00089546 (redacted), #9 Exhibit 15- GOOG-RDGZ-00116371 (redacted), #10 Exhibit 16- GOOG-RDGZ-00039094 (redacted), #11 Exhibit 17- GOOG-RDGZ-00171164 (redacted), #12 Exhibit 18- GOOG-RDGZ-00087964 (redacted), #13 Exhibit 19- GOOG-RDGZ-00044478 (redacted), #14 Exhibit 20- GOOG-RDGZ-00129096 (redacted), #15 Exhibit 21- GOOG-RDGZ-00090236 (redacted), #16 Exhibit 22- GOOG-RDGZ-00046896 (redacted), #17 Exhibit 23- GOOG-RDGZ-00020692 (redacted), #18 Exhibit 26- GOOG-RDGZ-00144760 (redacted), #19 Exhibit 27- GOOG-RDGZ-00059486 (redacted), #20 Exhibit 28- GOOG-RDGZ-00046758.R (redacted), #21 Exhibit 29- GOOG-RDGZ-00185669 (redacted), #22 Exhibit 30- GOOG-RDGZ-00061316 (redacted), #23 Exhibit 31- GOOG-RDGZ-00031656 (redacted), #24 Exhibit 33- GOOG-RDGZ-00149701 (redacted))(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 296 REDACTION to #283 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions by Google LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ***FILED IN ERROR ** SEE DKT. #297 OCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #283 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - GOOG-RDGZ-00015004 (redacted), #2 Exhibit 6 - GOOG-RDGZ-00020680 (redacted), #3 Exhibit 7 - GOOG-RDGZ-00130381 (redacted), #4 Exhibit 8 - GOOG-RDGZ-00130416 (redacted), #5 Exhibit 9 - GOOG-RDGZ-00014556 (redacted), #6 Exhibit 11 - GOOG-RDGZ-00024709 (redacted), #7 Exhibit 13 - GOOG-RDGZ-00130322 (redacted), #8 Exhibit 14 - GOOG-RDGZ-00089546 (redacted), #9 Exhibit 15 - GOOG-RDGZ-00116371 (redacted), #10 Exhibit 16 - GOOG-RDGZ-00039094 (redacted), #11 Exhibit 17 - GOOG-RDGZ-00171164 (redacted), #12 Exhibit 18 - GOOG-RDGZ-00087964 (redacted), #13 Exhibit 19 - GOOG-RDGZ-00044478 (redacted), #14 Exhibit 20 - GOOG-RDGZ-00129096 (redacted), #15 Exhibit 21 - GOOG-RDGZ-00090236 (redacted), #16 Exhibit 22 - GOOG-RDGZ-00046896 (redacted), #17 Exhibit 23 - GOOG-RDGZ-00020692 (redacted), #18 Exhibit 24 - GOOG-RDGZ-00151992 (redacted), #19 Exhibit 26 - GOOG-RDGZ-00144760 (redacted), #20 Exhibit 27 - GOOG-RDGZ-00059486 (redacted), #21 Exhibit 28 - GOOG-RDGZ-00046758.R (redacted), #22 Exhibit 29 - GOOG-RDGZ-00185669 (redacted), #23 Exhibit 30 - GOOG-RDGZ-00061316 (redacted), #24 Exhibit 31 - GOOG-RDGZ-00031656 (redacted), #25 Exhibit 33 - GOOG-RDGZ-00149701 (redacted))(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 1/6/2023) Modified on 1/9/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ** FILED IN ERROR ** SEE DKT. #296 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #283 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions by Google LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 1/6/2023) Modified on 1/9/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Response re #273 Reply to Opposition/Response, byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34 - Google's Suppl Response to ROG Nos. 12, 15 (redacted), #2 Exhibit 35 - GOOG-RDGZ-00203545 (redacted), #3 Exhibit 36 - GOOG-RDGZ-00060716 (redacted), #4 Exhibit 37 - Google's 4th Suppl Response to ROG-1 (redacted), #5 Exhibit 38 - E. Miraglia Depo Xscript 10-25-2022 (redacted), #6 Exhibit 39 - GOOG-RDGZ-00203679)(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Statement re #278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Statement In Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Information in Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule (Dkt. No. 278) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Steve Ganem, #2 Proposed Order)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse resolving #250 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #288 STIPULATION EXTENDING DISCOVERY, CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND HEARING DATE. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset as to #279 MOTION Relief from Case Management Schedule . Motion Hearing previously set for 1/26/2023 is continued to 2/2/2023 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 289 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google LLC. Filed byJulian Santiago, Sal Cataldo, Anibal Rodriguez, Susan Lynn Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 288 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #279 MOTION Relief from Case Management Schedule re #278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #246 Order on Stipulation , #282 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Shorten Time Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Letter from Amanda Bonn Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter re #286 Order and #263 Discovery Letter Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Order for Supplemental Submission Re: #263 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2022)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #267 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2022)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER Granting #272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/23/2022. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER Granting #257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and #254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/23/2022. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg temporarily granting in part #279 Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule and denying #280 Motion to Shorten Time for Briefing. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg denying #255 Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule and #260 Request for Appointment of a Special Master; and granting in part and denying in part #258 Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MOTION to Shorten Time re Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief [Dkt 279] filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MOTION Relief from Case Management Schedule re #278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #246 Order on Stipulation filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/4/2023. Replies due by 1/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2-3 [Public], #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order Granting Relief from Case Management Schedule)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #2 Declaration Declaration of Mark Mao in Support of Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Relief from Case Management)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Statement re #272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTYS MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint and Declaration by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Steve Ganem, #2 Proposed Order)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/29/2022)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 CLERK'S NOTICE: MOTION [#255] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON DECEMBER 1, 2022 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Letter from Google LLC Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter (Dkt. 274) re Disputed Requests Regarding Savings & Use of WAA-Off Data (Dkt. 250) and Disputed Requests Regarding Regulator Documents (Dkt. 262). (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Letter from Amanda Bonn Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter re Saving & Use of WAA-Off Data (Dkt. 250) and Regulator Documents (Dkt. 262). (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 REPLY (re #258 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint ) filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Exhibits 34 - 39 Redacted)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTYS MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED filed by Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Reply ISO Mtn for Leave to file Amd Complaint, #2 Exhibit 34, #3 Exhibit 35, #4 Exhibit 36, #5 Exhibit 37, #6 Exhibit 38, #7 Exhibit 39)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 REPLY (re #255 MOTION for Relief from Case Management Schedule ) filed bySal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 REFERRAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. The parties dispute concerning the issue of appointing a special master is referred to Chief Judge Seeborg for resolution. