Bitglass, Inc. v. Netskope, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bitglass, Inc.
Defendant: Joseph Green and Netskope, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05216
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bitglass, Inc.. Service waived by Joseph Green waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Cook, Noel) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bitglass, Inc.. Service waived by Netskope, Inc. waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Cook, Noel) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bitglass, Inc... (McFarlane, Robert) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/27/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Joseph Green, Netskope, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/13/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bitglass, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Capital Partners III, L.P., Other Affiliate Singtel Innov8 PTE Ltd., Other Affiliate Samsung Oak Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Future Fund for Bitglass, Inc.. (Cook, Noel) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cook, Noel) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Green, Netskope, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14751294.). Filed byBitglass, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cook, Noel) (Filed on 7/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bitglass, Inc. v. Netskope, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netskope, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bitglass, Inc.
Represented By: Noel Matthew Cook
Represented By: Robert Allan McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?