Tetra Tech EC, Inc. v. CH2M Hill Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tetra Tech EC, Inc.
Defendant: Permafix Environmental Services, Inc., Batelle Memorial Institute, Cabrera Services, Inc., SC&A, Inc. and CH2M Hill Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04704
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 34 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Cabrera Services, Inc. (Castles, James) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Castles (Castles, James) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Judge James Donato granting #31 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule. As jointly requested by the parties, defendants may file their single joint motion to dismiss or strike the complaint by September 21, 2020; plaintiff may file a response by November 20, 2020; and defendants may file a reply by December 21, 2020. The motion may be noticed for hearing on January 7, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule filed by CH2M Hill Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blanca F. Young)(Young, Blanca) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by SC&A, Inc.. (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 29 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Batelle Memorial Institute (Freed, John) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Batelle Memorial Institute (Freed, John) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 27 Case Reassigned to Judge James Donato. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/13/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline to Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Permafix Environmental Services, Inc. and Tetra Tech EC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Poppler, Erin) (Filed on 8/12/2020) Modified on 8/13/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines to Respond to Complaint - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #20 filed by CH2M Hill Inc., Batelle Memorial Institute, Tetra Tech EC, Inc., and Cabrera Services, Inc. (Young, Blanca) (Filed on 8/11/2020) Modified on 8/12/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Bryant (Bryant, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Spiegel (Spiegel, John) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R Lewis (Lewis, Andrew) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 20 RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #24 *** STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines to Respond to Complaint filed by CH2M Hill Inc., Battelle Memorial Institute, Cabrera Services, Inc., and Tetra Tech EC, Inc. (Young, Blanca) (Filed on 8/11/2020) Modified on 8/12/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/12/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by CH2M Hill Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. for CH2M Hill Inc.. (Young, Blanca) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Blanca Fromm Young (Young, Blanca) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John Douglas Freed (Freed, John) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Addiego, III (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued SC&A Inc. (Pujari, Davina) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued PermaFix Environmental Services, Inc. (Pujari, Davina) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued Cabrera Services Inc. (Pujari, Davina) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued Batelle Memorial Institute (Pujari, Davina) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued CH2M Hill, Inc. (Pujari, Davina) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tetra Tech EC, Inc... (Pujari, Davina) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tetra Tech Inc. for Tetra Tech EC, Inc.. (Pujari, Davina) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Batelle Memorial Institute, CH2M Hill Inc., Cabrera Services, Inc., Permafix Environmental Services, Inc., SC&A, Inc.. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. . (Pujari, Davina) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 09/19) used at case opening. Please complete correct Civil Cov er Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19) and file as a separate docket entry: Re:. Re: #1 . #1 Complaint, filed by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pujari, Davina) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) Negligence (2) Negligent Misrepresentation (3) Equitable Indemnificaion against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14691091.). Filed byTetra Tech EC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pujari, Davina) (Filed on 7/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tetra Tech EC, Inc. v. CH2M Hill Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Permafix Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Kathleen Poppler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batelle Memorial Institute
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabrera Services, Inc.
Represented By: James P. Castles
Represented By: Mark Joseph Divelbiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC&A, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH2M Hill Inc.
Represented By: Blanca Fromm Young
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Bryant
Represented By: John W. Spiegel
Represented By: Andrew R Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tetra Tech EC, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Rheinheimer
Represented By: Melissa Marie Malstrom
Represented By: Davina Pujari
Represented By: Samir J. Abdelnour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?