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Statement re #254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief From Case Management Schedule, and Declaration of Mark Mao, #257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint and Declaration by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of Administrative Motions to Seal, #2 Exhibit A (Redacted Ex. 19 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave), #3 Declaration of Steve Ganem in Support of Administrative Motions to Seal, #4 Proposed Order)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/16/2022)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #258 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint ) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/14/2022) Modified on 11/15/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (ECF NO. 256) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/11/2022)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Discovery Letter Brief CORRECTION TO DKT. 256 (Joint Letter Brief re Additional Depositions) filed by Google LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/11/2022)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #255 MOTION for Relief from Case Management Schedule ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief, #2 Exhibit 1)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Tenth Set of Requests for Production filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Disputed Requests for Admissions and Interrogatories filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Google's Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Google's Discovery Responses, #4 Exhibit D - Google's Discovery Responses)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Regulator Documents filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Additional Depositions filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre: Special Master Appointment filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order Google's Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Letter from Defendant Google LLC . (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mao - Redacted, #2 Exhibit 1 Redacted, #3 Exhibit 2 Redacted, #4 Exhibits 3 - 33 Slip Sheets, #5 Proposed Order Redacted)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 10/28/2022)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Leave to Amend UNDER SEAL, #2 Motion for Leave to Amend REDACTED, #3 Proposed Order REDACTED, #4 Proposed Order UNDER SEAL, #5 Declaration of Mao UNDER SEAL, #6 Declaration of Mao REDACTED, #7 Exhibit 1 4th Amended Complaint UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 1 4th Amended Complaint REDACTED, #9 Exhibit 2 Redlined Complaint UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 2 Redlined Complaint REDACTED, #11 Exhibit 3 Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 4 Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 5 Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 6 Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 7 Under Seal, #16 Exhibit 8 Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 9 Under Seal, #18 Exhibit 10 Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 11 Under Seal, #20 Exhibit 12 Under Seal, #21 Exhibit 13 Under Seal, #22 Exhibit 14 Under Seal, #23 Exhibit 15 Under Seal, #24 Exhibit 16 Under Seal, #25 Exhibit 17 Under Seal, #26 Exhibit 18 Under Seal, #27 Exhibit 19 Under Seal, #28 Exhibit 20 Under Seal, #29 Exhibit 21 Under Seal, #30 Exhibit 22 Under Seal, #31 Exhibit 23 Under Seal, #32 Exhibit 24 Under Seal, #33 Exhibit 25 Under Seal, #34 Exhibit 26 Under Seal, #35 Exhibit 27 Under Seal, #36 Exhibit 28 Under Seal, #37 Exhibit 29 Under Seal, #38 Exhibit 30 Under Seal, #39 Exhibit 31 Under Seal, #40 Exhibit 32 Under Seal, #41 Exhibit 33 Under Seal)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 10/28/2022)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MOTION for Relief from Case Management Schedule filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/10/2022. Replies due by 11/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Redacted Exhibits 1-6, #3 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 10/27/2022)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief From Case Management Schedule, and Declaration of Mark Mao filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #2 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Mark Mao, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 10/27/2022)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re Dkt 251 filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo E. Santacana (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse regarding #250 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Joint Discovery Letter Brief regarding Plaintiffs request for an order compelling Google to produce documents and data in response to Requests for Production and Interrogatories focused on Google using and saving WAA-off data filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 10/17/2022)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Harold Nyanjom without Prejudice filed by Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse resolving #247 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs request for an order compelling Google to produce certain damages-related documents in response to Plaintiffs RFP No. 259 filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #245 STIPULATION EXTENDING DISCOVERY, CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND HEARING DATE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery, Class Certification Briefing Schedule, and Hearing Date filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing Motion for Class Certification set for 5/11/2023 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #243 STIPULATION EXTENDING DISCOVERY, CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND HEARING DATE. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation with [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery, Class Certification Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER Granting Motion to Seal by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #236 Administrative Motion. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse denying #237 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #234 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Statement re #237 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Privilege Log Respecting Provisionally Sealed Material in Exhibit D Privilege Log by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting in part and denying in part #233 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2022)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Privilege Log filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Google's Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - Public Redacted Version)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Privilege Log filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Public Redacted Version, #2 Exhibit D - Under Seal Version)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ERRATA by Google LLC re #234 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Motion for Protective Order [Of Errata For Joint Letter Brief Re: Motion for Protective Order] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 5/4/2022) Modified on 5/5/2022 (msr, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Motion for Protective Order filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Letter Brief Joint Letter Brief re Google Search Terms for Additional Nineteen Custodians filed bySal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 4/29/2022) Modified on 5/3/2022 (agtlc1, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #231 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan Sila. