Quackenbush et al v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen, Anne Pellettieri, Marissa Feeney and Caryn Prasse
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd. and Denso International America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05599
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by Marissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 11/11/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 94 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The Settlement Conference set for 11/16/2021 10:00 AM is converted to a Scheduling Conference in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom Meeting. Meeting Access : All counsel may access the meeting information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs under the subheading Join Non-Public Hearings. Or the parties may join using the Zoom Meeting using the following Zoom Meeting ID: 161 664 4640. Passcode: 841312 General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER AS-MODIFIED RE #92 STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Settlement Conference filed by Marissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle L. Manning)(Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 3, 2021 Received one USB drive re #85 . (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 91 ERRATA re #82 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Declaration of Michael P. Gibson in support of Administrative Motion to Seal)(Delgado, William) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd. re #82 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 89 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Declaration of Michael Stapleford re #83 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. Responses due by 11/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Exhibit A (Motion to Exclude Declaration of Michael Stapleford), #2 Proposed Order regarding Motion to Exclude Declaration of Michael Stapleford, #3 Proposed Order and Stipulation regarding Administrative Motion for Leave)(Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 88 Declaration of William A. Delgado in Support of #83 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byAmerican Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #2 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #3 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #4 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #5 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 11 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #7 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #8 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #10 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #11 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of William A. Delgado)(Related document(s) #83 ) (Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 87 Declaration of Michael P. Gibson in Support of #83 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byAmerican Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Michael P. Gibson, #2 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Michael P. Gibson)(Related document(s) #83 ) (Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 86 Declaration of Bruce Strombom in Support of #83 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byAmerican Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Bruce Strombom)(Related document(s) #83 ) (Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 85 Declaration of Jason Arst in Support of #83 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byAmerican Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jason Arst, #2 Manual Filing Notification (Exhibits E - G of Expert Report of Jason Arst))(Related document(s) #83 ) (Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 84 Declaration of Paul Taylor in Support of #83 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed byAmerican Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Paul Taylor)(Related document(s) #83 ) (Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 83 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #68 MOTION to Certify Class ) (REDACTED) filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 82 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael P. Gibson in support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Paul Taylor, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Paul Taylor, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Bruce Strombom, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Bruce Strombom, #9 Redacted Version of Declaration of Michael P. Gibson in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #10 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Michael P. Gibson in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Michael P. Gibson in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Michael P. Gibson in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #13 Redacted Version of Declaration of William A. Delgado, #14 Unredacted Version of Declaration of William A. Delgado, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #18 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #20 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14 to Declaration of William A. Delgado, #22 Redacted Version of Motion to Exclude Declaration of Michael Stapleford, #23 Unredacted Version of Motion to Exclude Declaration of Michael Stapleford)(Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. re #79 Declaration in Support, #67 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE #78 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 79 Declaration of William A. Delgado in Support of #67 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAmerican Honda Motor Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael P. Gibson, #2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #68 MOTION to Certify Class filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Clarifying Briefing Schedule)(Delgado, William) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush re #67 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 76 Declaration in Support of #68 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAnne Pellettieri. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 75 Declaration in Support of #68 MOTION to Certify Class filed byMarissa Feeney. