Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company et al v. Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. and Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP
Defendant: Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc., Shahid H. Sheikh and Farhaad Sheikh
Case Number: 3:2020cv05447
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP. Service waived by Shahid H. Sheikh waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP. Service waived by Farhaad Sheikh waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP. Service waived by Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc. waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2020, 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP, Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P... (Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc., Farhaad Sheikh, Shahid H. Sheikh. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Minasyan, Artur) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP, Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company for Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP; Corporate Parent HP Inc. for Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (Hewitt, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc., Farhaad Sheikh, Shahid H. Sheikh ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14782620.). Filed byHewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 8/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company et al v. Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Digital Solutions International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shahid H. Sheikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farhaad Sheikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Represented By: Artur A Minasyan
Represented By: Michael H. Hewitt
Represented By: Richard Joseph Nelson
Represented By: Artur A. Minasyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
Represented By: Artur A Minasyan
Represented By: Michael H. Hewitt
Represented By: Richard Joseph Nelson
Represented By: Artur A. Minasyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP
Represented By: Artur A Minasyan
Represented By: Michael H. Hewitt
Represented By: Richard Joseph Nelson
Represented By: Artur A. Minasyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?