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ryan Sila ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16998831.) filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Sila, Ryan) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byGoogle LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kellie Nyanjom (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eliza Cambay (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Letter Brief re #223 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Less-Redacted Version of Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #223 ) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Letter Brief re #225 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Susan Lynn Harvey, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Related document(s) #225 ) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/14/2022)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse denying #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting in part and denying in part #211 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part #213 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting in part and denying in part #200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emir Goenaga (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 2/9/2022)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JulieAnna Muniz (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 2/9/2022)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #216 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2022)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Search Term Letter Brief Response to the Courts Request filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #210 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #217 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2022)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #131 Amended Complaint, Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 2/2/2022)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Concur IP Consultants filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Google's [Proposed] Order re Concur IP Dispute, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's [Proposed] Order Resolving Concur IP Dispute, #3 Exhibit C - Sachin Sinha Declaration)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 2/2/2022)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #214 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CLASS CERTIFICATON BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Class Certification Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Letter from Google LLC re: Supplemental Briefing re: Search Terms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Public-Redacted, #2 Proposed Order)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 1/28/2022) Modified on 2/8/2022 (agtlc1, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Supplemental Briefing re: Search Terms filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Under Seal, #3 Exhibit A - Public-Redacted)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Letter from Amanda Bonn re Plaintiffs' Search Term Letter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/28/2022) Modified on 2/8/2022 (agtlc1, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Search Term Letter filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Search Term Letter, #2 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Search Term Letter)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg granting #139 Motion to Dismiss; denying #147 Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot #146 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2022)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting in part and denying in part #201 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Declaration of Steve Ganem in Support of #200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Search Term Joint Letter Brief and Exhibit C thereto filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #200 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 1/14/2022)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of #200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Search Term Joint Letter Brief and Exhibit C thereto filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #200 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 1/14/2022)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse denying #199 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2022)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Letter from Amanda Bonn Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter re Joint Letter Brief re Google's Motion to Expedite Plaintiffs' Depositions (dkt. 199). (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/11/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Letter from Google LLC : Supplemental Letter re: Joint Letter Brief re: Googles Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Sit for Deposition By February 15, 2022. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of #201 Letter filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Related document(s) #201 ) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Letter from Eduardo E. Santacana and Amanda Bonn Search Term Joint Letter Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/7/2022) Modified on 1/12/2022 (agtlc1, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Search Term Joint Letter Brief and Exhibit C thereto filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Search Term Joint Letter Brief, #2 Unredacted Version of Search Term Joint Letter Brief, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Google's Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Sit for Deposition by February 15, 2022 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Google], #2 Proposed Order [Plaintiffs])(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Declaration of Bryson Santaguida in Support of #197 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Discovery Letter Brief re #188 Discovery Letter Brief filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #197 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 12/16/2021)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse denying #187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #188 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #194 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MOTION For Relief from Case Management Schedule re #186 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Bonn, Amanda)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 12/9/2021)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre Preservation re 185 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve Ganem in Support of Google's Portion of Joint Letter Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE re #186 Reply to Opposition/Response #177 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Lee in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Bonn, Amanda) by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, Julie Anna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago (Filed on 12/8/2021) Modified on 12/8/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MOTION for Relief from Case Management Schedule