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 74 Declaration Marc I. Godino in Support of #68 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Marissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2021) Modified on 10/4/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2021 Filing 73 Declaration of Marc L. Godino in Support of #68 MOTION to Certify Class filed byMarissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - GPM Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #68 ) (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 72 Declaration of Steven B. Boyles in Support of #68 MOTION to Certify Class filed byMarissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Attachments: #1 A - Expert Report)(Related document(s) #68 ) (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 71 Declaration of Michael Stapleford in Support of #68 MOTION to Certify Class filed byMarissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A [Redacted])(Related document(s) #68 ) (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 70 Declaration of Mark S. Greenstone in Support of #69 Brief filed byMarissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Firm Resume, #2 Ex. B [Redacted], #3 Ex. C [Redacted], #4 Ex. D [Redacted], #5 Ex. E [Redacted], #6 Ex. F [Redacted], #7 Ex. G - Honda-Quackenbush-023460-70, #8 Ex. H - Honda-Quackenbush-023460-70, #9 Ex. I [Redacted], #10 Ex. J [Redacted], #11 Ex. K [Redacted], #12 Ex. L [Redacted], #13 Ex. M [Redacted], #14 Ex. N [Redacted], #15 Ex. O [Redacted], #16 Ex. P [Redacted], #17 Ex. Q [Redacted], #18 Ex. R [Redacted], #19 Ex. S [Redacted], #20 Ex. T [Redacted])(Related document(s) #69 ) (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 69 Brief re #68 MOTION to Certify Class [Redacted] filed byMarissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Marissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/15/2021. Replies due by 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 67 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Marissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle L. Manning, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [Redacted] MPA, #4 [Under Seal] MPA, #5 [Redacted] Declaration of Mark S. Greenstone, #6 [Under Seal] Declaration of Mark S. Greenstone, #7 [Under Seal] Ex. B to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #8 [Under Seal] Ex. C to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #9 [Under Seal] Ex. D to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #10 [Under Seal] Ex. E to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #11 [Under Seal] Ex. F to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #12 [Under Seal] Ex. I to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #13 [Under Seal] Ex. J to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #14 [Under Seal] Ex. K to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #15 [Under Seal] Ex. L to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #16 [Under Seal] Ex. M to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #17 [Under Seal] Ex. N to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #18 [Under Seal] Ex. O to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #19 [Under Seal] Ex. P to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #20 [Under Seal] Ex. Q to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #21 [Under Seal] Ex. R to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #22 [Under Seal] Ex. S to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #23 [Under Seal] Ex. T to Decl. of Mark S. Greenstone, #24 [Redacted] Boyles Expert Report, #25 [Under Seal] Boyles Expert Report, #26 [Redacted] Stapleford Expert Report, #27 [Under Seal] Stapleford Expert Report)(Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan O'Neill (O'Neill, Megan) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 65 CORRECTION OF DOCKET #64 . ORDER RE #61 MOTION TO CONTINUE THE CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 64 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #65 ***
August 10, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Hudecki (Hudecki, Lauren) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ramirez (Ramirez, David) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION to Continue the Class Certification Deadline [Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-3] filed by Marissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark S. Greenstone, #2 Proposed Order)(Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by William Alexander Delgado (Delgado, William) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
July 2, 2021 Filing 59 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 8, 2021, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com, 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #58 Transcript Order, #57 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2021. (Related documents(s) #58 , #57 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
June 28, 2021 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/08/2021 before Judge William Alsup by Marissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen, for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 57 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/08/2021 before Judge William Alsup by American Honda Motor Company, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Schebel, Jodi) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS LETTER REQUESTING COURT TO COMPEL AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.S PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 16, 2021 Filing 55 Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Letter Requesting Court to Compel American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Production of Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by American Honda Motor Company, Inc.. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Discovery Hearing held on 6/8/2021 by AT&T Conference line re #50 Discovery Letter Brief. The Court ordered defendant to produce as many documents as possible by June 30 and to produce the remaining documents by July 16, 2021. The deadline for the motion for class certification is continued to August 26, 2021. Plaintiff may move for additional time to file the motion for class certification for good cause. The parties to submit an agreed-upon form of order. FTR Time: 12:29 - 12:46. Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Greenstone / Marc Gudino. Defendant Attorney: Jodi Schebel / Marion Mauch / Rob Wise. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/8/2021) Modified on 6/21/2021: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jodi Munn Schebel. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jodi Munn Schebel (Filing fee $317, receipt number 0971-16044972) filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING. Discovery Hearing set for 6/8/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 50 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Marissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Requests for Production, #4 Responses to Requests for Production)(Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jason R. Hodge. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 47 STIPULATED Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Marissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 5/17/2021) Modified on 5/18/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jason R. Hodge ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15968607.) filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 45 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Master Class Action Complaint (First Amended Complaint) and Demand for Jury Trial by Honda Motor Company, Ltd. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 4/23/2021) Modified on 4/26/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2021 Filing 44 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant Honda Motor Co., LTD.'s Deadline to Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Honda Motor Company, Ltd. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 105 Transcript of Telephonic Proceedings held on 02/18/2021, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Ana Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, RMR, CRR, telephone number 415-290-1651; email ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #39 Transcript Order ). Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2021. (rjd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021).
