Mire v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: John Mire
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv04752
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Louisiana, 2:20-cv-01821, Mire v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-4752-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order #5 cc: JPMDL (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01821. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of MDL Transfer to District of California Northern. MDL case number is 2741. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(jeg)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2741. (jeg)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (jeg)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8374985) filed by John Mire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney John D. Sileo added to party John Mire(pty:pla).(Sileo, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mire v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mire
Represented By: John D Sileo
Represented By: Casey William Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?