Atanasio v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: John P Atanasio
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05853
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John P Atanasio.. (Biondi, Glen) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/30/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT [LOCAL RULE 3-16; FRCP 7.1] filed by Walmart, Inc. (Anderson, Allan) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF JOHN P. ATANASIOS COMPLAINT filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Anderson, Allan) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer to re #1 Complaint filed by John P Atanasio. (Biondi, Glen) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by John P Atanasio of re #1 Complaint, re #6 Summons Issued (Biondi, Glen) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John P Atanasio.. (Biondi, Glen) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Biondi, Glen) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Biondi, Glen) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) Trademark Infringement (15 U.S.C. Section 1114(1)(A); (2) Common Law Trademark Infringement; (3) False Endorsement Under The Lanham Act (15 U.S.C. Section 1125(A); (4) California Unfair Business Practice; Demand for Jury Trial against Walmart, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14836319). Filed by John P Atanasio. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #(2) Exhibit Exhibit A, #(3) Exhibit Exhibit B, #(4) Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Biondi, Glen) (Filed on 8/19/2020) Modified on 8/20/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atanasio v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Allan E. Anderson
Represented By: Jake Gilbert
Represented By: Elizabeth H. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P Atanasio
Represented By: Glen Joseph Biondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?