International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots v. The Pasha Group et al
Plaintiff: International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots
Defendant: SUNRISE OPERATIONS LLC. d/b/a PASHA HAWAII, PASHA HAWAII TRANSPORT LINES LLC., The Pasha Group, PASHA HAWAII HOLDINGS LLC., SUNRISE VESSEL OPERATIONS LLC., SR HOLDINGS LLC., SR Holdings LLC, Pasha Hawaii Holdings LLC, Pasha Hawaii Transport Lines LLC, Sunrise Operations LLC doing business as Pasha Hawaii and Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv04722
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. Defendants' #22 Administrative Motion to Stay Briefing and Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion is denied. Defendants may file their response to plaintiff's motion to compel arbitration and for preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 20) by September 17, 2020, and plaintiff may file its reply by September 24, 2020. Plaintiff's motion to compel arbitration and for preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 20) and defendants' motion to strike or dismiss (Dkt. No. 21) are both re-set for a hearing on October 15, 2020, at 10 a.m., at the same time as the initial case management conference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/10/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Lee Wojciechowski (Wojciechowski, Jason) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction Pending Arbitration re #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction Pending Arbitration filed by International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Demidovich, Lisa) (Filed on 9/3/2020) Modified on 9/4/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2020 Filing 22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction Pending Arbitration re #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction Pending Arbitration filed by Pasha Hawaii Holdings LLC, Pasha Hawaii Transport Lines LLC, SR Holdings LLC, Sunrise Operations LLC, Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC, The Pasha Group. Responses due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William G. Miossi in support of Administrative Motion to Stay Briefing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to Stay Briefing)(Delgado, Leandro) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Certain Defendants filed by Pasha Hawaii Holdings LLC, Pasha Hawaii Transport Lines LLC, SR Holdings LLC, Sunrise Operations LLC, Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC, The Pasha Group. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/14/2020. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Petition, or, in the Alternative, Dismiss as to Certain Defendants)(Delgado, Leandro) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction Pending Arbitration; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/10/2020. Replies due by 9/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald Marcus, #2 Declaration of J. Lars Turner, #3 Declaration of Lisa Demidovich, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service)(Demidovich, Lisa) (Filed on 8/27/2020) Modified on 8/28/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to William G. Miossi. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to attorney William G. Miossi ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14789700.) filed by Pasha Hawaii Holdings LLC, Pasha Hawaii Transport Lines LLC, SR Holdings LLC, Sunrise Operations LLC, Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC, The Pasha Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Delgado, Leandro) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Pasha Hawaii Holdings LLC, Pasha Hawaii Transport Lines LLC, SR Holdings LLC, Sunrise Operations LLC, Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC, The Pasha Group. (Delgado, Leandro) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/31/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pasha Hawaii Holdings LLC, Pasha Hawaii Transport Lines LLC, SR Holdings LLC, Sunrise Operations LLC, Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC, The Pasha Group.. (Delgado, Leandro) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pasha Hawaii Holdings LLC, Pasha Hawaii Transport Lines LLC, SR Holdings LLC, Sunrise Operations LLC, Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC, The Pasha Group (Delgado, Leandro) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Leandro F Delgado as counsel of record for Defendants (Delgado, Leandro) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots. All Defendants. (Demidovich, Lisa) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Pasha Hawaii Holdings LLC, Pasha Hawaii Transport Lines LLC, SR Holdings LLC, Sunrise Operations LLC, Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC, The Pasha Group. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Demidovich, Lisa) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 #Electronic filing error RE: #3 Proposed Summons. A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or create an attachment which list all de fendants. Re-file in its entirety. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/6/202 0. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots (Demidovich, Lisa) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 ***REFILED AT DKT. #7 *** Proposed Summons. (Demidovich, Lisa) (Filed on 7/15/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots . (Demidovich, Lisa) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14696443.). Filed byInternational Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK)(Demidovich, Lisa) (Filed on 7/15/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots v. The Pasha Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE OPERATIONS LLC. d/b/a PASHA HAWAII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PASHA HAWAII TRANSPORT LINES LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pasha Group
Represented By: William G. Miossi
Represented By: Leandro F Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PASHA HAWAII HOLDINGS LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE VESSEL OPERATIONS LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SR HOLDINGS LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SR Holdings LLC
Represented By: William G. Miossi
Represented By: Leandro F Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasha Hawaii Holdings LLC
Represented By: William G. Miossi
Represented By: Leandro F Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasha Hawaii Transport Lines LLC
Represented By: William G. Miossi
Represented By: Leandro F Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Operations LLC doing business as Pasha Hawaii
Represented By: William G. Miossi
Represented By: Leandro F Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC
Represented By: William G. Miossi
Represented By: Leandro F Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Organization of Masters, Mates & Pilots
Represented By: Lisa Charlotte Demidovich
Represented By: Jason Wojciechowski
Represented By: Ira Lawrence Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?