Uniloc 2017 LLC et al v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC and Uniloc USA, Inc.
Defendant: Google LLC
Petitioner: Uniloc Licensing USA LLC
Not Classified By Court: David Keyzer and Scott Woloson
Case Number: 3:2020cv05341
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 281 CLERK'S NOTICE re new case number in this Court. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 280 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00502. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2020 Filing 279 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Seth Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Jacobs, Aaron)
July 17, 2020 Filing 278 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #96 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED]. ORDERED that the above-captioned case be transferred to the Northern District of California. It is further ORDERED that the unreached deadlines in the Docket Control Order are VACATED. See Dkt. No. 276. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/19/2020. (ch, ) Modified on 6/19/2020 (ch, ).
June 10, 2020 Filing 276 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Stay Pending Transfer by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 8, 2020 Filing 275 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/26/20 (Telephonic Motion Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 6/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2020. (sholmes, )

June 8, 2020 Filing 274 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dan L Bagatell on behalf of Google LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7827274. (Bagatell, Dan)
June 5, 2020 Filing 273 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew T. Dufresne on behalf of Google LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7825710. (Dufresne, Andrew)
June 5, 2020 Filing 272 NOTICE by Google LLC SUBSTITUTION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Jones, Michael)
June 3, 2020 Filing 271 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/15/20 (Telephonic Motion Hearing) before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 6/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2020. (sholmes, )

June 2, 2020 Filing 270 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/14/20 (Telephonic Motion Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 6/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2020. (sholmes, )

June 1, 2020 Filing 269 SEALED RESPONSE by Uniloc 2017 LLC to #255 Sealed Patent Document Supplemental Statement of Confirmed Witnesses filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Etheridge, James)
May 28, 2020 Filing 267 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by James L Etheridge re #266 Transcript,,,. (Etheridge, James)
May 28, 2020 Filing 266 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/20 (Telephonic Motion Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 6/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2020. (sholmes, )

May 26, 2020 Filing 268 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 5/26/2020 re #203 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 265 NOTICE by Google LLC re #97 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue [RENEWED], #96 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] Notice of Request for Ruling on Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Transfer (Jones, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 264 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by James L Etheridge re #261 Transcript,,,. (Etheridge, James)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER denying #209 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel Discovery Responses Regarding Licensing and Agreements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/21/2020. (nkl, )
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER finding as moot #208 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/21/2020. (nkl, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 261 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/30/20 (Telephonic Motion Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 6/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2020. (sholmes, )

May 21, 2020 Filing 260 REDACTION to #254 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF CONFIRMED WITNESSES IN CONNECTION WITH GOOGLES MOTION TO TRANSFER by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 259 REDACTION to #255 Sealed Patent Document by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - TX Quarantine Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting #254 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Statement of Confirmed Witnesses in Connection with Google LLCs Motions to Transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/21/2020. (nkl, )
May 19, 2020 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #203 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Plaintiff's counsel if responsible for setting up the call.(bga, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 255 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF CONFIRMED WITNESSES IN CONNECTION WITH GOOGLES MOTION TO TRANSFER (DKT. 54). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - TX Quarantine Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 19, 2020 Filing 254 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF CONFIRMED WITNESSES IN CONNECTION WITH GOOGLES MOTION TO TRANSFER by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 15, 2020 Filing 257 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 5/15/2020 re #205 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DILIGENCE AND FINANCIAL INTEREST INGTERROGATORIES filed by Google LLC, #204 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL UNILOC TO SUBSTANTIVELY RESPOND TO GOOGLE'S INVALIDITY AND PATENT ELIGIBILITY INTERROGATORIES filed by Google LLC, #202 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code Tree Structure filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 256 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Status Teleconference held on 5/14/2020. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER denying #207 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL UNILOC TO SUBSTANTIVELY RESPOND TO GOOGLE'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/14/2020. (ch, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 252 RESPONSE to #251 Notice (Other) regarding trial schedule filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Etheridge, James)
May 14, 2020 Filing 251 NOTICE by Google LLC NOTICE OF SUBMISSION REGARDING TRIAL SCHEDULE (Jones, Michael)
May 7, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection RESET for 8/3/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***Please note that the DATE has changed.***(jml)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORAL ORDER finding as moot #181 Motion for Protective Order in light of the guidance provided during the hearing held on April 20, 2020. See Dkt. No. 240. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/4/2020. (rsp2, ) Modified on 5/7/2020 (klc, ).
May 1, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Teleconference set for 5/14/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for setting up conference call. (bga, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 249 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Status Conference held on 4/30/2020. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 247 SEALED RESPONSE by Uniloc 2017 LLC to #241 Sealed Patent Document filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Etheridge, James)
April 29, 2020 Filing 246 REDACTION to #241 Sealed Patent Document by Google LLC. (Jones, Michael)
April 29, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Teleconference set for 4/30/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 245 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy Ann Stitt on behalf of Google LLC (Stitt, Tracy)
April 29, 2020 Filing 244 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Israel Sasha Mayergoyz on behalf of Google LLC (Mayergoyz, Israel)
April 29, 2020 Filing 243 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Christopher Hendershot on behalf of Google LLC (Hendershot, Michael)
April 29, 2020 Filing 242 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tharan Gregory Lanier on behalf of Google LLC (Lanier, Tharan)
April 27, 2020 Filing 248 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Status Conference held on 4/27/2020. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 241 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF POTENTIALLY COMPARABLE LICENSES IN CONNECTION WITH GOOGLE'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES REGARDING LICENSES [DKT. 209]. (Jones, Michael)
April 24, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #204 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL UNILOC TO SUBSTANTIVELY RESPOND TO GOOGLE'S INVALIDITY AND PATENT ELIGIBILITY INTERROGATORIES : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for setting up conference call. (bga, )
April 24, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #205 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DILIGENCE AND FINANCIAL INTEREST INGTERROGATORIES, #203 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, #202 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code Tree Structure : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for setting up conference call. (bga, )
April 22, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Teleconference RESET for 4/27/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
April 21, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Teleconference set for 4/24/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for setting up conference call.(bga, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 240 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/20/2020 re #186 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order against non-party subpoenas filed by Uniloc Licensing USA LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 239 REDACTION to #232 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration - Redacted, #2 Exhibit A: Redacted in its Entirety, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 20, 2020 Filing 238 REDACTION to #227 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CASE-SPECIFIC DEPOSITION TOPIC NOS. 79-86 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - 2020-03-14 Google 502's Objections and Responses to Uniloc's 30(b)(6) Notice_Redacted, #3 Exhibit B - 2020-04-09 Google 502's Objections and Responses to Uniloc's Supplemental 30(b)(6) Notices_Redacted, #4 Exhibit C - Topics 79-86 Chart Exhibit_Redacted, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 17, 2020 Filing 237 REDACTION to #226 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TOPIC NOS. 1-9, 11-18, 20-56 AND 59-78 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jones Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - 2020-03-13 Google Objections to Uniloc 30(b)(6) Notice Redacted, #3 Exhibit B - 2020-04-08 (493) Google's Objections and Responses to 30(b)(6) Topic Nos 73-85, #4 Exhibit C - Redacted in its entirety, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 16, 2020 Filing 236 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #205 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DILIGENCE AND FINANCIAL INTEREST INGTERROGATORIES filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
