Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc. v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.
Defendant: Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Payment Corp., Google Commerce Limited, Google LLC and Google Ireland Limited
Interested Party: Mary Carr
Not Classified By Court: Epic Games, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05792
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/8/2020. Status Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:30 a.m. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Rishi Pankaj Satia (Satia, Rishi) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Minna L Naranjo (Naranjo, Minna) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Park Chiu (Chiu, Michelle) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Sujal Shah (Shah, Sujal) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Rocca (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 46 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. The case management conference set for October 8, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by October 6, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09 Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/2/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020) Modified on 10/2/2020 (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2020 Filing 44 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 43 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 42 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. All responses to the complaint, Dkt. No. #1 , are deferred pending further order. The Court sets a status conference for October 8, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom. Instructions will be posted separately. The parties should be prepared to discuss consolidation of the related actions for pretrial and trial purposes. A joint case management statement is due by October 1, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/18/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc. (Amaro, Martin) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Filing Opposition to Google, LLC's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by Mary Carr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mary Carr's Opposition/Response re 56 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #2 Exhibit 1a - Epic v. Google Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1b - Carr v. Google Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1c - Pure Sweat Basketball v. Google Complaint, #5 Exhibit 1d - Order Relating Pure Sweat Basketball v. Google to Epic v. Google, #6 Exhibit 1e - Order Relating Carr v. Google to Epic v. Google, #7 Exhibit 1f - Feitelson v. Google Complaint)(Boyer, Jamie) (Filed on 9/15/2020) Modified on 9/16/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Filing Opposition to Adminstrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related re #35 Notice by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Filing Opposition to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related)(Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 37 STIPULATION For Extension Of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint filed by Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 36 Case Reassigned to Judge James Donato. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE by Google LLC of filing of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14921972.) filed by Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Tom, Willard) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14921953.) filed by Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Taffet, Richard) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/9/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing by Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. re #16 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/4/2020) Modified on 9/8/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2020 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Rishi Pankaj Satia (Satia, Rishi) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Minna L Naranjo (Naranjo, Minna) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Park Chiu (Chiu, Michelle) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Sujal Shah (Shah, Sujal) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Rocca (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14903163.) filed by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Amaro, Martin) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14896774.) filed by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Kelly, Eamon) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14896746.) filed by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Vanek, Joseph) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14892737.) filed by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Slater, Paul) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Cases 20-cv-5671-JD; 19-cv-3074-YGR; 20-5640-YGR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. Google Payment Corp. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. Google LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/20/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert F. Lopez ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14841420.) filed by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steve W. Berman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14841383.) filed by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/20/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc... (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14825922.). Filed byPure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc. v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Represented By: Martin Amaro
Represented By: Eamon Padraic Kelly
Represented By: Joseph M Vanek
Represented By: Paul Ethan Slater
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Payment Corp.
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Richard S. Taffet
Represented By: Willard K Tom
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Commerce Limited
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Richard S. Taffet
Represented By: Willard K Tom
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Ireland Limited
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mary Carr
Represented By: Jamie L Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Riehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?