Young v. Becerra
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 3:2020cv05628
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Huguette Nicole Young (Young, Huguette) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Young, Huguette) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for a speedy hearing under Rule 57 filed by Huguette Nicole Young. Responses due by 10/26/2020. Replies due by 11/2/2020. (Young, Huguette) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra. Filed byHuguette Nicole Young. (Young, Huguette) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION 1. To remove magistrate judge from case entirely; 2) have the DJ render an order on Application to Proceed IFP; and 3) compel the court to honor Rule 5.1(b) of Fed. R. Civ. P. filed by Huguette Nicole Young. Responses due by 9/17/2020. Replies due by 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Young v. Superior Court of CA, Petition for Review, #2 Exhibit Number of Magistrate Judges in the US, #3 Exhibit Dred Scott Fraud, Challenge to 16th Amendment)(Young, Huguette) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 09/01/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Huguette Nicole Young MJ Consent-Declination Form (Young, Huguette) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/11/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended application by no later than 9/21/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Emergency Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. No process. IFPP. Filed by Huguette Nicole Young. Consent/Declination due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?