March 4, 2021 Filing 43 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Master Class Action Complaint - First Amended Complaint) and Demand for Jury Trial byAmerican Honda Motor Company, Inc.. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 42 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C.Spero. Signed on 2/24/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 11/16/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom Meeting.Meeting Access: All counsel and parties may access the meeting information at #https://www.ca nd.uscourts.gov/jcs under the second subheading +Jon Non-Public Hearings. In addition to following the instructions and link on Judge Speros web page, the parties may join using the following Zoom Meeting ID: 161 664 4690. Password: 841312. Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at JCSSettlement@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 11/9/2021 by 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ .(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Pre-Settlement Scheduling Conference held on 2/24/2021.Settlement Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 10:00 AM. Court to issue Order. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Mark Greenstone, Lionel Glancy Attorney for Defendant: Marion Mauch(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Robert L. Wise. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 18, 2021 before Judge William Alsup by Mary Quackenbush, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Manning, Danielle) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $317, receipt number 0971-15603183). Filing fee previously paid on 02-22-2021 filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Robert L. Wise. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $317, receipt number 0971-15603183) filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 34 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. _Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom Meeting.Meeting Access: All counsel may access the meeting information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs under the second subheading +Join Non-Public Hearings. In addition to following the link on J udge Spero's web page the parties may join the meeting using the following Zoom Meeting ID: 161 664 4640. Passcode: 841312General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 2/18/2021 by AT&T Conference line re #25 MOTION to Strike #20 Amended Complaint and #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint; Statement of Issues to be Decided - Civil L.R. 7-4(a)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities. The Court heard oral arguments. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion to dismiss and motion to strike are DENIED in their entirety. Total Time in Court: 27 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Greenstone / Danielle Manning. Defendant Attorney: Marion Mauch. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Mediation/Settlement. Motion for class certification must be filed by 7/29/2021 to be heard on a 49-day track. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2022 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2021. Discovery due by 12/17/2021. Motions due by 2/17/2022. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/18/2021. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 36 . No written order has been issued.*** ORDER Denying #24 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (whalc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021) Modified on 2/23/2021 (amd2S, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2021 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and the Court's order at #16 , Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2021. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 31 American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s REPLY in Support of (re #25 MOTION to Strike #20 Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen, Anne Pellettieri, Marissa Feeney, and Caryn Prasse's Nationwide Class Allegations; Statement of Issues to be Decided - Civil L.R. 7-4(a)(3); Memorandum) filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 1/19/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2021 Filing 30 American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s REPLY in Support of (re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint; Statement of Issues to be Decided - Civil L.R. 7-4(a)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 1/19/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2021 Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #25 MOTION to Strike #20 Amended Complaint,, Plaintiffs Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen, Anne Pellettieri, Marissa Feeney, and Caryn Prasse's Nationwide Class Allegations; Statement of Issues to be Decided - Civil L.R. 7-4(a)(3); Memorandum o ) filed byMarissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint; Statement of Issues to be Decided - Civil L.R. 7-4(a)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byMarissa Feeney, Anne Pellettieri, Caryn Prasse, Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
