Hoberg v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Gary W. Hoberg
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05767
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
August 19, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of New York (Foley Square), 1:20-cv-05397-VEC, Hoberg v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-05767-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 227 cc: JPMDL. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. [err401]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: MDL Member Case. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Fi led on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE DISREGARD*** MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of New York (Brooklyn), 1:20-cv-03198-AMD-LB, Moncada v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-05767-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 227 cc: JPMDL (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-05397. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 13, 2020 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/12/2020) (sjo)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Monsanto Company served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by Anthony Dunne - Registered Agent. Document filed by Gary W. Hoberg..(Rheingold, Paul)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rheingold, Paul)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monsanto Company..(jgo)
July 15, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 15, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paul D. Rheingold. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: GARY W HOBERG. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
July 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul D. Rheingold. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code Orange; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Paul D. Rheingold to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monsanto Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by GARY W HOBERG..(Rheingold, Paul)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rheingold, Paul) Modified on 7/15/2020 (jgo).
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20677838)Document filed by GARY W HOBERG..(Rheingold, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoberg v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary W. Hoberg
Represented By: Paul D. Rheingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Represented By: Eric G. Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?