Washington v. United States of America
Plaintiff: William T. Washington
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv05801
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William T. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William T. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2020: #1 USM-US Attorney, #3 USM-Attorney General) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2020 Service packet placed in "O:SF outgoing file folder" for delivery to U.S. Marshal Service post box in the Clerk's Office mailroom. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding resources available to pro se litigants by Mag. Judge Thomas S. Hixson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William T. Washington. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by William T. Washington. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byWilliam T. Washington. (Related document(s) #1 ) (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America. (IFPP) No Process. Filed byWilliam T. Washington. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Waiver of service)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?