KARNS CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Karns City Area School District
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc, John Does 1-100, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Client Services, Altria Group Inc., Juul Labs Inc. and Nu Mark LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05355
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2913: Western District of Pennsylvania, 2:20cv01073RJC, KARNS CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS,, Opened in California Northern District as 20-cv-05355-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 35 cc: JPMDL (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-01073. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 3, 2020 Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California. (jv)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of California. (jv)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jv)
July 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan P. Shuber on behalf of KARNS CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Shuber, Jordan)
July 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald T. Elliott on behalf of KARNS CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Elliott, Ronald)
July 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Breth on behalf of KARNS CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Breth, Thomas)
July 18, 2020 Filing 5 Errata re #1 Complaint, by KARNS CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. Reason for Correction: Corrected Signature Requirements. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (King, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (Details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/17/20. (jg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
July 17, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Mr. King is to resubmit the document using the Errata event with his log-in and password and signature with /s/. ACTION REQUIRED. (jv)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., JOHN DOES 1-100, JUUL LABS, INC., NU MARK LLC, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5769316), filed by KARNS CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KARNS CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu Mark LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karns City Area School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?