Ulrich v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: John Ulrich
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05117
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; District of Massachusetts, 1:20-cv-10667 JCB Ulrich v. Monsanto Company, opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-05117 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 216 cc: JPMDL (gbaS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:20-cv-10667. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 Case Electronically transferred to Northern District of California pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on June 17, 2020 Original file and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to the Clerk in that district. (York, Steve)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-216 in MDL Case 2741 received from District of Northern District of California requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (York, Steve)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 216 in MDL Case 2741 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT John Ulrich against Monsanto Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8184417 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Ulrich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons)(Edmondson, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulrich v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ulrich
Represented By: Rebecca D. Edmondson-Koron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?