re #186 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2021 01:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Mao in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F- Filed Under Seal)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 12/8/2021) (Main Document 191 replaced on 12/10/2021) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Supplemental Letter Brief re #184 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,, filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Related document(s) #184 ) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 12/8/2021) Modified on 12/8/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Letter Brief re #184 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,, filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Related document(s) #184 ) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRe: Privilege Dispute filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryson Santaguida Related to Privilege Dispute (Sealed), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryson Santaguida Related to Privilege Dispute (Sealed), #2 Declaration of Bryson Santaguida Related to Privilege Dispute)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting in part and denying in part #152 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse denying #166 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #167 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting in part and denying in part #154 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #155 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Declaration of Steve Ganem in Support of #179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #176 filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #179 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of #179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #176 filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #179 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #178 Motion. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Granting Relief from Case Management Schedule by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #153 Motion. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #176 filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #2 Sealed Version of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit D to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #4 Sealed Version of Exhibit D to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document 176-2 and 176-4 filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 REPLY (re #153 MOTION for Relief from Case Management Schedule re #59 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, ) REDACTED filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Lee, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D - Filed Separately Under Seal)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/19/2021) Modified on 11/22/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #2 Sealed Version of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit D to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #4 Sealed Version of Exhibit D to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/19/2021) **Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 11/22/2021 (ddk, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/23/2021) (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/23/2021) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Declaration of Steve Ganem in Support of #166 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Preservation filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #166 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of #166 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Preservation filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #166 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously scheduled for November 18, 2021 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #153 MOTION for Relief from Case Management Schedule re #59 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #152 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, along with the opposition and reply, are referred to Magistrate Judge Tse. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/16/2021. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Letter Brief re #163 Letter Brief, #157 Order Google LLC's Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter Brief re: Request for Google to Search Additional Custodians' ESI filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #163 , #157 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Declaration of Steve Ganem in Support of #162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter Brief Regarding Their Request for Google to Search Additional Custodians' ESI filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #162 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of #162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter Brief Regarding Their Request for Google to Search Additional Custodians' ESI filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #162 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #153 MOTION for Relief from Case Management Schedule re #59 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Letter Brief Redacted Joint Letter Brief re Preservation filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Delcaration of Steven Ganem In Support of Joint Letter Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/12/2021) Modified on 11/17/2021 (shy, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Preservation filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Joint Letter Brief, #2 Unredacted Joint Letter Brief, #3 Unredacted Declaration of Steve Ganem In Support of Joint Letter Brief)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rs Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at rscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 16, 2021 at 12:00 pm.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/11/2021)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Letter Brief re #157 Order Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter Brief Regarding Their Request for Google to Search Additional Custodians' ESI - REDACTED filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Related document(s) #157 ) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter Brief Regarding Their Request for Google to Search Additional Custodians' ESI filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter Brief Regarding Their Request for Google to Search Additional Custodians' ESI, #2 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter Brief Regarding Their Request for Google to Search Additional Custodians' ESI)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Declaration of Steve Ganem in Support of #154 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Custodian Joint Letter Brief filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #154 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of #154 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Custodian Joint Letter Brief filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #154 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Declaration of Steve Ganem in Support of #152 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #152 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/5/2021)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of #152 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #152 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 11/5/2021)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing Re: #155 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact discovery and expert disclosure deadlines are continued 30 days to avoid duplicate depositions; this order does not constitute a ruling on #153 Plaintiffs' motion for 6 months delay, which will be decided after full briefing. