Children's Health Defense v. Facebook Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Children's Health Defense
Defendant: Science Feedback, Poynter Institute, Politifact, Facebook Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg
Case Number: 3:2020cv05787
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Proposed Summons. (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 02:30 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due 11/13/2020.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 5862990The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 5862990The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Politifact without prejudice by Children's Health Defense (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Complaint [Dkt. 1], Complaint Exhibit A [Dkt. 1-1], Civil Cover Sheet [Dkt. 1-2], Proof of Service [Dkt 4], Summons [Dkt. 7], Summons [Dkt 13], Certification of Interested Entities or Persons [Dkt. 2], Order reassigning case [Dkt. 14]; Notice of of Eligibility for Video Recording [Dkt. 14-1], Clerks Notice on Reassignment and Setting Case Management Conference [Dkt. 15]; Judge Illstons Standing Order [Dkt. 15-1]; All Judges Standing Order [Dkt. 15-2] Substituted Service made via Email served on Carol Jean LoCicero, Thomas & LoCicero PL; Mark R. Caramanica, Thomas & LoCicero PL; Kevin Vick, Jassy Vick Carolan LLP, Attorneys for Defendant Poynter Institute on October 7, 2020, filed by Children's Health Defense. (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR RULE 4(F) AND 16(C) ORDERS denying #28 Motion. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by Politifact, Poynter Institute (Vick, Kevin) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Politifact, Poynter Institute (Vick, Kevin) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY (re #28 REQUEST for Rule 4(f) and 16(c) Orders ) filed byChildren's Health Defense. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Goolam Monsoor, #2 Declaration of Roger Teich, #3 Exhibit)(Teich, Roger) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Children's Health Defense re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Complaint, #7 Summons Issued, #4 Certificate of Service, #14 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #13 Summons Issued, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #15 Clerk's Notice, and related documents served on Science Feedback (both English and French translated copies of all documents) (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 REQUEST for Rule 4(f) and 16(c) Orders ) filed byFacebook Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonal Mehta, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Daniela B. Abratt. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Mark R. Caramanica. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Carol Jean LoCicero. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14940385.) filed by Politifact, Poynter Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Abratt, Daniela) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14940370.) filed by Politifact, Poynter Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Caramanica, Mark) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14940348.) filed by Politifact, Poynter Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(LoCicero, Carol) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sonal N. Mehta (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint and related documents served on Mark Zuckerberg on 09-14-2020, filed by Children's Health Defense. (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Allison Schultz. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Molly M. Jennings. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Ari Holtzblatt. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Robert F. Kennedy Jr. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Mary S. Holland. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #24 Stipulation to Enlarge Time. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REQUEST for Rule 4(f) and 16(c) Orders filed by Children's Health Defense. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Teich, Roger) (Filed on 9/10/2020) Modified on 9/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14924310.) filed by Facebook Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schultz, Allison) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14924293.) filed by Facebook Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jennings, Molly) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14924084.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/10/2020 filed by Facebook Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Enlarge Time filed by Facebook Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonal Mehta in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION to Enlarge Time for Defendants to respond to Complaint filed by Facebook Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent and No Publicly Held Corporation Owns 10% or More of Its Stock for Facebook Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Children's Health Defense re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Complaint, #7 Summons Issued, #4 Certificate of Service, 5 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, and other relevant documents on Defendant Poynter Institute on August 19, 2020 (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonal N. Mehta (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Proposed MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert F. Kennedy Jr ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14920425.) filed by Children's Health Defense. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kennedy, Robert) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Proposed MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Mary S. Holland ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14920426.) filed by Children's Health Defense. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing)(Holland, Mary) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Children's Health Defense re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Complaint, #7 Summons Issued, #4 Certificate of Service, 5 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, and other documents as specified. (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE on Reassignment and Setting Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 SI Standing Order, #2 All Judges Standing Order) (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Politifact, Science Feedback. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Children's Health Defense.. (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Children's Health Defense as to Politifact, Science Feedback. (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Re: #8 Proposed Summons filed by Children's Health Defense. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Returned of Service Unexecute d should be efiled prior to issuing a new summons. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Facebook Inc., Politifact, Poynter Institute, Science Feedback, Mark Zuckerberg. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Children's Health Defense re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Children's Health Defense re #1 Complaint, (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for First and Fifth Amendments; Jury Trial Demand against Facebook Inc., Politifact, Poynter Institute, Science Feedback, Mark Zuckerberg (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14825219.). Filed by Children's Health Defense. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for First and Fifth Amendments; Jury Trial Demand against Facebook Inc., Politifact, Poynter Institute, Science Feedback, Mark Zuckerberg (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14825219.). Filed by Children's Health Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Teich, Roger) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Children's Health Defense v. Facebook Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Science Feedback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poynter Institute
Represented By: Daniela B. Abratt
Represented By: Kevin Lester Vick
Represented By: Carol Jean LoCicero
Represented By: Mark Richard Caramanica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Politifact
Represented By: Daniela B. Abratt
Represented By: Kevin Lester Vick
Represented By: Carol Jean LoCicero
Represented By: Mark Richard Caramanica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Molly Maureen Jennings
Represented By: Allison Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Molly Maureen Jennings
Represented By: Allison Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Children's Health Defense
Represented By: Roger Ian Teich
Represented By: Mary Susan Holland
Represented By: Robert Francis Kennedy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?