U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust v. Romero
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Defendant: Janeth M. Romero and Janeth Romero Dejesus
Case Number: 3:2020cv05806
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Remand from Alameda County Superior Court. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/18/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Janeth M. Romero. Objections due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/20/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Hixson on 8/18/20. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19028125. ( Filing fee $400 ). Filed byJaneth M. Romero. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust v. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janeth M. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janeth Romero Dejesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Represented By: Donna La Porte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?