April 16, 2020 Filing 235 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #207 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL UNILOC TO SUBSTANTIVELY RESPOND TO GOOGLE'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
April 16, 2020 Filing 234 RESPONSE in Opposition re #209 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES REGARDING LICENSING filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 233 RESPONSE in Opposition re #208 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES NOS. 1 AND 6 (PRIORITY DATE) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 232 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #203 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - 3-31-20 Drayton Ltr, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 16, 2020 Filing 231 RESPONSE in Opposition re #204 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL UNILOC TO SUBSTANTIVELY RESPOND TO GOOGLE'S INVALIDITY AND PATENT ELIGIBILITY INTERROGATORIES filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 230 RESPONSE in Opposition re #206 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO GOOGLE'S INFRINGEMENT INTERROGATORIES NOS 14 AND 17 filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 229 RESPONSE in Opposition re #202 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code Tree Structure filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Jones, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clutter, Patrick)
April 15, 2020 Filing 228 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
April 15, 2020 Filing 227 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CASE-SPECIFIC DEPOSITION TOPIC NOS. 79-86 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - 2020-03-14 Google 502's Objections and Responses to Uniloc's 30(b)(6) Notice, #3 Exhibit B - 2020-04-09 Google 502's Objections and Responses to Uniloc's Supplemental 30(b)(6) Notices, #4 Exhibit C - Topics 79-86 Chart Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Filing 226 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TOPIC NOS. 1-9, 11-18, 20-56 AND 59-78 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jones Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - 2020-03-13 (493) Google Objections to Uniloc 30(b)(6) Notice, #3 Exhibit B - 2020-04-08 (493) Google's Objections and Responses to 30(b)(6) Topic Nos 73-85, #4 Exhibit C - 2020-03-16 Uniloc's Objections to Google's Amended 30(b)(6) Notices (omnibus), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 8, 2020 Filing 225 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Frances Litle on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Litle, Monica)
April 4, 2020 Filing 224 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc Licensing USA LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. JOINT REPORT ON MEET AND CONFER OBLIGATIONS RELATING TO DISCOVERY DISPUTES (Etheridge, James)
April 3, 2020 Filing 223 REDACTION to #202 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code Tree Structure by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
April 3, 2020 Filing 222 REDACTION to #209 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES REGARDING LICENSING by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 221 REDACTION to #203 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
April 3, 2020 Filing 220 REDACTION to #208 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES NOS. 1 AND 6 (PRIORITY DATE) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 219 REDACTION to #207 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL UNILOC TO SUBSTANTIVELY RESPOND TO GOOGLE'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 218 REDACTION to #206 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO GOOGLE'S INFRINGEMENT INTERROGATORIES NOS 14 AND 17 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 217 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley David Liddle on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Liddle, Bradley)
April 3, 2020 Filing 216 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Minghui Yang on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Yang, Minghui)
April 3, 2020 Filing 215 REDACTION to #204 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL UNILOC TO SUBSTANTIVELY RESPOND TO GOOGLE'S INVALIDITY AND PATENT ELIGIBILITY INTERROGATORIES by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jones Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 214 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Leon Carter on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Carter, Edgar)
April 3, 2020 Filing 213 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File #209 Motion to Compel by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 212 REDACTION to #205 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DILIGENCE AND FINANCIAL INTEREST INGTERROGATORIES by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 2, 2020 Filing 211 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Linda R Stahl on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Stahl, Linda)
April 2, 2020 Filing 210 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua James Bennett on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Bennett, Joshua)
April 2, 2020 Filing 209 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES REGARDING LICENSING by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 1, 2020 Filing 208 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES NOS. 1 AND 6 (PRIORITY DATE) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 1, 2020 Filing 207 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL UNILOC TO SUBSTANTIVELY RESPOND TO GOOGLE'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 1, 2020 Filing 206 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO GOOGLE'S INFRINGEMENT INTERROGATORIES NOS 14 AND 17 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Exhibit A: Inf Rogs, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 1, 2020 Filing 205 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DILIGENCE AND FINANCIAL INTEREST INGTERROGATORIES by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 1, 2020 Filing 204 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL UNILOC TO SUBSTANTIVELY RESPOND TO GOOGLE'S INVALIDITY AND PATENT ELIGIBILITY INTERROGATORIES by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jones Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 1, 2020 Filing 203 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
April 1, 2020 Filing 202 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Source Code Tree Structure by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
April 1, 2020 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Hearing on Motion #186 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order against non-party subpoenas : Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for setting up conference call. Contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call. The Court's telephone number is 903-935-2498.(bga, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 201 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Wayne Breedlove on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Breedlove, Scott)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER Memorializing Rulings on Discovery Motions re #154 Motion to Compel Identification and Production of Financial Documents; #156 Sealed Motion to Compel Damages-Related Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/27/2020. (nkl, )
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #153 Motion to Strike Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/26/2020. (nkl, )
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER re #149 Memorandum & Opinion, #158 Objection to Claim Construction filed by Google LLC. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/23/2020. (nkl, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 197 REDACTION to #195 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -December subpoena email, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 17, 2020 Filing 196 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceedings held on 03/12/2020 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 4/7/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2020. (sms, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 195 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #186 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order against non-party subpoenas filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -December subpoena email, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 194 Emergency MOTION OPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER TO FORBID DEPOSITIONS FOR A LIMITED TIME PERIOD TO AVOID COVID-19 by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of James Etheridge, #2 Exhibit A - CNN March 3 Coronavirus Article, #3 Exhibit B - Governor Newsom Declares State of Emergency, #4 Exhibit C -- Santa Clara County Directive, #5 Exhibit D - Google CEO Tweet, #6 Exhibit E -- WHO Pandemic, #7 Exhibit F -- White House Santa Clara Community, #8 Exhibit G -- Mountain View Emergency Declaration, #9 Exhibit H -- Palo Alto Emergency Proclamation, #10 Exhibit I -- Big Tech Firms Article, #11 Exhibit J -- White House Press Conference,, #12 Exhibit K -- Ltr from M. Jones to J. Etheridge of 03-12-2002, #13 Exhibit L -- NPR Article re Flattening a Curve, #14 Exhibit M -- Military Travel Ban, #15 Exhibit N -- White House March 14 Press Conference, #16 Exhibit O -- Marshall Suspends Schools, #17 Exhibit P -- Marshall Suspends Events Article, #18 Exhibit Q -- Mercury News Article, #19 Exhibit R -- CNN March 15 Article, #20 Exhibit S -- NBC News Fauci Interview, #21 Exhibit T -- SCOTUS Press Release, #22 Exhibit U -- CNN March 16 Article, #23 Exhibit V -- CNN Asymptomatic Article, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #191 Motion for Withdrawal of Documents withdrawing #152 Motion to Compel; finding as moot #155 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/16/2020. (nkl, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 150) in light of Notice of Withdrawal (Dkt. No. 188) (no documents attached). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/16/2020. (rsp1, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 192 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2020 re #156 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Damages-Related Documents filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, #153 Opposed MOTION to Strike Invalidity Contentions filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, #154 Opposed MOTION to Compel Identification and Production of Financial Documents filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 191 Unopposed MOTION for Withdrawal of Documents re #152 Opposed MOTION to Compel Noninfringement Documents by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
March 12, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 189, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 190 STIPULATION Production of Subpoenaed Third Party Communication by Google LLC. (Jones, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Filing 189 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC re #152 Opposed MOTION to Compel Noninfringement Documents OF WITHDRAWAL (Etheridge, James) Modified on 3/12/2020 (nkl, ).
