Flores-Mendez et al v. Zoosk, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Flores-Mendez and Amber Collins
Defendant: Spark Networks Se and Zoosk, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04929
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Douglas H. Meal. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14944066.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/15/2020 filed by Spark Networks Se, Zoosk, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Meal, Douglas) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Douglas H. Meal. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Douglas Meal ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14944066.) filed by Spark Networks Se, Zoosk, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Meal, Douglas) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 is continued to 10/29/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/3/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/3/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Spark Networks Se, Zoosk, Inc... (Harlow, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Spark Networks Se, Zoosk, Inc... (Harlow, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint, filed by Spark Networks Se, Zoosk, Inc., Amber Collins and Juan Flores-Mendez. (Harlow, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/20/2020) Modified on 8/21/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amber Collins, Juan Flores-Mendez.. (Grombacher, Kiley) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Spark Networks Se. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Grombacher, Kiley) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Please update the document to reflect the current case# 4:20-cv-04929-KAW Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials KAW immediately after the case number. #Electronic filing error. Re: #9 Proposed Summons filed by Amber Collins, Juan Flores-Mendez (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Grombacher, Kiley) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Juan Flores-Mendez, Amber Collins as to Spark Networks Se. (Grombacher, Kiley) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Amber Collins, Juan Flores-Mendez. Amended [Proposed] Summons to Defendant Spark Networks SE. (Grombacher, Kiley) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Spark Networks Se, Zoosk, Inc. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Grombacher, Kiley) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Grombacher, Kiley) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Spark Networks Se, Zoosk, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14723701.). Filed byJuan Flores-Mendez, Amber Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grombacher, Kiley) (Filed on 7/22/2020) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores-Mendez et al v. Zoosk, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Flores-Mendez
Represented By: Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Represented By: Lirit Ariella King
Represented By: Marcus Joseph Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Collins
Represented By: Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Represented By: Lirit Ariella King
Represented By: Marcus Joseph Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spark Networks Se
Represented By: Douglas Harlan Meal
Represented By: Rebecca Clair Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoosk, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Harlan Meal
Represented By: Rebecca Clair Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?