Wagner v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Kimberly Wagner
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Lending Club Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv04956
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Kimberly Wagner of Settlement with Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Lending Club Corporation only filed by Kimberly Wagner. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/8/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Lending Club Corporation ONLY by Kimberly Wagner (Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Joint case management conference statement due 12/3/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (WRONG IMAGE. SEE #14 )CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020) Modified on 8/20/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Lending Club Corporation. (Rubin, Stacy) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Quinn, Jr (Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC., Kimberly Wagner. (Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 8/14/2020) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Wagner. All Defendants. (Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 01:30 PM. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Lending Club Corporation. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/7/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) for Violations of Fair Credit Reporting Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14727915). Filed by Kimberly Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 7/23/2020) Modified on 7/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lending Club Corporation
Represented By: Stacy Heather Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Wagner
Represented By: Stanley R Apps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?