Castellon et al v. American Express National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Frank M. Castellon and Momentum Accounting, Inc.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Silicon Valley Bank, Celtic Bank, American Express National Bank, Cambridge Savings Bank, Citibank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., First Bank, Kabbage, Inc., River City Bank, Bank of America, N.A., Heritage Bank of Commerce, U.S. Bank National Association, First Republic Bank, Grasshopper Bank, N.A., Bank of Marin, Bank of the West, The Mortgage Capital Development Corporation and Comerica Bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv04894
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc. re #1 Complaint, [Heritage Bank of Commerce] (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc. re #1 Complaint, [Silicon Valley Bank] (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc. re #1 Complaint, [Wells Fargo Bank, NA] (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc. re #1 Complaint, [First Republic Bank] (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [The Mortgage Capital Development Corporation] by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 9/17/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (elyS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [Bank of the West] by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 9/17/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (elyS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [Bank of America, NA] by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 9/17/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (elyS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Momentum Accounting, Inc., Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos. Service waived by American Express National Bank waiver sent on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc. re #1 Complaint, [Bank of Marin] (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 28 ERRATA re #26 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc.. (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 27 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc... (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 26 **Filed in error. Please refer to dockets nos. #27 and #28 .** CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc... (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Eric Gottlieb for Defendant KABBAGE, INC. (Gottlieb, Richard) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Eric Gottlieb for Defendant FIRST BANK (Gottlieb, Richard) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kabbage, Inc... (Barot, Kishan) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by First Bank.. (Barot, Kishan) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kishan Hasmukh Barot for Defendant Kabbage, Inc. (Barot, Kishan) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kishan Hasmukh Barot for Defendant FIRST BANK (Barot, Kishan) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos, Momentum Accounting, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Bank of Marin (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Celtic Bank identifying Corporate Parent Celtic Investment, Inc. for Celtic Bank. (Simonsen, Ashley) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Momentum Accounting, Inc., Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos. Service waived by Celtic Bank waiver sent on 8/6/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Momentum Accounting, Inc., Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos. Service waived by First Bank waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Momentum Accounting, Inc., Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos. Service waived by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/11/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Celtic Bank.. (Simonsen, Ashley) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14805066.) filed by Celtic Bank. (Soukup, Andrew) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Margaret Simonsen (Simonsen, Ashley) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Frank M. Castellon. Service waived by Kabbage, Inc. waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/21/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Frank M. Castellon. Service waived by River City Bank waiver sent on 8/5/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Frank M. Castellon. Service waived by Citibank, N.A. waiver sent on 8/4/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Express National Bank, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of Marin, Bank of the West, Cambridge Savings Bank, Celtic Bank, Citibank, N.A., Comerica Bank, First Bank, First Republic Bank, Grasshopper Bank, N.A., Heritage Bank of Commerce, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Kabbage, Inc., River City Bank, Silicon Valley Bank, The Mortgage Capital Development Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 2, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 8/2/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14719511.). Filed byMomentum Accounting, Inc., Frank M. Castellon, Shirley Palomino Chirinos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Singh, Nitoj) (Filed on 7/22/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castellon et al v. American Express National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Valley Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Bank
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen
Represented By: Andrew J Soukup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bank
Represented By: Richard Eric Gottlieb
Represented By: Kishan Hasmukh Barot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kabbage, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Eric Gottlieb
Represented By: Kishan Hasmukh Barot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River City Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Bank of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grasshopper Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of the West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mortgage Capital Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Palomino Chirinos
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Nitoj P. Singh
Represented By: Benjamin J. Meiselas
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Represented By: Michael E Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank M. Castellon
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Nitoj P. Singh
Represented By: Benjamin J. Meiselas
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Represented By: Michael E Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Momentum Accounting, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Nitoj P. Singh
Represented By: Benjamin J. Meiselas
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Represented By: Michael E Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?