Parus Holdings Inc. v. LG Electronics Inc et al.
Plaintiff: Parus Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. and LG Electronics Inc
Consolidated Defendant: Google LLC, Amazon.com Inc, Samsung Electronics America Inc and Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
Case Number: 3:2020cv05896
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (LG's Notice of Motion and 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) filed by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/29/2020. Replies due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bill Trac in Support of LG's 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Simmons, Luann) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 174 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Adrian Kwan (Kwan, Adrian) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 173 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Adrian Kwan (Kwan, Adrian) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/10/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/8/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 170 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 169 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Parus Holdings, Inc... (Ducker, Philip) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 168 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Parus Holdings, Inc. (Ducker, Philip) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrian Kwan (Kwan, Adrian) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip C. Ducker (Ducker, Philip) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 165 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 164 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/8/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 163 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 162 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-00432. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 20, 2020 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. (am)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING #60 Motion to Transfer Case. It is therefore ORDERED that LGs motion for transfer venue to the Northern District of California is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that LGs above-styled case be TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER RESETTING MARKMAN HEARING TIME, Markman Hearing set for 8/21/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #159 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean M Casey for Parus Holdings Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3)
August 19, 2020 Filing 159 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew H. DeVoogd (Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean M. Casey and Proposed Order) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13877184) by on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. (DeVoogd, Andrew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 158 NOTICE (Defendants' Request for Oral Hearing on their Motion to Stay Pending Transfer) by Google LLC, LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. re #135 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Transfer (Simmons, Luann)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER RESETTING MARKMAN HEARING, Markman Hearing set for 8/21/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #156 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dargaye Churnet for Amazon.Com, Inc. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3)
August 11, 2020 Filing 156 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dargaye Churnet with Proposed Order ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13852374) by on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Churnet, Dargaye)
July 31, 2020 Filing 155 NOTICE of Filing Joint Claim Construction Statement by Apple Inc., Google LLC, LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. and by Parus Holdings Inc. (DeVoogd, Andrew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 154 BRIEF regarding #149 Sealed Document by Parus Holdings Inc.. (DeVoogd, Andrew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 153 BRIEF by Google LLC, LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bill Trac, #2 Exhibit M to the Trac Declaration, #3 Exhibit N to the Trac Declaration)(Simmons, Luann)
July 1, 2020 Filing 152 Confidential Supplemental Declaration of Robert C. McConnell in Further Support of Parus Holdings Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Transfer Venue filed. (Associated Dkt. Nos. #44 , #69 , #70 , #73 , #74 , and #86 . (am) (Main Document 152 replaced on 7/2/2020) (am).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #151 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff Parus Holdings Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's Office is directed to file the Supplemental McConnell Declaration under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 30, 2020 Filing 151 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidential Supplemental Declaration of Robert C. McConnell in Further Support of Parus Holdings Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order) (DeVoogd, Andrew)
June 29, 2020 Filing 150 Parus's Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (am)
June 29, 2020 Filing 149 Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (am)
June 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #148 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff Parus Holdings Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal its Responsive Claim Construction Brief. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's Office is directed to file Parus's Responsive Claim Construction Brief under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #146 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Defendants Responsive Claim Construction Brief. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's Office is directed to file Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief, along with Exhibit 1 thereto, under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 26, 2020 Filing 148 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #2 Proposed Order) (DeVoogd, Andrew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #145 Brief of Benedict Ochiogrosso by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F to Declaration of Benedict Ochiogrosso)(DeVoogd, Andrew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 146 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief - Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order) (Simmons, Luann)
June 26, 2020 Filing 145 BRIEF regarding #131 Brief by Parus Holdings Inc.. (DeVoogd, Andrew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 144 BRIEF regarding #133 Brief,, by Google LLC, LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Luann)
June 23, 2020 Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for proceedings held on 06/02/2020. Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter: Kristie Davis. (Jones, Michael) (Main Document 143 replaced on 6/23/2020) (am).
June 19, 2020 Filing 142 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Google LLC, LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., re #135 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Transfer filed by Consol Defendant Google LLC, Consol Defendant Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Consol Defendant LG Electronics, Inc., Consol Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc., Consol Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Simmons, Luann)
June 15, 2020 Filing 141 Sealed Exhibits 12 to Doc #138 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13) (am)
June 15, 2020 Filing 140 Sealed Documents to Doc. #133 - Unredacted Version of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F to Trac Declaration) (am) (Main Document 140 replaced on 6/15/2020) (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/15/2020) (am). (Main Document 140 replaced on 6/15/2020) (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/15/2020) (am).