March 10, 2020 Filing 188 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC re #150 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Properly Verified Interrogatory Answers . Notice of Withdrawal of the Motion (Loveless, Ryan)
March 7, 2020 Filing 187 REDACTION to #186 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order against non-party subpoenas by Uniloc Licensing USA LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Travis Richins, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
March 3, 2020 Filing 186 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order against non-party subpoenas by Uniloc Licensing USA LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Richins Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
February 21, 2020 Filing 185 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #153 Opposed MOTION to Strike Invalidity Contentions filed by Google LLC. (Clutter, Patrick)
February 21, 2020 Filing 184 RESPONSE in Opposition re #181 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order from 30(b)(6) notice filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Jones Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #157 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/19/2020. (klc, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 182 REPLY to Response to Motion re #157 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #92 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Etheridge, James)
February 18, 2020 Filing 181 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order from 30(b)(6) notice by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
February 14, 2020 Filing 180 REPLY to Response to Motion re #153 Opposed MOTION to Strike Invalidity Contentions filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Loveless, Ryan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 177 REPLY to Response to Motion re #150 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Properly Verified Interrogatory Answers filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Loveless, Ryan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 179 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 1/10/2020 before Judge Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tammy Goolsby, CSR. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Motion to Redact due 3/4/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2020. (klc, )
February 12, 2020 Filing 178 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 01/10/2020 before Judge Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tammy Goolsby, CSR. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Motion to Redact due 3/4/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2020. (klc, )
February 12, 2020 Filing 176 REDACTION to #156 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Damages-Related Documents by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 175 REDACTION to #155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Communications with Third Parties by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
February 12, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 172, REDACTED DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 174 REDACTION to #161 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, CORRECTED by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 2020-02-11 REDACTED 161-1 SEALED Soni Dec ISO Response to MTC_Redacted, #2 Ex A - Redacted in its entirety, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 173 REDACTION to #162 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 2020-02-11 REDACTED Dkt. 162-1 SEALED Soni Decl ISO Response to Noninfringement MTC_Redacted, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 172 ***FILED IN ERROR***REDACTION to #161 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 2020-02-11 REDACTED 161-1 SEALED Soni Dec ISO Response to MTC_Redacted, #2 Exhibit A 01-23-2020 J. Drayton Letter re Meet and Confer, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 2/12/2020 (ch, ).
February 11, 2020 Filing 171 REDACTION to #165 Sealed Response to Motion to Compel re Damages Related Discovery by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 170 REDACTION to #163 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Soni Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - 1-23-2020 Letter re Uniloc's Motion to Strike Invalidity Contentions, #3 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence, #4 Exhibit C - 1-23-2020 J. Drayton Letter re Google's Invalidity Contentions, #5 Exhibit D - 05-06-2019 Uniloc's Infringement Contentions Cover Pleading, #6 Exhibit E - Exhibit 1 - U.S. 8,918,812 to Hayward Invalidity Claim Chart, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Clutter, Patrick)
February 11, 2020 Filing 169 REDACTION to #164 Sealed Response to Motion to Compel Discovery (Dkt. 155) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 168 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #92 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clutter, Patrick)
February 11, 2020 Filing 167 STATUS REPORT ON MEET AND CONFER OBLIGATIONS RELATING TO DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Google LLC. (Thames, Earl)
February 7, 2020 Filing 166 REDACTION to #159 Sealed Response to Motion, Motion to Compel Properly Verified Interrogatories by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Exhibit A: Correspondence, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 165 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #156 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Damages-Related Documents filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 164 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Communications with Third Parties filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 163 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #153 Opposed MOTION to Strike Invalidity Contentions filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Soni Declaration ISO Response to Uniloc Motion to Strike Invalidity Contentions, #2 Exhibit A - 1-23-2020 Letter re Uniloc's Motion to Strike Invalidity Contentions, #3 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence, #4 Exhibit C - 1-23-2020 J. Drayton Letter re Google's Invalidity Contentions, #5 Exhibit D - 05-06-2019 Uniloc's Infringement Contentions Cover Pleading, #6 Exhibit E - Exhibit 1 - U.S. 8,918,812 to Hayward Invalidity Claim Chart, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 162 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #152 Opposed MOTION to Compel Noninfringement Documents filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Soni Decl ISO Response to Noninfringement MTC, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 161 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #154 Opposed MOTION to Compel Identification and Production of Financial Documents filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Soni Declaration ISO Response to Uniloc Motion to Compel Financial Docs, #2 Exhibit A 01-23-2020 J. Drayton Letter re Meet and Confer, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #152 Opposed MOTION to Compel Noninfringement Documents, #155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Communications with Third Parties, #156 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Damages-Related Documents, #153 Opposed MOTION to Strike Invalidity Contentions, #154 Opposed MOTION to Compel Identification and Production of Financial Documents, #150 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Properly Verified Interrogatory Answers : Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 160 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended(Folsom, David)
February 5, 2020 Filing 159 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #150 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Properly Verified Interrogatory Answers filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Soni Declaration, #2 Exhibit A: Correspondence)(Jones, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2020: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
February 4, 2020 Filing 158 OBJECTION TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Laud Declaration ISO Claim Construction Objections, #2 Ex. A to Laud Declaration ISO Google's Objections to Claim Construction Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 28, 2020 Filing 157 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #92 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
January 24, 2020 Filing 156 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Damages-Related Documents by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
January 23, 2020 Filing 155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Communications with Third Parties by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Joseph Drayton, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
January 22, 2020 Filing 154 Opposed MOTION to Compel Identification and Production of Financial Documents by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
January 22, 2020 Filing 153 Opposed MOTION to Strike Invalidity Contentions by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Responses due by 2/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Declaration of Ryan Loveless, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
January 22, 2020 Filing 152 Opposed MOTION to Compel Noninfringement Documents by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER - Court has received Mr. Keyzers invoice for services through January 14, 2020, the court hereby ORDERS payment to be promptly made as follows herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/22/2020. (ch, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 150 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Properly Verified Interrogatory Answers by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/20/2020. (ch, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 148 REDACTION to #146 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Etheridge, James)
January 14, 2020 Filing 147 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Google LLC for proceedings held on 1/10/20 before Judge Payne. (Jones, Michael) (Main Document 147 replaced with flattened image on 1/14/2020) (bas). (Forwarded to court reporter Tammy Goolsby on 1/14/2020) (bas)