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/1/2021. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander P. Frawley, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Discovery Letter Brief, #4 Unredacted Discovery Letter Brief, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION for Relief from Case Management Schedule re #59 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #2 Exhibit A - Filed Separately Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B - Filed Separately Under Seal, #4 Exhibit C - Filed Separately Under Seal, #5 Exhibit D - Filed Separately Under Seal, #6 Exhibit E - Filed Separately Under Seal, #7 Exhibit F - Filed Separately Under Seal, #8 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander P. Frawley, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Proposed Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Proposed Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, #19 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule, #20 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 CLERK'S NOTICE THE MOTION TO DISMISS [#139] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON OCTOBER 28, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #148 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ian B. Crosby. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #147 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint, and Request for Oral Argument ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16517865.) filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint, and Request for Oral Argument filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Surreply in Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, and Request for Oral Argument, #2 Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #3 Exhibit AA, #4 Exhibit BB, #5 Exhibit CC, #6 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Surreply in Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander P. Frawley, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Motion for Leave to File Surreply, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Motion for Leave to File Surreply, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 - Proposed Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 - Proposed Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #7 Redacted Version of Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #8 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit AA, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit AA, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit BB, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit BB, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit CC, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit CC, #15 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Surreply, #16 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 REPLY (re #139 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #139 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint ) filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney, Antonio L. Ingram by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago II (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 9/23/2021) Modified on 9/23/2021 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Proposed Order re #139 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by Google LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of #139 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #139 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Request for Judicial Notice re #139 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #139 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 10/6/2021. Replies due by 10/13/2021. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNREDACTED) against Google LLC. Filed byJulian Santiago, Harold Nyanjom, JulieAnna Muniz, Emir Goenaga, Sal Cataldo, Anibal Rodriguez, Susan Lynn Harvey, Eliza Cambay, Kellie Nyanjom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Second Amended Complaint & Third Amended Complaint Redline Document)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 9/20/2021) Modified on 9/20/2021 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg granting #136 stipulation permitting plaintiffs to file the unredacted version of the third amended complaint. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #131 Amended Complaint Permitting Plaintiffs to File the Unredacted Version of the Third Amended Complaint filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #134 Stipulation. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond filed by Google LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #132 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Erika Nyborg-Burch. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16369763.) filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Kellie Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration Of Erika Nyborg-Burch)(Nyborg-Burch, Erika) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google LLC. Filed byJulian Santiago, Harold Nyanjom, JulieAnna Muniz, Emir Goenaga, Sal Cataldo, Anibal Rodriguez, Susan Lynn Harvey, Eliza Cambay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 9/1/2021) Modified on 9/17/2021 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Third Amended Complaint filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander P. Frawley in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Redacted Third Amended Complaint, #3 Unredacted Third Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit C - Redline Comparison, #6 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #128 Stipulation. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Google LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/18/2021. (rslc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #125 Stipulation. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Discovery Deadlines filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Lee, James) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 CLERK'S NOTICE THE MOTION TO DISMISS [#115] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON AUGUST 19, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Golda Farleigh (Farleigh, Jenna) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REPLY (re #115 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6), and in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to FRCP 12(F) ) in Support of Google's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byGoogle LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #115 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6), and in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to FRCP 12(F) ) Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of the Second Amended Complaint filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of Second Amended Complaint filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander P. Frawley, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of the Second Amended Complaint Sought to be Sealed, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of the Second Amended Complaint Sought to be Sealed, #5 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Declaration)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #118 SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR GOOGLES MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/6/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #115 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6), and in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to FRCP 12(F) filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #115 