June 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #139 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Plaintiff Parus Holdings Inc. has filed an Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits 12 and 13 to the Declaration of Andrew H. DeVoogd in Support of Parus Holdings Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Transfer. Having considered Parus's motion, and good cause having been shown, the Court GRANTS Parus's motion and ORDERS sealed Exhibits 12 and 13 to the DeVoogd Declaration.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #134 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal: (1) an Unredacted Version of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief; and (2) Exhibit F to Trac Declaration. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's Office is directed to file Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief, along with Exhibits 1 and 2 thereto, under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 139 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit B - Exhibit 13, #3 Proposed Order) (DeVoogd, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 138 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #137 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Declaration of Andrew H. DeVoogd in Support of Parus Holdings Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant's Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Transfer) by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 1, #2 Exhibit - 2, #3 Exhibit - 3, #4 Exhibit - 4, #5 Exhibit - 5, #6 Exhibit - 6, #7 Exhibit - 7, #8 Exhibit - 8, #9 Exhibit - 9, #10 Exhibit - 10, #11 Exhibit - 11, #12 Exhibit - 12, #13 Exhibit - 13)(DeVoogd, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 137 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #135 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Transfer filed by Consol Defendant Google LLC, Consol Defendant Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Consol Defendant LG Electronics, Inc., Consol Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc., Consol Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeVoogd, Andrew)
June 7, 2020 Filing 136 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 6-2-20, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/29/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2020, (kd)
June 5, 2020 Filing 135 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Transfer by Google LLC, LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simmons, Luann)
June 5, 2020 Filing 134 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #2 Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Simmons, Luann)
June 5, 2020 Filing 133 BRIEF by Google LLC, LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bill Trac in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Trac Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Trac Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Trac Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Trac Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Trac Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Trac Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Trac Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Trac Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Trac Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Trac Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Trac Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Trac Declaration, #14 Declaration of Padhraic Smyth in Support, #15 Exhibit 1 to Smyth Declaration)(Simmons, Luann)
June 5, 2020 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #131 Brief (Declaration of Benedict Occhiogrosso in Support of Plaintiff's Opening Brief Regarding Claim Construction) by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(DeVoogd, Andrew)
June 5, 2020 Filing 131 BRIEF by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,076,431, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,451,084)(DeVoogd, Andrew)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #129 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefing. The Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that, for purposes of this consolidated action only, the page limits for claim construction briefing are, as follows: thirty (30) pages for each opening claim construction brief; thirty (30) pages for each responsive brief; and fifteen (15) pages for each reply briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 6/2/2020. Case called for discovery hearing. Plaintiff states that the issue is the remote source code review protocol. August 28 is the date that discovery occurs. Due to Covid-19 and rapidly changing procedures the defendant wants to wait until closer to time in order to protect the confidentiality of the material. Defendant suggests that July 31 would be better to wait to see what the situation is like. The Court suggests that if he requires the parties to commence negotiations/discussion no later than July 1 with an update to the Court no later than July 21 so that a hearing can be set no later than the end of July to review any issues. Plaintiff does not feel that this is a good idea as there will probably be contentious negotiations and that the source code would not be available by the due date due to the lead time needed which could be 8 weeks. Based upon defendant's representation that they will have an agreed negotiation. The court reminds parties if there is an issue that won't be able to be resolved and the Court will set a quick telephonic hearing. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(am)
June 1, 2020 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefing by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING, Telephone Conference set for 6/2/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
April 2, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Silverman on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Silverman, Daniel)
April 1, 2020 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bill Trac on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Trac, Bill)
April 1, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Liang on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Liang, Mark)
April 1, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darin W. Snyder on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Snyder, Darin)
April 1, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Luann L. Simmons on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Simmons, Luann)
April 1, 2020 Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David S. Almeling on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Almeling, David)
March 26, 2020 Filing 121 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 3-12-20, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 4/16/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2020, (kd)
March 24, 2020 Filing 120 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada)
March 17, 2020 Filing 119 ANSWER to #113 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Parus Holdings Inc.'s Answer to Samsung Defendants' Counterclaims) by Parus Holdings Inc..(DeVoogd, Andrew)
March 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #116 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
March 13, 2020 Filing 118 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Courtney Herndon on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Courtney Herndon added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (Herndon, Courtney)
March 12, 2020 Filing 117 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Case called for Telephonic Discovery Hearing. The Court reviewed the issues with the plaintiff and defendants counsels. On the first issue the Court asked parties to continue to negotiate option 1B. If can't reach an agreement after negotiations, let Law Clerk know and there can be another telephonic hearing set next week. Plaintiffs then discusses source code. After hearing discussion from both parties regarding Source Code the Court will confer with the Law Clerk and they will be issuing an Order. Parties then discuss paragraph 6C regarding plaintiff bringing their copy of source code to deposition with their notes, etc. The Court will also issue an Order on this issue. Next discussed page limit of printing source code. The 250 number was arbitrary. If plaintiff reasonably needs more pages of source code, then go to the defendant and let them know why. If they do not agree, then bring it back to the Court to make a ruling on. Plaintiff would like deposition source code pages copied and served on them after deposition. Right now defendant has all source code exhibits which may be annotated. The parties had no further issues. An Order will be forthcoming as soon as possible. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(am)
March 12, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ravi Ranganath of Min Wu ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13334426) by on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Ranganath, Ravi)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING, Telephone Conference set for 3/12/2020 04:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING #72 Motion for Discovery. The Court GRANTS Paruss request for venue-related discovery. It is therefore ORDERED that the Parties work together in good faith to determine an expedited schedule for venue-related discovery and to narrow Paruss discovery requests. To the extent the Parties are unable to agree on an expedited schedule and/or to narrow the discovery requests, the Parties are encouraged to contact the Courts law clerk to schedule a telephonic hearing to resolve these issues. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
February 25, 2020 Filing 113 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to Amended Complaint #22 in 6:19cv438), COUNTERCLAIM against Parus Holdings Inc. by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd..(Jones, Michael)
February 25, 2020 Filing 112 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Apple Inc..(Ravel, J.)