January 13, 2020 Filing 146 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #96 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Etheridge, James)
January 10, 2020 Filing 145 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 1/10/2020. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (bga, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Naina Soni on behalf of Google LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7604296. (Soni, Naina)
January 3, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Etheridge, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 142 REDACTION to #139 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,,, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Whelan Declaration, #2 Acharya Declaration, #3 Exhibit AAA - Redacted in its entirety, #4 Exhibit AAB - Redacted in its entirety, #5 Exhibit AAC - Redacted in its entirety, #6 Exhibit AAD - Redacted in its entirety, #7 Exhibit AAE - Redacted in its entirety, #8 Exhibit AAF - DN stats (1-1-16), #9 Exhibit AAG - Redacted in its entirety)(Clutter, Patrick)
January 1, 2020 Filing 141 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC re #125 Order,, (Notice of Compliance) (Loveless, Ryan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 140 Claim Construction Chart per 4-5(d) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint 4-5(d) claim construction chart)(Etheridge, James)
December 30, 2019 Filing 139 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #96 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Whelan Declaration, #2 Acharya Declaration, #3 Exhibit AAA - 2019.10.03 Objections to 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Topics to Uniloc 2017 LLC, #4 Exhibit AAB - 2019.10.17 - Response to Google October 10 letter re 30(b)(6), #5 Exhibit AAC - 2019.10.10 - Follow-Up Letter to Etchegoyen Deposition, #6 Exhibit AAD - 2019.07.26 Fortress Investment Group Subpoena, #7 Exhibit AAE - Patrick Orr - Confidential_mini [excerpted], #8 Exhibit AAF - DN stats (1-1-16), #9 Exhibit AAG - Anindya Dutta - Confidential_mini [excerpted])(Jones, Michael)
December 21, 2019 Filing 138 REPLY to #130 Consolidated Claim Construction Brief filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Etheridge, James)
December 18, 2019 Filing 137 REDACTION to #135 Sealed Response to Motion to Transfer Venue by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
December 14, 2019 Filing 136 Responsive CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Jones, #2 Ex. 1 - 493 US6836654, #3 Ex. 2 - 493 US5913175, #4 Ex. 3 - 493 Declaration of J. Nicholas Laneman, #5 Ex. 4 - US8194632, #6 Ex. 5 - Excerpts of Microsoft Computer Dictionary Fifth Edition, #7 Ex. 6 - Computer Hope Glossary - Terminal, #8 Ex. 7 - Apple Inc. v. Uniloc 2017 LLC- Paper 6, #9 Ex. 8 - February 18, 2010 Response to Office Action - App. No. 11_288,505, #10 Ex. 9 - 499 Laneman Declaration, #11 Ex. 10 - US 8407609, #12 Ex. 11 - Random House Concise Dictionary of Science & Computers (c) 2004 (web page), #13 Ex. 12 - Oxford Dictionary of Computing, 6th Ed. (web page), #14 Ex. 13 - Newton's Telecom Dictionary, 24th Ed. (web page), #15 Ex. 14 - 2019-11-05 Declaration of Henry Houh ISO Google's Claim Constructions, #16 Ex. 15 - 609 File History)(Jones, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 135 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #96 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re #131 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Schedule on 1404 Venue Briefing filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/9/2019. (nkl, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER re #131 Motion to Modify Schedule on 1404 Venue Briefing; re #132 Motion to Modify Markman Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/9/2019. (nkl, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 132 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Markman Briefing Schedule by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 131 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Schedule on 1404 Venue Briefing by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 130 CONSOLIDATED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Loveless, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Loveless, Ryan)
November 30, 2019 Filing 129 REDACTION to #127 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, Google's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Loveless, #2 Exhibit A)(Etheridge, James)
November 27, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google LLC regarding Compliance with Privilege Log (Jones, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 127 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #97 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue [RENEWED] filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Dispute Agreement, #2 Exhibit Second Loveless Declaration with Ex. A)(Etheridge, James)
November 26, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE by Google LLC of Compliance regarding Technology Tutorial (Jones, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER - The Court hereby appoints Scott Woloson and David Keyzer as the Courts technical advisors in this case. Scott Woloson will serve as the technical advisor for the 6,952,450; 6,329,934; 6,519,005; and 6,452,515 patents (Group 1) as well as the 6,473,114 and 9,141,489 patents (Group 2). David Keyzer will serve as the technical advisor for the 7,016,676; 6,349,154; 8,949,954; 6,836,654; 8,194,632; and 8,407,609 patents (Group 3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/25/2019. (ch, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying as moot #87 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/25/2019. (ch, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 123 REDACTION to #121 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,,,,, DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND IMPROPER VENUE by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Clark Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. MM - McCallion DDT Depo (FULLY REDACTED), #3 Exhibit Ex. NN - Ex. 17 to Opposition (FULLY REDACTED), #4 Exhibit Ex. OO - Ex. 19 to Opposition (PUBLIC) - 2, #5 Exhibit EX. PP - Ex. H with Bates Number (FULLY REDACTED - 2, #6 Exhibit Ex. QQ -(Pandian Depo) (FULLY REDACTED), #7 Exhibit Ex. RR - Livingston Deposition Transcript (FULLY REDACTED), #8 Exhibit Ex. SS Parts 1 and 2 - Ex. 8 to Opposition (FULLY REDACTED), #9 Exhibit Ex. TT Parts 1-3 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (FULLY REDACTED), #10 Exhibit Ex. UU - Ex. G with Bates Number (PUBLIC), #11 Exhibit Ex. VV - Ex. L with Bates Number (FULLY REDACTED), #12 Exhibit Ex. WW - Fractus v. ZTE (PUBLIC), #13 Exhibit Ex. XX, DDT v Qualcomm Order (PUBLIC), #14 Exhibit Ex. YY, USPN 3,711,262 (PUBLIC), #15 Exhibit Ex. ZZ, HowStuffWorks (PUBLIC))(Jones, Michael)
November 22, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 1/10/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER re #117 Notice (Other) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/22/2019. (nkl, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 121 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #97 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue [RENEWED] filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Clark Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. MM - McCallion DDT Depo (UNDER SEAL), #3 Exhibit Ex. NN - Ex. 17 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit Ex. OO - Ex. 19 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL) - 2, #5 Exhibit EX. PP - Ex. H with Bates Number (UNDER SEAL) - 2, #6 Exhibit Ex. QQ -(Pandian Depo) (UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit Ex. RR - Livingston Deposition Transcript (UNDER SEAL), #8 Exhibit Ex. SS Part 1 - Ex. 8 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #9 Exhibit Ex. SS Part 2 - Ex. 8 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #10 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 1 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #11 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 2 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #12 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 3 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #13 Exhibit Ex. UU - Ex. G with Bates Number (PUBLIC), #14 Exhibit Ex. VV - Ex. L with Bates Number (UNDER SEAL), #15 Exhibit Ex. WW - Fractus v. ZTE (PUBLIC), #16 Exhibit Ex. XX, DDT v Qualcomm Order (PUBLIC), #17 Exhibit Ex. YY, USPN 3,711,262 (PUBLIC), #18 Exhibit Ex. ZZ, HowStuffWorks (PUBLIC))(Jones, Michael)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion submitted document #120 does not contain a Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal per Local Rule CV-5(a)(7)(A). Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 120 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #97 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue [RENEWED] filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Clark Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. MM - McCallion DDT Depo (UNDER SEAL), #3 Exhibit Ex. NN - Ex. 17 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit Ex. OO - Ex. 19 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL) - 2, #5 Exhibit EX. PP - Ex. H with Bates Number (UNDER SEAL) - 2, #6 Exhibit Ex. QQ -(Pandian Depo) (UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit Ex. RR - Livingston Deposition Transcript (UNDER SEAL), #8 Exhibit Ex. SS Part 1 - Ex. 8 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #9 Exhibit Ex. SS Part 2 - Ex. 8 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #10 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 1 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #11 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 2 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #12 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 3 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #13 Exhibit Ex. UU - Ex. G with Bates Number (PUBLIC), #14 Exhibit Ex. VV - Ex. L with Bates Number (UNDER SEAL), #15 Exhibit Ex. WW - Fractus v. ZTE (PUBLIC), #16 Exhibit Ex. XX, DDT v Qualcomm Order (PUBLIC), #17 Exhibit Ex. YY, USPN 3,711,262 (PUBLIC), #18 Exhibit Ex. ZZ, HowStuffWorks (PUBLIC))(Jones, Michael) Modified on 11/20/2019 (nkl, ).
