Cisco Systems, Inc. et al v. Dexon Computer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Dexon Computer, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04926
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. Service waived by Dexon Computer, Inc. waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Feuchtbaum, Louis) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Dexon Computer, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc... (Minasyan, Artur) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (He, Angela) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cisco Systems, Inc. for Cisco Technology, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (Feuchtbaum, Louis) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Dexon Computer, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14722735.). Filed byCisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 7/22/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisco Systems, Inc. et al v. Dexon Computer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Angela M He
Represented By: Louis P. Feuchtbaum
Represented By: Richard Joseph Nelson
Represented By: Artur A. Minasyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisco Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Angela M He
Represented By: Louis P. Feuchtbaum
Represented By: Richard Joseph Nelson
Represented By: Artur A. Minasyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexon Computer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?