Damner v. Facebook Incorporated
Plaintiff: Leland Damner
Defendant: Facebook Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv05177
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:20-cv-00911. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - The motion at ECF No. #9 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted insofar as it seeks the transfer of venue. The motion is denied without prejudice in all other respects. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall effect the transfer of this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 7/27/20. (EJA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Facebook Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bendor, Joshua)
July 20, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Paven Malhotra and Deeva Shah on behalf of Defendant Facebook Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 25, 2020 Filing 16 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date this order is docketed to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss at ECF No. #9 . Defendant shall file any reply within fifteen (15) days from the date Plaintiff's response to the motion is filed. The motion to dismiss shall be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 6/22/2020. (REK)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook Incorporated. (Bendor, Joshua)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 *MOTION to Dismiss Case AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Facebook Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bendor, Joshua). *Added MOTION to Transfer Venue on 6/17/2020 (EJA).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Defendant shall have until June 16, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The parties are referred to the information provided at ECF No. #3 with regard to the requirement that the parties complete the Magistrate Election form within 14 days of appearing in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 6/8/20. (EJA)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant Facebook's Responsive Pleadings by Facebook Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bendor, Joshua)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Facebook Incorporated. (LAD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (LAD)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX219149. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00911-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(LAD)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Leland Damner. (LAD) (2 pages)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX219149 filed by Leland Damner.(LAD) (12 pages)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damner v. Facebook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland Damner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Incorporated
Represented By: Joshua David R Bendor
Represented By: Deeva Shah
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?