November 18, 2019 Filing 119 REDACTION to #118 Sealed Patent Document Joint Status Report by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Fully Redacted)(Jones, Michael)
November 16, 2019 Filing 118 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Joint Status Report. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Non Dispute Agreement)(Jones, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC re #109 Order (Etheridge, James)
November 12, 2019 Filing 116 REDACTION to #115 Sealed Response to Motion Google's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 115 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #97 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue [RENEWED] filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 114 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 11/7/2019 re #87 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (bga, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #112 Motion to Modify Briefing on 1404 Venue Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/7/2019. (nkl, )
November 7, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 106, SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ITS RULE 30(B)(6) NOTICE AND STANDING AND VENUE-RELATED REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION re #104 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, modify briefing schedule as to 1404 issues only by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 111 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Loveless, Ryan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 110 REDACTION to #106 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ITS RULE 30(B)(6) NOTICE AND STANDING AND VENUE-RELATED REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 [redacted] Tse Declaration ISO MTC, #2 [redacted] Exhibit A - [excerpted] 10-4-19 Etch deposition, #3 [redacted] Proposed Order Granting MTC)(Jones, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER - The Court enters this Order to address the upcoming schedule for Markman proceedings in Uniloc v. Google proceedings before the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/31/2019. (nkl, )
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #105 Motion to Allow Lead Counsel to Appear Telephonically at November 7, 2019 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/30/2019. (nkl, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 107 STATUS REPORT JOINT REPORT ON MEET AND CONFER OBLIGATIONS RELATING TO DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Etheridge, James)
October 30, 2019 Filing 106 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ITS RULE 30(B)(6) NOTICE AND STANDING AND VENUE-RELATED REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tse Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - [excerpted] 10-4-19 Etch deposition, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 11/7/2019 (nkl, ).
October 29, 2019 Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION to Allow Lead Counsel to Appear Telephonically at November 7, 2019 Hearing re #87 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files, Notice of Hearing on Motion by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clutter, Patrick)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #96 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED], #97 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue [RENEWED] Responses due by 11/8/2019 Replies due by 11/19/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/29/2019. (nkl, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 103 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #97 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue [RENEWED], #96 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
October 25, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #87 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files : Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying as moot #54 Sealed Patent Motion; denying as moot #21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/24/2019. (ch, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 101 REDACTION to #97 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue [RENEWED] by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Doak Dec., #2 Affidavit ClarkDec., #3 Exhibit Exhibit _A - BMC v. Cherwell VAED-1-17-cv-01074_Dkt. 55 (PUBLIC), #4 Exhibit Exhibit _B - Orr Declaration (PUBLIC), #5 Exhibit Exhibit _C - March 21 2019 Lim - Uniloc Declaration (PUBLIC), #6 Exhibit Exhibit _D -RSA Excerpts_Fully Redacted, #7 Exhibit Exhibit _E -Fortress License Agreement_Fully Redacted, #8 Exhibit Exhibit _F - Erez Levy Depo_Fully Redacted, #9 Exhibit Exhibit _G - Drake Turner Depo_Fully Redacted, #10 Exhibit Exhibit _H - Mgmt Report year ended 30 June 2017_Fully Redacted, #11 Exhibit Exhibit _I - Third Amendment to RSA_Fully Redacted, #12 Exhibit Exhibit _J - IPR2013-0039_Fully Redacted, #13 Exhibit Exhibit _K - E.D. Tex. 14-cv-00625 dckt (PUBLIC), #14 Exhibit Exhibit _L - Asset Purchase Agreement_Fully Redacted, #15 Exhibit Exhibit _M - Termination Agreement_Fully Redacted, #16 Exhibit Exhibit _N - Payoff and Termination Agreement_Fully Redacted, #17 Exhibit Exhibit _O - Patent Assignment_Fully Redacted, #18 Exhibit Exhibit _P.1 - Etchegoyen Depo_Fully Redacted, #19 Exhibit Exhibit _Q - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple MTD_Fully Redacted, #20 Exhibit Exhibit _R - Palmer Declarations_Fully Redacted, #21 Exhibit Exhibit _S - _2017-to-Licensing License_Fully Redacted, #22 Exhibit Exhibit _T - Amended 2017-to-Licensing License_Fully Redacted, #23 Exhibit Exhibit _U - Amended and Restated Note Purchase and Security_Fully Redacted, #24 Exhibit Exhibit _V - Etchegoyen Depo Notice (PUBLIC), #25 Exhibit Exhibit _W - McCallion First MTD Declaration (PUBLIC), #26 Exhibit Exhibit _X - McCallion Deposition_Fully Redacted, #27 Exhibit Exhibit _Y - Draining Ticket (Ex. 3 to McCallion Depo)_Fully Redacte, #28 Exhibit Exhibit _Z - 2019-10-15 McCallion Declaration_Fully Redacted, #29 Exhibit Exhibit AA - ISP Emails_Fully Redacted, #30 Exhibit Exhibit BB - MasterMind Charts_Fully Redacted, #31 Exhibit Exhibit CC - Arscott Declaration Signed (PUBLIC), #32 Exhibit Exhibit DD - T-Mobile Agreement_Fully Redacted, #33 Exhibit Exhibit EE - Sprint Agreement_Fully Redacted, #34 Exhibit Exhibit FF - Joshua Cha (megaport) Declaration Signed (PUBLIC), #35 Exhibit Exhibit GG - Signed Krause Declaration Re Express (PUBLIC), #36 Text of Proposed Order)(Clutter, Patrick)
