Reingold v. International Business Machines Corporation (IBM)
Plaintiff: Bruce Reingold
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation (IBM)
Case Number: 3:2020cv05850
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/3/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bruce Reingold.. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/20 20. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to International Business Machines Corporation (IBM). (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Business Machines Corporation (IBM) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14836116.). Filed byBruce Reingold. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Choplin Martinotti Depo., #2 Exhibit B - Choplin Betthany Depo., #3 Exhibit C - Choplin Maleki Depo., #4 Exhibit D - Choplin Dorsey Depo., #5 Exhibit E - Moorer Email, #6 Exhibit F - Batthany Email, #7 Exhibit G - Stephenson Martinotti 30b6, #8 Exhibit H - Stephenson Blackwell, #9 Exhibit I - Stephenson Clarke depo, #10 Exhibit J - Stephenson Moorer depo, #11 Exhibit K - Swafford Martinotti 30b6, #12 Exhibit L - Swafford depo briggs, #13 Exhibit M - Swafford Wirtenson Depo, #14 Exhibit N - Swafford Leeke depo, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Straus, Alex) (Filed on 8/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reingold v. International Business Machines Corporation (IBM)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation (IBM)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Reingold
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?