Natural Grocers et al v. Perdue et al
Plaintiff: Natural Grocers, Good Earth Natural Foods, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Label GMOs, Puget Consumers Co-op, Center for Food Safety, Rural Vermont and National Organic Coalition
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Admin., USDA AMS Bruce Summers, Sec., USDA Sonny Perdue, Sonny Perdue and Bruce Summers
Intervenor Defendant: American Sugarbeet Growers Association, American Farm Bureau Federation and United States Beet Sugar Association
Case Number: 3:2020cv05151
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 58 REPLY (re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byCenter for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Good Earth Natural Foods, Label GMOs, National Organic Coalition, Natural Grocers, Puget Consumers Co-op, Rural Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 3/30/2022)
March 2, 2022 Filing 57 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAmerican Sugarbeet Growers Association, United States Beet Sugar Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment)(McCabe, Bridget) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
February 16, 2022 Filing 56 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed bySonny Perdue, Bruce Summers, United States Department of Agriculture. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
November 30, 2021 Filing 55 Defendant's Notice of Updated Certification of the Administrative Record by Sonny Perdue, Bruce Summers, United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Filed on 11/30/2021) Modified on 11/30/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Center for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Good Earth Natural Foods, Label GMOs, National Organic Coalition, Natural Grocers, Puget Consumers Co-op, Rural Vermont. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 2/16/2022. Replies due by 3/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Lewis, #2 Declaration of T. Cook-Littman, #3 Declaration of P. Larry, #4 Declaration of C. Gordon, #5 Declaration of C. Buxton, #6 Declaration of W. Allen, #7 Declaration of M. Squire, #8 Declaration of H. Bragman, #9 Declaration of A. Simpson, #10 Declaration of T. Bialic, #11 Declaration of A. Youngblood, #12 Declaration of R. Spector, #13 Declaration of W. Freese, #14 Declaration of B. Witherspoon, #15 Declaration of C. Woodcock, #16 Declaration of J. Glover, #17 Declaration of M. Stevenson, #18 Exhibit A to Decl of M. Stevenson, #19 Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/18/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 52 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION and Stipulation for an Enlargement of Time and to Exceed Page Limits filed by Sonny Perdue, Bruce Summers, United States Department of Agriculture, American Sugarbeet Growers Association, United States Beet Sugar Association. Responses due by 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Filed on 9/30/2021) Modified on 10/1/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE by Sonny Perdue, Bruce Summers, United States Department of Agriculture Notice of Production of Privilege Log (Wolfe, Kristina) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motion due by 3/31/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/2/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/2/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/26/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 47 Proposed Order by Sonny Perdue, Bruce Summers, United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/29/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE by Center for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Good Earth Natural Foods, Label GMOs, National Organic Coalition, Natural Grocers, Puget Consumers Co-op, Rural Vermont re #34 Case Management Statement, re submitted matter. (Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
March 25, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE by Sonny Perdue, Bruce Summers, United States Department of Agriculture of Production of Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Record Index, #2 Exhibit Certification of Administrative Record)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. The motion to intervene, Dkt. No. #29 , is suitable for decision on the papers. Civil L.R. 7-1(b). The motion hearing on January 7, 2021, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/4/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Geraldine Edens. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher H. Marraro. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY (re #29 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion, Motion to Intervene, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities of Proposed Intervenors United States Beet Sugar Association, American Sugarbeet Growers Association, and American Farm Bureau Federation CORRECTION ) filed byAmerican Farm Bureau Federation, American Sugarbeet Growers Association, United States Beet Sugar Association. (McCabe, Bridget) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY (re #29 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion, Motion to Intervene, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities of Proposed Intervenors United States Beet Sugar Association, American Sugarbeet Growers Association, and American Farm Bureau Federation CORRECTION ) filed bySonny Perdue, Bruce Summers, United States Department of Agriculture. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 38 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #29 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion, Motion to Intervene, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities of Proposed Intervenors United States Beet Sugar Association, American Sugarbeet Growers Association, and American Farm Bureau Federation CORRECTION ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 37 filed byCenter for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Good Earth Natural Foods, Label GMOs, National Organic Coalition, Natural Grocers, Puget Consumers Co-op, Rural Vermont. (Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Geraldine Edens ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15233946.) filed by American Sugarbeet Growers Association, United States Beet Sugar Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing)(Edens, Geraldine) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Christopher H. Marraro ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15233722.) filed by American Sugarbeet Growers Association, United States Beet Sugar Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Marraro, Christopher) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 34 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Center for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Good Earth Natural Foods, Label GMOs, National Organic Coalition, Natural Grocers, Puget Consumers Co-op, Rural Vermont. (Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 11/23/2020) Modified on 11/24/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel W. Wolff. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David Y. Chung. