Quintara Biosciences, Inc. v. Ruifeng Biztech Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: QUINTARA BIOSCIENCES, INC.
Defendant: RUIFENG BIZTECH INC., RUI SHAO, ALAN LI, RF BIOTECH LLC, ALEX WONG and GANGYOU WANG
Case Number: 3:2020cv04808
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING, CONTINUING MOTION HEARING, AND ADVANCING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to the Court's Order at #19 , the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is vacated. The Motion Hearing as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure set for 10/15/2020 is continued to 10/22/2020 at 8:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM is advanced to 10/22/2020 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING #11 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by ALAN LI, RF BIOTECH LLC, RUIFENG BIZTECH INC., RUI SHAO, GANGYOU WANG, ALEX WONG. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 9/22/2020. Replies due by 9/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Wiseman, Dylan) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 Ex Parte Application For Order to Show Cause and For TRO ) filed byALAN LI, RF BIOTECH LLC, RUIFENG BIZTECH INC., RUI SHAO, GANGYOU WANG, ALEX WONG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan Li, #2 Declaration of Alex Wong, #3 Declaration of Dylan Wiseman, #4 Declaration of Rui Shao, #5 Declaration of Gangyou Wang, #6 Exhibits A-M to the Declaration of Ganyou Wang, #7 Exhibits N-P to the Declaration of Gangyou Wang, #8 Exhibits Q-W to the Declaration of Gangyou Wang, #9 Objections to Evidence)(Wiseman, Dylan) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Telephonic Motion Hearing. The Motion Hearing previously set for 9/10/2020 is continued to 9/17/2020 at 8:00 AM before Judge WIlliam Alsup. (See Related Docket Entries #13 , 14 ) This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) Modified on 8/28/2020 (amd2S, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by ALAN LI, RF BIOTECH LLC, RUIFENG BIZTECH INC., RUI SHAO, GANGYOU WANG, ALEX WONG Declaration of Dylan Wiseman Regarding Service (Wiseman, Dylan) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. The Motion Hearing referenced in the Court's Order at #13 is set for 9/10/2020 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514Those parties making an appearance shall dial-in ten minutes prior to the hearing and check in with the Courtroom Deputy. The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE #11 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 10 AT 8:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/20/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits C and F to Shan Decl filed by QUINTARA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Pierz Decl ISO Admin mtn to seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of Exhibits C&F to Shan Decl, #4 Unredacted version of Exhibits C&F to Shan Decl, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Pierz, Andrew) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 Ex Parte Application For Order to Show Cause and For TRO filed by QUINTARA BIOSCIENCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Shan Decl ISO Ex Parte App, #2 Exhibits C &F to Shan Decl (redacted), #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Li, J.) (Filed on 8/19/2020) Modified on 8/20/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by QUINTARA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. ALAN LI served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; RF BIOTECH LLC served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; RUIFENG BIZTECH INC. served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; RUI SHAO served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; GANGYOU WANG served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; ALEX WONG served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Li, J.) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M Pierz (Pierz, Andrew) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2002. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras., This case will be randomly assigned/reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand .uscourts.gov/news/225. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ALAN LI, RF BIOTECH LLC, RUIFENG BIZTECH INC., RUI SHAO, GANGYOU WANG, ALEX WONG. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (mbcS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/20/2020 (sp, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by QUINTARA BIOSCIENCES, INC. identifying Other Affiliate Richard Shan, Other Affiliate Sue Zhao for QUINTARA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. (Li, J.) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Li, J.) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by QUINTARA BIOSCIENCES, INC... (Li, J.) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14706455.). Filed byQUINTARA BIOSCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Li, J.) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintara Biosciences, Inc. v. Ruifeng Biztech Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUIFENG BIZTECH INC.
Represented By: Dylan Wallgren Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUI SHAO
Represented By: Dylan Wallgren Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN LI
Represented By: Dylan Wallgren Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RF BIOTECH LLC
Represented By: Dylan Wallgren Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX WONG
Represented By: Dylan Wallgren Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GANGYOU WANG
Represented By: Dylan Wallgren Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUINTARA BIOSCIENCES, INC.
Represented By: J. James Li
Represented By: Andrew M Pierz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?