In Defense of Animals et al v. Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Plaintiff: In Defense of Animals and Friends of the Earth, Inc.
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05293
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #28 ON PRELIMINARY SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/24/2020. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 29 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc.. (Glick, Michael) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re STIPULATED REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2 filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Glick, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Glick, Michael) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Elsner, Gretchen) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Glick, Michael) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Elsner, Gretchen) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 24 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2020. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RELATING CASES 17-03592 RS, 19-06570 RS and 20-05293 LB. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/19/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sanderson Farms, Inc... (Glick, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/27/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael A. Glick representing Defendant Sanderson Farms, Inc. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Gregg F. LoCascio representing Defendant Sanderson Farms, Inc. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14815361) filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Glick, Michael) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14815317) filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(LoCascio, Gregg) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Edward McKane (McKane, Mark) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Friends of the Earth, Inc., In Defense of Animals to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Elsner, Gretchen) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Friends of the Earth, Inc., In Defense of Animals. Service waived by Sanderson Farms, Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Elsner, Gretchen) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Defendant Sanderson Farms, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT FOR UNFAIR COMPETITION AND FALSE ADVERTISING - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1 against Sanderson Farms, Inc.. Filed by Friends of the Earth, Inc., In Defense of Animals. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Gretchen Elsner representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14761118) filed by Friends of the Earth, Inc., In Defense of Animals. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 PLAINTIFFS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Friends of the Earth, Inc., In Defense of Animals (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS FOR ALL PLAINTIFFS filed by Friends of the Earth, Inc., In Defense of Animals (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/14/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR UNFAIR COMPETITION AND FALSE ADVERTISING against Sanderson Farms, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14760914). Filed by Friends of the Earth, Inc., In Defense of Animals. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 7/31/2020) Modified on 8/3/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Defense of Animals et al v. Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Adam Glick
Represented By: Gregg LoCascio
Represented By: Mark Edward McKane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In Defense of Animals
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Gretchen Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth, Inc.
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Gretchen Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?