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Daniel W. Wolff ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15216225.) filed by American Farm Bureau Federation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Wolff, Daniel) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David Y. Chung ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15216132.) filed by American Farm Bureau Federation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Chung, David) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion, Motion to Intervene, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities of Proposed Intervenors United States Beet Sugar Association, American Sugarbeet Growers Association, and American Farm Bureau Federation CORRECTION OF DOCKET #26 filed by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Sugarbeet Growers Association, United States Beet Sugar Association. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/2/2020. Replies due by 12/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, Proposed Answer, #3 Declaration of John McCreedy, #4 Exhibit 1 to McCreedy Decl., #5 Declaration of Andrew Walmsley, #6 Exhibit 1 to Walmsley Decl., #7 Declaration of Daniel Younggren)(McCabe, Bridget) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Sugarbeet Growers Association, United States Beet Sugar Association Pursuant to Local Rule 3-15 and FRCP 7.1 (McCabe, Bridget) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Farm Bureau Federation Proposed Intervenor American Farm Bureau Federation's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (FRCP 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 26 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #29 *** MOTION to Intervene NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PROPOSED INTERVENORS UNITED STATES BEET SUGAR ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN SUGARBEET GROWERS ASSOCIATION, AND AMERICAN FARM BUREAU FEDERATION TO INTERVENE filed by American Sugarbeet Growers Association, United States Beet Sugar Association. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/30/2020. Replies due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Answer, #3 Declaration McCreedy, #4 Exhibit 1 - McCreedy Declaration, #5 Declaration Walmsley, #6 Exhibit 1 - Walmsley Declaration, #7 Declaration Younggren)(McCabe, Bridget) (Filed on 11/16/2020) Modified on 11/19/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint bySonny Perdue, Bruce Summers, United States Department of Agriculture. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Filed on 11/16/2020) Modified on 11/17/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget Springer McCabe on Behalf of Proposed Intervenors United States Beet Sugar Association and American Sugarbeet Growers Association (McCabe, Bridget) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Tomoko Kuwahara on Behalf of American Farm Bureau Federation (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. At the parties' joint request, Dkt. No. #21 , defendants may respond to the amended complaint by November 16, 2020. No later than November 23, 2020, the parties should submit a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. All other case management and ADR deadlines, including the initial case management conference, are vacated pending further order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/8/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Enlarge Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint and Joint Motion to Vacate ADR and Case Management Deadlines filed by Sonny Perdue, Bruce Summers, United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristina A. Wolfe)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Enlow (Enlow, Courtney) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byPuget Consumers Co-op, Label GMOs, Center for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Natural Grocers, Rural Vermont, Good Earth Natural Foods, National Organic Coalition. (Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint bySonny Perdue, Bruce Summers, United States Department of Agriculture. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Wolfe (Wolfe, Kristina) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
August 20, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. R e: #16 Certificate of Service, filed by Center for Food Safety, Rural Vermont, Label GMOs, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Natural Grocers, Good Earth Natural Foods, Puget Consumers Co-op. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Center for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Good Earth Natural Foods, Label GMOs, Natural Grocers, Puget Consumers Co-op, Rural Vermont. Defendants served on 8/6/20, answer due 10/5/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit of Receipts Verifying Service)(Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 8/19/2020) Modified on 8/20/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/14/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Good Earth Natural Foods, Label GMOs, Natural Grocers, Puget Consumers Co-op, Rural Vermont.. (Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14794670.) filed by Center for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Good Earth Natural Foods, Label GMOs, Natural Grocers, Puget Consumers Co-op, Rural Vermont. (Kimbrell, George) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14794601.) filed by Center for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Good Earth Natural Foods, Label GMOs, Natural Grocers, Puget Consumers Co-op, Rural Vermont. (van Saun, Amy) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sonny Perdue, Bruce Summers, United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/11/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Good Earth Natural Foods, Label GMOs, Natural Grocers, Puget Consumers Co-op, Rural Vermont (Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Good Earth Natural Foods, Label GMOs, Natural Grocers, Puget Consumers Co-op, Rural Vermont (Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14740596.). Filed byPuget Consumers Co-op, Label GMOs, Center for Food Safety, Citizens for GMO Labeling, Natural Grocers, Rural Vermont, Good Earth Natural Foods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevenson, Meredith) (Filed on 7/27/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Grocers et al v. Perdue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Kristina Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admin., USDA AMS Bruce Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sec., USDA Sonny Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Kristina Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Summers
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Kristina Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Grocers
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Earth Natural Foods
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens for GMO Labeling
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Label GMOs
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puget Consumers Co-op
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rural Vermont
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Organic Coalition
Represented By: Meredith Lee Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Sugarbeet Growers Association
Represented By: Christopher H. Marraro
Represented By: Geraldine E Edens
Represented By: Bridget Springer McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: David Chung
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Represented By: Daniel W Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: United States Beet Sugar Association
Represented By: Christopher H. Marraro
Represented By: Geraldine E Edens
Represented By: Bridget Springer McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?