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6), and in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to FRCP 12(F). Motion Hearing previously set for 8/12/2021 is continued to 8/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of #115 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6), and in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to FRCP 12(F), #116 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #115 , #116 ) (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Request for Judicial Notice re #115 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6), and in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to FRCP 12(F) filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #115 ) (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6), and in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to FRCP 12(F) filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 7/9/2021. Replies due by 7/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Google LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counts 1 and 2 of Second Amended Complaint)(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Argemira Florez (Florez, Argemira) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google LLC. Filed byJulian Santiago, Harold Nyanjom, JulieAnna Muniz, Emir Goenaga, Sal Cataldo, Anibal Rodriguez, Susan Lynn Harvey, Eliza Cambay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Second Amended Complaint filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander P. Frawley in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Redacted Second Amended Complaint, #3 Unredacted Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit C - Redline Comparison, #6 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse Re: #110 Discovery Dispute. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Google's Response to Deposition Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit D - Google's Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/21/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse denying #104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of #104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Custodian Joint Letter Brief filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #104 ) (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse denying #105 Discovery Letter Brief. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre Custodians filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Google's Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander P. Frawley, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Version of 2021-05-04 Joint Letter Brief re Custodians, #4 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #5 Unredacted Version of 2021-05-04 Joint Letter Brief re Custodians)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Attorney Amanda Cristina Maya terminated.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/14/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Amanda Cristina Maya - Withdraw as Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maya, Amanda) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori C Arakaki (Arakaki, Lori) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #62 ) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #62 ) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/4/21, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #96 Transcript Order, #97 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2021. (Related documents(s) #96 , #97 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/04/2021 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/04/2021 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held via Zoom/Video Conference on 3/4/2021 re #62 MOTION to Dismiss First-Amended Complaint. Motion taken under submission; Court to issue an order.Total Time in Court: 1 hour and 35 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Ram, Amanda Bonn, Mark Mao. Defendant Attorney: Benedict Hur, Simona Agnolucci, Eduardo Santacana. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2021)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Transcript of Zoom Webinar Proceedings held on February 5, 2021, before Judge Alex G. Tse. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #87 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2021. (Related documents(s) #87 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rs Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at RScrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 3, 2021 at 12:00 PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.Set/Reset Deadlines as to #62 MOTION to Dismiss First-Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #91 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint [dkt 62] ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint [dkt 62] filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Proposed Surreply, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Alexander P. Frawley, #3 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg granting #89 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen M. Shepard. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15587190.) filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shepard, Steven) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/05/2021 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/05/21 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Reblitz-Richardson, Beko) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse Re: #74 #75 Discovery Disputes. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse regarding discovery disputes raised in discovery letter briefs #74 & #75 . Hearing held. The Court takes the matters under submission.Total Time in Court: 51 Minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Plaintiff Attorney: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson. Defendant Attorney: Eduardo E. Santacana and Benedict Y. Hur. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Statement of Recent Decision In Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss; Request for Leave Civil L.R. 7-3(d)(2) by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Request for Judicial Notice re #62 MOTION to Dismiss First-Amended Complaint, #82 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Supplemental) in Support of Google's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting D's Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #62 , #82 ) (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY (re #62 MOTION to Dismiss First-Amended Complaint ) in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Eduardo E. Santacana, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg granting #80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander Frawley. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Alexander Frawley ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15534761.) filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY HEARING: The hearing regarding discovery letter briefs #74 and #75 , which is set for 2/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, shall occur at 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt General Order 58. Persons g ranted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING: The parties are hereby notified that a hearing regarding discovery letter briefs #74 and #75 is set for 2/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt General Order 58. Persons g ranted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE by Google LLC of Errata for Joint Letter Brief re: Discovery Dispute Concerning Plaintiffs' Document Request, Set Two, Request No. 3- Correction of Docket #75 (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/27/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re: Discovery Dispute Concerning Plaintiffs' Document Request, Set Two, Request No. 3 filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A, B & C)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Discovery Letter Brief Re: Discovery Dispute Concerning Plaintiffs' Document Requests, Set No. One, Requests Nos. 1 & 2 filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A & B)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting #72 Stipulated Order Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #62 MOTION to Dismiss First-Amended Complaint ) filed byEliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Redline of Changes Against Model Protective Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #67 Stipulation to Reschedule Motion to Dismiss Hearing. