Irvin v. Saul
Plaintiff: Konata Irvin
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv05811
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Electronic receipt of acknowledgment of service by e-mail. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Summons and waiver emailed to SSA. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #1 Signed Order) (ahm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Konata Irvin.. (Kitson, Kyle) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Konata Irvin. (Kitson, Kyle) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byKonata Irvin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kitson, Kyle) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irvin v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Konata Irvin
Represented By: Kyle R. Kitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?