Whitesides et al v. E*Trade Securities, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Cheung, Aziz Si Hadj Mohand and Benjamin Whitesides
Defendant: E*Trade Securities, LLC and E*Trade Futures, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05803
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Or In The Alternative, Motion to Strike; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by ETrade Futures, LLC, ETrade Securities, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 10/28/2020. Replies due by 11/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice with Exhibits, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service)(Garrett, Stacey) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ETrade Futures, LLC, ETrade Securities, LLC (Garrett, Stacey) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by ETrade Futures, LLC, ETrade Securities, LLC (Garrett, Stacey) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ETrade Futures, LLC, ETrade Securities, LLC.. (Garrett, Stacey) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/22/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE re #1 COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO L.R. 6-1. filed by ETrade Futures, LLC, ETrade Securities, LLC. (Garrett, Stacey) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Benjamin Whitesides.. (Fang, Joana) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendants E*Trade Futures, LLC, E*Trade Securities, LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Noyes, Christopher) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract; Breach of the Duty of Good Faith and Fair Dealing; Negligence; Gross Negligence; and Unlawful Competition Law Claim; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14829023). Filed by Aziz Si Hadj Mohand, Benjamin Whitesides, Matthew Cheung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E*Trade Customer Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noyes, Christopher) (Filed on 8/18/2020) Modified on 8/19/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitesides et al v. E*Trade Securities, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Securities, LLC
Represented By: Stacey Myers Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Futures, LLC
Represented By: Stacey Myers Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Cheung
Represented By: Christopher B. Noyes
Represented By: Omar H. Bengali
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Joana Fang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Gatto
Represented By: Steven Mark Buha
Represented By: Robert John Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziz Si Hadj Mohand
Represented By: Christopher B. Noyes
Represented By: Omar H. Bengali
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Joana Fang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Gatto
Represented By: Steven Mark Buha
Represented By: Robert John Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Whitesides
Represented By: Christopher B. Noyes
Represented By: Omar H. Bengali
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Joana Fang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Gatto
Represented By: Steven Mark Buha
Represented By: Robert John Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?