Loring et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Charles Loring and Susan Loring
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05370
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: District of New Jersey, 3:20-cv-07722-AET-TJB, Loring et al v. Monsanto Company et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-05370-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 223 cc: JPMDL (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Cases associated: Create association to 3:16-md-02741-VC. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-07722. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-223) transferring case to the USDC for the Northern District of California. (dm )
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summon & Complaint served on Monsanto Company on 7/8/2020, filed by SUSAN LORING, THE ESTATE OF CHARLES LORING. (KIZIS, LYNNE)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONSANTO COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
June 24, 2020 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-50,, MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10986400) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SUSAN LORING, CHARLES LORING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KIZIS, LYNNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loring et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Charles Loring
Represented By: Lynne M. Kizis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Loring
Represented By: Lynne M. Kizis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?