Kirkpatrick v. City of Oakland, California
Plaintiff: Anne Kirkpatrick
Defendant: City of Oakland, California
Case Number: 3:2020cv05843
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR RETALIATORY DISCHARGE, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 1102.5, AND VIOLATION OF FEDERAL CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, 42 U.S.C. 1983; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by City of Oakland, California. (Van Dusen, Katharine) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Oakland, California.. (Van Dusen, Katharine) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Donovan Lee Bonner (Bonner, Donovan) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Paul Nabity (Nabity, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine T Van Dusen (Van Dusen, Katharine) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/22/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to File Responsive Pleading filed by City of Oakland, California. (Van Dusen, Katharine) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anne Kirkpatrick.. (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne Kirkpatrick. City of Oakland, California served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant City of Oakland, California. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11 /12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Anne Kirkpatrick (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR RETALIATORY DISCHARGE, CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 1102.5, AND VIOLATION OF FEDERAL CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, 42 U.S.C. 1983; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against City of Oakland, California, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14835321). Filed by Anne Kirkpatrick. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Slaughter, R.) (Filed on 8/19/2020) Modified on 8/20/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkpatrick v. City of Oakland, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland, California
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Nabity
Represented By: Donovan Lee Bonner
Represented By: Katharine T Van Dusen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Kirkpatrick
Represented By: R. James Slaughter
Represented By: John Watkins Keker
Represented By: Nicholas Reiss Green
Represented By: Bryn Anderson Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?