Waterfill v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Jerry E. Waterfill
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05123
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED re 16-md-2741-VC: USDC, Western District of Kentucky (Louisville), 3:20-cv-00476-JRW-CHL, Jerry E. Waterfill v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-05123-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-223) cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Western District of Kentucky (Louisville); Case Number 3:20-cv-00476-JRW-CHL. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 223 from ND/CA re MDL 2741. (KJA)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. The Court strongly encourages all attorneys and their clients to provide substantive speaking opportunities to less experienced attorneys. Newer attorneys often do not have many opportunities to appear and argue in court. Although oral argument is not necessary for ruling on most motions, the Court will hold oral argument if a party (a) requests it in accordance with LR 7.1 (f); and (b) commits to entrusting the argument to an attorney who graduated from law school no more than six years ago. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Colin H. Lindsay to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM/Law Clerk-CHL (MEJ)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (DLW)
July 7, 2020 NOTICE to MDL Panel of possible MDL tag-along action. (DLW)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DLW)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0644-3134573, filed by Jerry E. Waterfill. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waterfill v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry E. Waterfill
Represented By: Milan Pucelj
Represented By: Alexander Cubberly Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?