October 23, 2019 Filing 100 REDACTION to #96 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Tekell, #2 Declaration of J. Vallery, #3 Declaration of D. Acharya, #4 Declaration of R. Whelan, #5 A - Redacted in its Entirety, #6 B - Redacted in its Entirety, #7 Exhibit C - Lim Declaration, #8 D - Redacted in its Entirety, #9 E - Redacted in its Entirety, #10 Exhibit F - Turner LinkedIn, #11 Exhibit G - TXED-2-17-cv-00258-104 (excerpted), #12 H - Redacted in its Entirety, #13 I - Redacted in its Entirety, #14 Exhibit J - Etchegoyen LinkedIn, #15 Exhibit K - SOS search result re Uniloc 2017, #16 Exhibit L - Burdick 258 deposition (excerpted), #17 M - Redacted in its Entirety, #18 N - Redacted in its Entirety, #19 O - Redacted in its Entirety, #20 P - Redacted in its Entirety, #21 Q - Redacted in its Entirety, #22 R - Redacted in its Entirety, #23 S - Redacted in its Entirety, #24 T - Redacted in its Entirety, #25 U - Redacted in its Entirety, #26 V - Redacted in its Entirety, #27 Exhibit W - Meisinger LinkedIn, #28 X - Redacted in its Entirety, #29 Exhibit Y - Fortress location, #30 Z- Redacted in its Entirety, #31 zExhibit AA - D. Del. 19-mc-00202 dckt 000001_000 filed 2019-08-14, #32 AB - Redacted in its Entirety, #33 AC - Redacted in its Entirety, #34 AD - Redacted in its Entirety, #35 zExhibit AE - Levy -360 deposition (excerpted), #36 zExhibit AF - Turner -360 deposition (excerpted), #37 AG - Redacted in its Entirety, #38 AH - Redacted in its Entirety, #39 AI - Redacted in its Entirety, #40 AJ - Redacted in its Entirety, #41 AK - Redacted in its Entirety, #42 AL - Redacted in its Entirety, #43 AM - Redacted in its Entirety, #44 AN - Redacted in its Entirety, #45 AO - Redacted in its Entirety, #46 AP - Redacted in its Entirety, #47 zExhibit AQ - Table C-5, #48 zExhibit AR - fcms_na_distprofile0630.2019, #49 zExhibit AS - Tod Turner - Chief Executive Officer - Intercept Music _ LinkedIn, #50 zExhibit AT - Ronald Jacoby - Vice President - Verizon Digital Media Services, #51 zExhibit AU - Hulu - Santa Monica Headquarters - Office Snapshots, #52 zExhibit AV - Amazon Our global offices, #53 zExhibit AW - Microsoft Corporate Address, #54 Text of Proposed Order)(Clutter, Patrick)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Redactions to Renewed Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/23/2019. (nkl, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Redactions to Renewed Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Transfer Venue by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 97 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue [RENEWED] by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Clark, #2 Declaration of D. Doak, #3 Exhibit _A - BMC v. Cherwell VAED-1-17-cv-01074_Dkt. 55, #4 Exhibit _B - Orr Declaration, #5 Exhibit _C - March 21 2019 Lim - Uniloc Declaration, #6 Exhibit _D -RSA Excerpts, #7 Exhibit _E -Fortress License Agreement, #8 Exhibit _F - Erez Levy Depo, #9 Exhibit _G - Drake Turner Depo, #10 Exhibit _H - Management Report for year ended 30 June 2017, #11 Exhibit _I - Third Amendment to RSA, #12 Exhibit _J - IPR2013-0039, #13 Exhibit _K - E.D. Tex. 14-cv-00625 dckt 000073_000 filed 2014-09-30, #14 Exhibit _L - Asset Purchase Agreement, #15 Exhibit _M - Termination Agreement, #16 Exhibit _N - Payoff and Termination Agreement, #17 Exhibit _O - Patent Assignment, #18 Exhibit _P.1 - Etchegoyen Depo, #19 Exhibit _Q - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple MTD (did not cross the eyes), #20 Exhibit _R - Palmer Declarations, #21 Exhibit _S - _2017-to-Licensing License, #22 Exhibit _T - Amended 2017-to-Licensing License, #23 Exhibit _U - Amended and Restated Note Purchase and Security Agreement, #24 Exhibit _V - Etchegoyen Depo Notice, #25 Exhibit _W - McCallion First MTD Declaration, #26 Exhibit _X - McCallion Deposition - Wave 2, #27 Exhibit _Y - Draining Ticket (Ex. 3 to McCallion Depo), #28 Exhibit _Z - 2019-10-15 McCallion Declaration - Signed, #29 Exhibit AA - ISP Emails, #30 Exhibit BB - MasterMind Charts, #31 Exhibit CC - Arscott Declaration Signed, #32 Exhibit DD - T-Mobile Agreement, #33 Exhibit EE - Sprint Agreement, #34 Exhibit FF - Joshua Cha (megaport) Declaration Signed, #35 Exhibit GG - Signed Krause Declaration Re Express, #36 Text of Proposed Order)(Clutter, Patrick)
October 18, 2019 Filing 96 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Tekell, #2 Declaration of J. Vallery, #3 Declaration of D. Acharya, #4 Declaration of R. Whelan, #5 Exhibit A - 2019.06.28 DN 26-2 Decl of P. Orr, #6 Exhibit B - 2019-10-17 Google LLC's Amended Disclosures, #7 Exhibit C - Lim Declaration, #8 Exhibit D - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0030312 [Drake Turner Depo_1.15.19], #9 Exhibit E - 10-4-19 Etchegoyen deposition, #10 Exhibit F - Turner LinkedIn, #11 Exhibit G - TXED-2-17-cv-00258-104 (excerpted), #12 Exhibit H - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0007333 [Sean Burdick Depo_3.19.19], #13 Exhibit I - Uniloc CP to G 0011376 [2nd Amended & Restated Operating Agrmt of Uniloc 2017 LLC], #14 Exhibit J - Etchegoyen LinkedIn, #15 Exhibit K - SOS search result re Uniloc 2017, #16 Exhibit L - Burdick 258 deposition (excerpted), #17 Exhibit M - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0028669 [11-7-18 Burdick depo], #18 Exhibit N - NDTX - Caddo Mills, #19 Exhibit O - NDTX - White Settlement, #20 Exhibit P - NDTX - Rockwall, #21 Exhibit Q - Uniloc CP to G 0009317 [Amendment No. 1 to License Agmt btw Uniloc 2017 & Uniloc Licensi USA], #22 Exhibit R - Uniloc CP to Google 0009327 [Amendment No. 1 to License Agreement btw Uniloc 2017 & Uniloc USA], #23 Exhibit S - Uniloc Common Production to Google002648 [License Agreement btw Uniloc 2017 & Uniloc Lux], #24 Exhibit T - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0005080 [Drake Turner Depo_10.8.18], #25 Exhibit U - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0010357 [Earnout and Release Agreement], #26 Exhibit V - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0010791 [Employment Agreement], #27 Exhibit W - Meisinger LinkedIn, #28 Exhibit X - Pantros acquisition, #29 Exhibit Y - Fortress location, #30 Exhibit Z - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0010813 [Limited Liability Company Agreement of Uniloc 2017 LLC, #31 zExhibit AA - D. Del. 19-mc-00202 dckt 000001_000 filed 2019-08-14, #32 zExhibit AB - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0009840 [Note Purchase and Security Agreement], #33 zExhibit AC - Uniloc CP to G 0011253 [Third Amd to Revenue Sharing & Note and W PA], #34 zExhibit AD - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0011354, #35 zExhibit AE - Levy -360 deposition (excerpted), #36 zExhibit AF - Turner -360 deposition (excerpted), #37 zExhibit AG - Zur, #38 zExhibit AH - Briger LinkedIn, #39 zExhibit AI - Furstein, #40 zExhibit AJ - Sorkin LinkedIn, #41 zExhibit AK - Johnson LinkedIn, #42 zExhibit AL - Erez Levy LinkedIn Profile, #43 zExhibit AM - Palmer LinkedIn, #44 zExhibit AN - Michele Moreland LinkedIn Profile, #45 zExhibit AO - Shtein, #46 zExhibit AP - Uniloc Common Production to Google002802, #47 zExhibit AQ - Table C-5, #48 zExhibit AR - fcms_na_distprofile0630.2019, #49 zExhibit AS - Tod Turner - Chief Executive Officer - Intercept Music _ LinkedIn, #50 zExhibit AT - Ronald Jacoby - Vice President - Verizon Digital Media Services, #51 zExhibit AU - Hulu - Santa Monica Headquarters - Office Snapshots, #52 zExhibit AV - Amazon Our global offices, #53 zExhibit AW - Microsoft Corporate Address, #54 Text of Proposed Order)(Clutter, Patrick)
October 18, 2019 Filing 95 REDACTION to #94 Sealed Response to Motion, Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit McCallion Declaration, #2 Affidavit Honti Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 17, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 93, SEALED RESPONSE to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 94 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #87 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit McCallion Declaration, #2 Affidavit Honti Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 93 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #87 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit McCallion Declaration, #2 Affidavit Honti Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 10/17/2019 (nkl, ).
