Myeress v. Lonely Planet Publications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Defendant: Lonely Planet Publications, Inc. and Booking Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05610
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE on Reassignment and Setting Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 SI Standing Order, #2 All Judges Standing Order) (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joe Myeress.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Booking Holdings, Inc., Lonely Planet Publications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Booking Holdings, Inc.)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/27/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Joe Myeress (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Booking Holdings, Inc., Lonely Planet Publications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14807557.). Filed byJoe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 8/12/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myeress v. Lonely Planet Publications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonely Planet Publications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booking Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?