Wright v. Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Wright
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05281
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Responses due by 9/30/2020. Replies due by 10/14/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: In light of the Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020, the Case Management Conference previously set for 10/29/2020 is reset to 11/19/2020 at 9:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion Hearing #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities reset to 10/29/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Briefing schedule remains the same. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 Renotice motion hearing re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Amended Notice of Hearing on Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint) filed byCharles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCharles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kimberly Landert, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kimberly Landert, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kimberly Landert, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kimberly Landert, #5 [Proposed] Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 9/14/2020. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc... (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Robert Wright (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Wright.. (Blood, Timothy) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Steven M. McKany (Withdrawing Darnell R. Donahue) (McKany, Steven) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, / STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Proof of Service) (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Adam Brown representing Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14765422.) filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Brown, Adam) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 11:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Defendant's Corrected Civil Cover Sheet). (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/14/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Please file an amended Civil Cover Sheet reflecting the corrected Plaintiffs name.#Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Charles Schwab Corporation for Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Charles Schwab Corporation for Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.'s Notice of Removal) from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-585092. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14759884). Filed byCharles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - POS on Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Notice & Summons, #4 Declaration of Sander Texel in Support of Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #5 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #5 *** Civil Cover Sheet)(Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 7/31/2020) Modified on 8/3/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wright
Represented By: Thomas Joseph O'Reardon, II
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Seely
Represented By: Steven M. McKany
Represented By: Darnell R. Donahue
Represented By: Aleksandr J. Yarmolinets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Powers
Represented By: Garrett R Wynne
Represented By: Adam A Brown
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Edmundo Clay Marquez
Represented By: Eric Arthur Ormsby
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?