October 15, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2019. (nkl, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #90 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/11/2019. (nkl, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #87 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files Responses due by 10/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/10/2019. (nkl, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 90 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Docket Control Order by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Amended Docket Control Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #87 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 88 REDACTION to #87 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redactions to McCallion Transcript)(Loveless, Ryan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 87 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - McCallion Depo Excerpts, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Entry of Modified Scheduling Order Following Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/27/2019. (nkl, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Cannon Shrieves on behalf of Google LLC (Shrieves, Elizabeth)
September 25, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google LLC regarding Compliance with PR 4-2 Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
September 25, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc 2017 LLC Service of P.R. 4-2 Proposed Claim Constructions (Loveless, Ryan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 82 Joint MOTION for Entry of Modified Scheduling Order Following Order on Motion to Compel by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Uniloc's Proposed Modified Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B - Google's Proposed Modified Scheduling Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re #80 Notice (Other) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/18/2019. (nkl, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC re #78 Order on Motion to Compel (Joint Notice by Parties in Response to Order) (Etheridge, James)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #68 Report and Recommendations. Uniloc USA is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/10/2019. (ch, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re #67 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/6/2019. (nkl, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. P.R. 4-1 Proposed Claim Terms for Construction (Loveless, Ryan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 9/5/2019 re #67 Opposed MOTION to Compel filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google LLC PR 4-1 (Jones, Michael)
August 29, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 Opposed MOTION to Compel filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion to Excuse Lead Counsel from September 5, 2019 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Venue Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/29/2019. (nkl, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION to Excuse Lead Counsel from September 5, 2019 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Venue Discovery by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Joseph Drayton, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/26/2019. (nkl, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 70 STATUS REPORT ON MEET AND CONFER OBLIGATIONS RELATING TO DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Etheridge, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 69 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct #62 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Compel, to Modify Scheduling Order by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 68 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #24 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Uniloc USA, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/16/2019. (ch, )
August 16, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #67 Opposed MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 67 Opposed MOTION to Compel by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Request for Venue Discovery, #2 Exhibit B - Google Objections to Venue Document Requests, #3 Exhibit C - Google Responses to 1st Request for Documents, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY granting #64 Joint MOTION for Entry of ESI Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/12/19. (ch, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letters Rogatory) (nkl, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Entry of ESI Discovery Order by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Letters Rogatory cv502, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Entry of a Schedule to Govern Discovery and Briefing Pertaining to Standing and Venue; finding as moot #58 Motion to Compel Additional Disclosures Related to Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/22/2019. (nkl, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE to Motion re #57 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Schedule to Govern Discovery and Briefing Pertaining to Standing and Venue filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Alternate Order)(Etheridge, James)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #54 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 Responses due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/10/2019. (nkl, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re #57 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Schedule to Govern Discovery and Briefing Pertaining to Standing and Venue filed by Google LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/9/2019. (nkl, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION to Compel Additional Disclosures Related to Venue by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - May 28, 2019 Email, #3 Exhibit B - June 12, 2019 Email, #4 Exhibit C - June 27, 2019 Email, #5 Exhibit D - July 3, 2019 Email)(Loveless, Ryan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 57 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Schedule to Govern Discovery and Briefing Pertaining to Standing and Venue by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #54 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 55 REDACTION to #54 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration - A. Tekell, #2 Affidavit Declaration - J. Vallery, #3 Affidavit Declaration - P. Orr - Redacted, #4 Affidavit Declaration - D. Acharya, #5 Affidavit Declaration - R. Whelan, #6 Errata A - TXED-2-17-cv-00258-104 (excerpted), #7 Exhibit B - Burdick 258 deposition (excerpted), #8 Exhibit C - Turner -158 depo (excerpted), #9 Exhibit D - Uniloc v. Apple (-258) - Dkt. 61-2, #10 Exhibit E - Uniloc 2017 Corporate Disclosure, #11 Exhibit F - Etchegoyen LinkedIn, #12 Exhibit G - Texas SoS - Uniloc 2017, #13 Exhibit H - Burdick LinkedIn, #14 Exhibit I - Meisinger LinkedIn, #15 Exhibit J - Turner LinkedIn, #16 Exhibit K - Fortress location, #17 Exhibit L - Uniloc DE Certificate of Formation, #18 Exhibit M - DE Certificate of Formation - CF Uniloc Holdings, #19 Exhibit N - App to Reg of Foreign LLC, #20 Exhibit O - Stmt of Information, #21 Exhibit P - Fortress Agreement, #22 Exhibit Q - Third Amendment Fortress, #23 Exhibit R - Levy -360 deposition (excerpted), #24 Exhibit S - Jacobs - 360 declaration (excerpted), #25 Exhibit T - Turner -360 deposition (excerpted), #26 Exhibit U - CF Uniloc agreement (excerpted), #27 Exhibit V - Order on MTD (-360) (excerpted), #28 Exhibit W - Palmer LinkedIn, #29 Exhibit X - Intentionally Blank., #30 Exhibit Y - Erez Levy LinkedIn Profile, #31 Exhibit Z - Michele Moreland LinkedIn Profil, #32 Exhibit AA - TXWD-1-17-cv-00754-47 (excerpted), #33 Exhibit AB - Uniloc v. RingCentral - Burdick decl, #34 Exhibit AC - Burdick 258 declaration, #35 Exhibit AD: Table C-5, #36 Exhibit AE - fcms_na_distprofile0331.2019 (excerpted), #37 Exhibit AF: TXWD 1-18cv158-159, #38 Exhibit AG: Todd Turner - Chief Executive, #39 Exhibit AH: Netflix Corporate Information, #40 Exhibit AI:Ronald Jacoby - Vice President, #41 Exhibit AJ: Hulu - Santa Monica Headquarters, #42 Exhibit AK: Our global offices, #43 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 54 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Tekell, #2 Declaration of J. Vallery, #3 Declaration of P. Orr, #4 Declaration of D. Acharya, #5 Declaration of R. Whelan, #6 Exhibit A - TXED-2-17-cv-00258-104 (excerpted), #7 Exhibit B - Burdick 258 deposition (excerpted), #8 Exhibit C - Turner -158 depo (excerpted), #9 Exhibit D - Uniloc v. Apple (-258) - Dkt. 61-2, #10 Exhibit E - Uniloc 2017 Corporate Disclosure, #11 Exhibit F - Etchegoyen LinkedIn, #12 Exhibit G - Texas SoS - Uniloc 2017, #13 Exhibit H - Burdick LinkedIn, #14 Exhibit I - Meisinger LinkedIn, #15 Exhibit J - Turner LinkedIn, #16 Exhibit K - Fortress location, #17 Exhibit L - Uniloc DE Certificate of Formation, #18 Exhibit M - DE Certificate of Formation - CF Uniloc Holdings, #19 Exhibit N - App to Reg of Foreign LLC, #20 Exhibit O - Stmt of Information, #21 Exhibit P - Fortress Agreement, #22 Exhibit Q - Third Amendment Fortress, #23 Exhibit R - Levy -360 deposition (excerpted), #24 Exhibit S - Jacobs - 360 declaration (excerpted), #25 Exhibit T - Turner -360 deposition (excerpted), #26 Exhibit U - CF Uniloc agreement (excerpted), #27 Exhibit V - Order on MTD (-360) (excerpted), #28 Exhibit W - Palmer LinkedIn, #29 Exhibit X - Intenionally Blank, #30 Exhibit Y - Erez Levy LinkedIn Profile, #31 Exhibit Z - Michele Moreland LinkedIn Profile, #32 zExhibit AA - TXWD-1-17-cv-00754-47 (excerpted), #33 zExhibit AB - Uniloc v. RingCentral - Burdick decl, #34 zExhibit AC - Burdick 258 declaration, #35 zExhibit AD - Table C-5, #36 zExhibit AE - fcms_na_distprofile0331.2019 (excerpted), #37 zExhibit AF - TXWD-1-18-cv-00158-59 (excerpted), #38 zExhibit AG - Tod Turner - Chief Executive Officer - Intercept Music _ LinkedIn, #39 zExhibit AH - Netflix Corporate Information, #40 zExhibit AI - Ronald Jacoby - Vice President - Verizon Digital Media Services, #41 zExhibit AJ - Hulu - Santa Monica Headquarters - Office Snapshots, #42 zExhibit AK - Our global offices, #43 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of Google LLC (Thames, Earl)
