Lefevre v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Elza Lynn Lefevre
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv04814
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elza Lynn Lefevre (McNeile, Adam) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Elza Lynn Lefevre of Case Management Conference Order and Standing Orders (McNeile, Adam) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/4/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/3/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elza Lynn Lefevre.. (McNeile, Adam) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by FCA US LLC Order Setting Initial CMC & ADR Guidelines (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC Notice to Adverse Party of Removal (Mayo, James) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is 20-CIV-02336. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14707051). Filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration James P. Mayo, #3 Declaration Jon D. Universal, #4 Certificate of Interested Parties, #5 Demand for Jury Trial, #6 Notice of Appearance James P. Mayo, #7 Notice of Appearance Jon D Universal)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lefevre v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elza Lynn Lefevre
Represented By: Adam J. McNeile
Represented By: Kristin A. Kemnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Jon David Universal
Represented By: Brett H. Wanner
Represented By: Nejla Nassirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?