Rodriguez v. Saul
Plaintiff: James Molina Rodriguez
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv05855
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Molina Rodriguez.. (Sussman, Rachel) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul.. (Jeong, In Seon) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Remark: Summons, service packet and related documents emailed to SSA. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Molina Rodriguez. (Sussman, Rachel) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA. Filed byJames Molina Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sussman, Rachel) (Filed on 8/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: In Seon Jeong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Molina Rodriguez
Represented By: Rachel Sue Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?