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings to Reschedule Motion to Dismiss Hearing filed by Eliza Cambay, Sal Cataldo, Emir Goenaga, Susan Lynn Harvey, JulieAnna Muniz, Harold Nyanjom, Anibal Rodriguez, Julian Santiago. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jayvan E Mitchell (Mitchell, Jayvan) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #62 MOTION to Dismiss First-Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing previously set for 2/25/2021 is continued to 3/4/2021 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Declaration in Support of #62 MOTION to Dismiss First-Amended Complaint, #64 Declaration in Support,,, #63 Request for Judicial Notice filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01-A, #2 Exhibit 01-B, #3 Exhibit 02-A, #4 Exhibit 02-B)(Related document(s) #62 , #64 , #63 ) (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Declaration of Jayvan E. Mitchell in Support of #63 Request for Judicial Notice, #62 MOTION to Dismiss First-Amended Complaint filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-01, #2 Exhibit A-02, #3 Exhibit B-01, #4 Exhibit B-02, #5 Exhibit C-01, #6 Exhibit C-02, #7 Exhibit D-01, #8 Exhibit D-02, #9 Exhibit E-01, #10 Exhibit E-02, #11 Exhibit F-01, #12 Exhibit F-02, #13 Exhibit G, #14 Exhibit H, #15 Exhibit I-01, #16 Exhibit I-02, #17 Exhibit J-01, #18 Exhibit J-02, #19 Exhibit K-01, #20 Exhibit K-02, #21 Exhibit L-01, #22 Exhibit L-02, #23 Exhibit M, #24 Exhibit N, #25 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) #63 , #62 ) (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Request for Judicial Notice re #62 MOTION to Dismiss First-Amended Complaint filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #62 ) (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss First-Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/14/2021. Replies due by 2/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo E. Santacana (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Motion as to #48 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2021 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google LLC. Filed byAnibal Rodriguez, JulieAnna Muniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Google Privacy Policy)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 11/11/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/23/2020. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Deadline for Amended Complaint & Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Initial Case Management Conference held telephonic on 10/15/2020.Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Amanda Bonn, James Lee, Michael Ram, Jon Yanchunis - Telephonic. Defendant Attorney: Simona Agnolucci, Benedict Hur, Amanda Maya - Telephonic. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Francis Ram (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Francis Ram (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #53 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Alphabet Inc. Without Prejudice. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Alphabet Inc. without Prejudice filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Proposed Order re #49 Request for Judicial Notice, #50 Declaration in Support, #48 MOTION to Dismiss , #51 Declaration in Support, by Google LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Declaration of Andrew Rope in Support of #49 Request for Judicial Notice, #50 Declaration in Support, #48 MOTION to Dismiss filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #49 , #50 , #48 ) (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Declaration of Jayvan E. Mitchell in Support of #49 Request for Judicial Notice, #48 MOTION to Dismiss filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #49 , #48 ) (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Request for Judicial Notice re #48 MOTION to Dismiss filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/13/2020. Replies due by 12/3/2020. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jean Sutton Martin. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15032949.) filed by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Martin, Jean) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ra Amen. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999915.) filed by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Amen, Ra) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio Lavalle Ingram, II (Ingram, Antonio) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Cristina Maya (Maya, Amanda) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jayvan E Mitchell (Mitchell, Jayvan) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Simona Alessandra Agnolucci (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants Google LLC and Alphabet Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Benedict Y. Hur (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION to Extend the Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Kramer for Defendants Google LLC and Alphabet Inc. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020.All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anibal Rodriguez, JulieAnna Muniz. Alphabet Inc. served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anibal Rodriguez, JulieAnna Muniz. Google LLC served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez.. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #20 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Shawn J. Rabin. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #19 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to William Christopher Carmody. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda K. Bonn (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14732153.) filed by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rabin, Shawn) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14732111.) filed by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Carmody, William) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #10 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Jesse Panuccio. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #9 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to John A. Yanchunis. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #8 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan J. McGee. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #6 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Rossana Baeza. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #5 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to James W. Lee. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14696320.) filed by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Panuccio, Jesse) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14695782.) filed by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14695739.) filed by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14689933.) filed by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Baeza, Rossana) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14689815.) filed by JulieAnna Muniz, Anibal Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lee, James) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson (Reblitz-Richardson, Beko) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Justin Konik (Konik, Alexander) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14688981.). Filed byAnibal Rodriguez, JulieAnna Muniz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 7/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez et al v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anibal Rodriguez
