Jordan v. WP Company LLC
Plaintiff: Deborah Jordan
Defendant: WP Company LLC doing business as The Washington Post
Case Number: 3:2020cv05218
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by WP Company LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/5/2020. Replies due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klestoff, Alexei) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Sommer. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Zachary Lerner. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14925970.) filed by WP Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing)(Lerner, Zachary) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14925901.) filed by WP Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing)(Sommer, Jacob) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/27/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by WP Company LLC.. (Klestoff, Alexei) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #9 Stipulation: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 12/2/2020 01:30 PM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by WP Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nash Holdings LLC for WP Company LLC. (Klestoff, Alexei) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 #Electronic filing error.REMINDER: Counsel is reminded to update their ECF profile with updated address information. The court updated the address for this case only. Re: #8 Notic e of Appearance filed by WP Company LLC (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, to extend time to respond to Complaint and extend Case Management deadlines filed by WP Company LLC, Deborah Jordan. (Klestoff, Alexei) (Filed on 8/13/2020) Modified on 8/13/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexei Klestoff (Klestoff, Alexei) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deborah Jordan.. (Klorczyk, Frederick) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Jordan. WP Company LLC served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Deckant, Neal) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to WP Company LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/13/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Deckant, Neal) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against WP Company LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14751576.). Filed by Deborah Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Deckant, Neal) (Filed on 7/29/2020) Modified on 7/30/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. WP Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WP Company LLC doing business as The Washington Post
Represented By: Zachary S Lerner
Represented By: Alexei Klestoff
Represented By: Jacob Alan Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Jordan
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Frederick J. Klorczyk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?