December 16, 2020 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The Motion Hearing as to #25 MOTION to Strike #20 Amended Complaint; #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint set for 2/11/2021 is continued to 2/18/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Related documents(s) #25 , #24 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co., Ltd. for American Honda Motor Company, Inc.. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Strike #20 Amended Complaint,, Plaintiffs Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen, Anne Pellettieri, Marissa Feeney, and Caryn Prasse's Nationwide Class Allegations; Statement of Issues to be Decided - Civil L.R. 7-4(a)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 1/5/2021. Replies due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint; Statement of Issues to be Decided - Civil L.R. 7-4(a)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 1/5/2021. Replies due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 12/15/2020) Modified on 12/15/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE #22 STIPULATED REQUEST TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedule Related to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark S. Greenstone)(Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT AND PROTOCOL FOR INTERVIEWING PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/17/2020. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. Filed by Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen, Anne Pellettieri, Marissa Feeney, Caryn Prasse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Mark S. Greenstone Regarding Venue, #2 Exhibit 2 - October 2011 Technical Service Bulletin, #3 Exhibit 3 - October 2012 Technical Service Bulletin, #4 Exhibit 4 - November 2015 ServiceNews Article, #5 Exhibit 5 - February 2016 Technical Service Bulletin, #6 Exhibit 6 - January 2018 ServiceNews Article)(Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 11/13/2020) Modified on 11/16/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2020 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIEID #15 STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS'AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule Related Thereto filed by Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark S. Greenstone)(Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing and Initial Case Management Conference. The Motion Hearings as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint of Plaintiffs Mary Quackenbush and Gheri Suelen; Statement of Issues to be Decided - Civil L.R. 7-4(a)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #13 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Mary Quackenbush and Gheri Suelen's Nationwide Class Allegations; Statement of Issues to be Decided - Civil L.R. 7-4(a)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities set for 11/12/2020 are continued to 12/17/2020 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 is also continued to 12/17/2020 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2020. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #12 , #13 )(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020) Modified on 10/7/2020 (amd2S, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Mary Quackenbush and Gheri Suelen's Nationwide Class Allegations; Statement of Issues to be Decided - Civil L.R. 7-4(a)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/19/2020. Replies due by 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Class ACtion Complaint of Plaintiffs Mary Quackenbush and Gheri Suelen; Statement of Issues to be Decided - Civil L.R. 7-4(a)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/19/2020. Replies due by 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc.. (Mauch, Marion) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Manning, Danielle) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2020 is continued to 11/19/2020 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen.. (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14806266.). Filed byMary Quackenbush, Gheri Suelen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Venue, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service Bulletin, #3 Exhibit 3 - Service Bulletin, #4 Exhibit 4 - Service Bulletin, #5 Exhibit 5 - Service Bulletin, #6 Exhibit 6 - Service Bulletin, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greenstone, Mark) (Filed on 8/12/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quackenbush et al v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Quackenbush
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Danielle Leigh Manning
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Represented By: David Jay Stone
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gheri Suelen
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Danielle Leigh Manning
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Represented By: David Jay Stone
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Pellettieri
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Represented By: Danielle Leigh Manning
Represented By: David Jay Stone
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Feeney
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Represented By: Danielle Leigh Manning
Represented By: David Jay Stone
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caryn Prasse
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Represented By: Danielle Leigh Manning
Represented By: David Jay Stone
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Marion Vincent Mauch
Represented By: David Ramirez-Galvez
Represented By: Erik Paul Mortensen
Represented By: Jason R Hodge
Represented By: Jodi Schebel
Represented By: Jodi Munn Schebel
Represented By: Lauren Hudecki
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Robert Latane Wise
Represented By: William Alexander Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Company, Ltd.
Represented By: David Ramirez-Galvez
Represented By: Erik Paul Mortensen
Represented By: Jason R Hodge
Represented By: Jodi Munn Schebel
Represented By: Lauren Hudecki
Represented By: Marion Vincent Mauch
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Robert Latane Wise
Represented By: William Alexander Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denso International America, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond H Hua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?