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: Alexander Justin Konik
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: James W Lee
Represented By: Rossana Baeza
Represented By: William Christopher Carmody
Represented By: Amanda K. Bonn
Represented By: Shawn Jonathan Rabin
Represented By: Alexander Patrick Frawley
Represented By: Antonio Lavalle Ingram, II
Represented By: Erika Britt Nyborg-Burch
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Jenna Golda Farleigh
Represented By: Logan Wright
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Ra Olusegun Amen
Represented By: Ryan Sila
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: Mark C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JulieAnna Muniz
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: Alexander Justin Konik
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: James W Lee
Represented By: Rossana Baeza
Represented By: William Christopher Carmody
Represented By: Amanda K. Bonn
Represented By: Sean Phillips Rodriguez
Represented By: Shawn Jonathan Rabin
Represented By: Alexander Patrick Frawley
Represented By: Antonio Lavalle Ingram, II
Represented By: Erika Britt Nyborg-Burch
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Jenna Golda Farleigh
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Ra Olusegun Amen
Represented By: Ryan Sila
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: Mark C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliza Cambay
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Alexander Patrick Frawley
Represented By: Alexander Justin Konik
Represented By: Amanda K. Bonn
Represented By: Antonio Lavalle Ingram, II
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Represented By: Erika Britt Nyborg-Burch
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Represented By: James W Lee
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Jenna Golda Farleigh
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Ra Olusegun Amen
Represented By: Rossana Baeza
Represented By: Ryan Sila
Represented By: Shawn Jonathan Rabin
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: William Christopher Carmody
Represented By: Mark C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sal Cataldo
Represented By: Alexander Patrick Frawley
Represented By: Alexander Justin Konik
Represented By: Amanda K. Bonn
Represented By: Antonio Lavalle Ingram, II
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Represented By: Erika Britt Nyborg-Burch
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Represented By: James W Lee
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Jenna Golda Farleigh
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Logan Wright
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Ra Olusegun Amen
Represented By: Rossana Baeza
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: Ryan Sila
Represented By: Shawn Jonathan Rabin
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: William Christopher Carmody
Represented By: Mark C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emir Goenaga
Represented By: Alexander Patrick Frawley
Represented By: Alexander Justin Konik
Represented By: Amanda K. Bonn
Represented By: Antonio Lavalle Ingram, II
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Represented By: Erika Britt Nyborg-Burch
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Represented By: James W Lee
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Jenna Golda Farleigh
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Ra Olusegun Amen
Represented By: Ryan Sila
Represented By: Shawn Jonathan Rabin
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: William Christopher Carmody
Represented By: Mark C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Santiago
Represented By: Alexander Patrick Frawley
Represented By: Alexander Justin Konik
Represented By: Amanda K. Bonn
Represented By: Antonio Lavalle Ingram, II
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Represented By: Erika Britt Nyborg-Burch
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Represented By: James W Lee
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Jenna Golda Farleigh
Represented By: William Christopher Carmody
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Logan Wright
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Ra Olusegun Amen
Represented By: Rossana Baeza
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: Ryan Sila
Represented By: Shawn Jonathan Rabin
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: Mark C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Nyanjom
Represented By: Alexander Patrick Frawley
Represented By: Alexander Justin Konik
Represented By: Amanda K. Bonn
Represented By: Antonio Lavalle Ingram, II
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Jenna Golda Farleigh
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Represented By: Erika Britt Nyborg-Burch
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Represented By: James W Lee
Represented By: Ra Olusegun Amen
Represented By: Rossana Baeza
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: Ryan Sila
Represented By: Shawn Jonathan Rabin
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: William Christopher Carmody
Represented By: Mark C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lynn Harvey
Represented By: Ryan Sila
Represented By: Shawn Jonathan Rabin
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: William Christopher Carmody
Represented By: Alexander Patrick Frawley
Represented By: Alexander Justin Konik
Represented By: Amanda K. Bonn
Represented By: Antonio Lavalle Ingram, II
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Represented By: Erika Britt Nyborg-Burch
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Represented By: James W Lee
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Jenna Golda Farleigh
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Logan Wright
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Ra Olusegun Amen
Represented By: Rossana Baeza
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: Mark C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Nyanjom
Represented By: Amanda K. Bonn
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Represented By: Erika Britt Nyborg-Burch
Represented By: Mark C. Mao
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Ryan Sila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Simona Alessandra Agnolucci
Represented By: Jayvan E Mitchell
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Benedict Y. Hur
Represented By: Amanda Cristina Maya
Represented By: Argemira Florez
Represented By: Eduardo E. Santacana
Represented By: Jayvan E. Mitchell
Represented By: Lori C Arakaki
Represented By: Noorjahan Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: Simona Alessandra Agnolucci
Represented By: Jayvan E Mitchell
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Benedict Y. Hur
Represented By: Amanda Cristina Maya
Represented By: Eduardo E. Santacana
Represented By: Jayvan E. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?