June 19, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Google LLC (Clutter, Patrick)
June 19, 2019 Filing 51 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue Under Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney Email)(Etheridge, James)
June 14, 2019 Filing 50 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #24 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct to Remove Uniloc USA, Inc. as a Party filed by Google LLC. (Jones, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/14/2019. (nkl, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE to #47 Notice (Other) Google's Clarification filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Loveless, Ryan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE by Google LLC re #44 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Disputed) of Clarification (Jones, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. re #44 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Disputed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SOL IP, LLC v. AT&T Mobility, Case No. 2:18-cv-00526-RWS-RSP (E.D. Tex)(May 29, 2019))(Loveless, Ryan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google LLC regarding Compliance with Initial and Additional Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Disputed) by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue Under Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) Sur-replies due by 6/19/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/10/2019. (nkl, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Loveless, Ryan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue Under Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DISCOVERY ORDER granting #37 Motion for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/4/2019. (nkl, )
June 5, 2019 Mediation Completion due by 2/4/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Amended Pleadings due by 10/22/2019. Jury Selection set for 8/17/2020 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Markman Hearing set for 1/7/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Motions in Limine due by 6/22/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/6/2020. (nkl, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #36 Motion for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/4/2019. (nkl, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue Under Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. U- Correspondence with Jim Etheridge, #2 Ex. V-676 Patent)(Jones, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. David Folsom is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/29/2019. (nkl, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 33 REDACTION to #27 Sealed Response to Motion,, by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Loveless, #2 Loveless Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of James Palmer 11/9/2019 - Redacted, #4 Declaration of James Palmer 3/13/2019 - Redacted, #5 Declaration of Drake Turner - Redacted, #6 Turner Exhibit A - Redacted, #7 Turner Exhibit B - Redacted, #8 Turner Exhibit C - Redacted, #9 Turner Exhibit D - Redacted, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
May 29, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 32, RESPONSE in Opposition. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 32 FILED IN ERROR RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue Under Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) Redaction of Version Filed Under Seal filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Loveless, #2 Loveless Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of James Palmer 11/9/2019 - Redacted, #4 Declaration of James Palmer 3/13/2019 - Redacted, #5 Declaration of Drake Turner - Redacted, #6 Turner Exhibit A - Redacted, #7 Turner Exhibit B - Redacted, #8 Turner Exhibit C - Redacted, #9 Turner Exhibit D - Redacted, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan) Modified on 5/29/2019 (nkl, ).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue Under Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) Responses due by 6/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/28/2019. (nkl, )
May 27, 2019 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue Under Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) and Page Limits by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion to File Response Under Seal; granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/24/2019. (nkl, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. OF NO AGREEMENT ON MEDIATOR (Etheridge, James)
May 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 5/20/2019. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
May 20, 2019 Filing 27 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue Under Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Loveless, #2 Loveless Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of James Palmer 11/9/2019, #4 Declaration of James Palmer 3/13/2019, #5 Declaration of Drake Turner, #6 Turner Exhibit A, #7 Turner Exhibit B, #8 Turner Exhibit C, #9 Turner Exhibit D, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to File Response Under Seal by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 24 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Jones, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Priya Balakrishnan Viswanath on behalf of Google LLC (Viswanath, Priya)
May 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue Under Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A- BMC Software v. Cherwell Software, #2 Ex. B Orr Declaration, #3 Ex. C [March 21, 2019] Lim - Uniloc Declaration, #4 Ex. D Fortress Agreement, #5 Ex. E Standing Order_Alsup 2-1-19, #6 Ex. F Turner Deposition, #7 Ex. G Uniloc Summary of Ownership (Dkt 120), #8 Ex. H UNILOC 2017 LLC - DE - Certified Copy, #9 Ex. I FORTRESS CREDIT CO LLC - DE - Certified Copy, #10 Ex. J Foster Declaration (Box Case), #11 Ex. K CF Uniloc agreement, #12 Ex. L 2014 Fortress Credit Patent Security Agreement, #13 Ex. M-Third Amendment Fortress, #14 Ex. N Summary of Uniloc Patent Challeneges, #15 Ex. O McCallion signed declaration, #16 Ex. P Arscott Declaration Signed, #17 Ex. Q Joshua Cha (megaport) Declaration Signed, #18 Ex. R Signed Krause Declaration re Express, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. P.R. 3-1, 3-2 Disclosures (Loveless, Ryan)
May 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rose Sivana Whelan on behalf of Google LLC (Whelan, Rose)
May 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Michael Drayton on behalf of Google LLC (Drayton, Joseph)
April 23, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 5/20/2019 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***Please note that the DATE, TIME and LOCATION have changed for this hearing.***(jml)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/10/2019. (nkl, )
February 26, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google LLC to 5/8/2019. (nkl, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2019. (nkl, )
February 21, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google LLC to 4/23/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
February 21, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google LLC to 4/8/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google LLC.( Jones, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google LLC.( Jones, Michael)
February 21, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 11 and 12, Defendant's Unopposed First and Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google LLC.( Jones, Michael) Modified on 2/21/2019 (nkl, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google LLC.( Jones, Michael) Modified on 2/21/2019 (nkl, ).
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. Google LLC served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Loveless, Ryan)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Richins, Travis)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Huang, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mangrum, Brett)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Loveless, Ryan)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loveless, Ryan)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Google LLC. (nkl, )
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/26/2018. (nkl, )
November 19, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
November 19, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
November 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7029896.), filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8407609, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC et al v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: Travis Lee Richins
Represented By: James L Etheridge
Represented By: Minghui Yang
Represented By: Monica Frances Litle
Represented By: Scott Wayne Breedlove
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Ryan Scott Loveless
Represented By: Brett Aaron Mangrum
Represented By: Jeffrey Huang
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: Joshua James Bennett
Represented By: Linda R Stahl
Represented By: Edgar Leon Carter
Represented By: Bradley David Liddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Lee Richins
Represented By: Ryan Scott Loveless
Represented By: Brett Aaron Mangrum
Represented By: Jeffrey Huang
Represented By: James L Etheridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Scott Woloson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Uniloc Licensing USA LLC
Represented By: James L Etheridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Cannon Shrieves
Represented By: Andrew T. Dufresne
Represented By: Rose Sivana Whelan
Represented By: E. Glenn Thames, Jr.
Represented By: Tracy Ann Stitt
Represented By: Tharan Gregory Lanier
Represented By: Dan L Bagatell
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Represented By: Joseph Michael Drayton
Represented By: Israel Sasha Mayergoyz
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Represented By: Michael Christopher Hendershot
Represented By: Naina Soni
Represented By: Priya Balakrishnan Viswanath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?