February 25, 2020 Filing 111 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc..(Amstutz, Paige)
February 25, 2020 Filing 110 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Google LLC.(Amstutz, Paige)
February 25, 2020 Filing 109 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Amazon.Com, Inc..(Shamilov, Saina)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #53 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendant's motion to dismiss claims of willful infringement, indirect infringement, and injunctive relief. The Court held a hearing on this motion on January 31, 2020. During the hearing, Plaintiff withdrew its request for injunctive relief. For the reasons described during the hearing, the Court GRANTS the motion without prejudice, but Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend its pleadings to reassert these claims after the start of discovery if it is able to substantiate those allegations. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #54 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendant's motion to dismiss claims of willful infringement, indirect infringement, and injunctive relief. The Court held a hearing on this motion on January 31, 2020. During the hearing, Plaintiff withdrew its request for injunctive relief. For the reasons described during the hearing, the Court GRANTS the motion without prejudice, but Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend its pleadings to reassert these claims after the start of discovery if it is able to substantiate those allegations. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #56 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's claim of willful infringement. The Court held a hearing on this motion on January 31, 2020. For the reasons described during the hearing, the Court GRANTS the motion without prejudice, but Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend its pleadings to reassert this claim after the start of discovery if it is able to substantiate that allegation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #35 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendant's motion to dismiss claims of willful infringement, indirect infringement, and injunctive relief. The Court held a hearing on this motion on January 31, 2020. During the hearing, Plaintiff withdrew its request for injunctive relief. For the reasons described during the hearing, the Court GRANTS the motion without prejudice, but Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend its pleadings to reassert these claims after the start of discovery if it is able to substantiate those allegations. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) Modified on 2/21/2020 (lad).
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #52 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendant's motion to dismiss claims of willful infringement, indirect infringement, and injunctive relief. The Court held a hearing on this motion on January 31, 2020. During the hearing, Plaintiff withdrew its request for injunctive relief. For the reasons described during the hearing, the Court GRANTS the motion without prejudice, but Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend its pleadings to reassert these claims after the start of discovery if it is able to substantiate those allegations. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) Modified on 2/21/2020 (lad).
February 20, 2020 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for proceedings held on 1/31/2020. Proceedings Transcribed: Motions Hearing. Court Reporter: Lily I. Reznik. (Jones, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 107 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 31, 2020, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/11/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2020, (lr)
February 14, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Amazon.Com, Inc. answer due 2/25/2020. (am)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #106 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant Amazon's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including February 25, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 14, 2020 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #28 Amended Complaint by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ranganath, Ravi)
February 14, 2020 Reset Answer Deadlines: Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 2/25/2020; Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. answer due 2/25/2020. (bw)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #105 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including February 25, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 14, 2020 Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint for all Defendants by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Amazon.Com, Inc. for proceedings held on 1/31/2020. Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: Lily Reznik. (Ranganath, Ravi)
February 10, 2020 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for proceedings held on 01/31/2020. Proceedings Transcribed: Reporter. Court Reporter: Lily Reznik. (Ducca, Marissa)
February 7, 2020 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Parus Holdings Inc. for proceedings held on 1/31/2020. Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: Lily Reznik. (Ward, T.)
February 3, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew H. DeVoogd on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Andrew H. DeVoogd added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (DeVoogd, Andrew)
January 31, 2020 Filing 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Motion Hearing held on 1/31/2020. Argument regarding pending motions to dismiss from each of the Defendants. The Court heard argument and decided to grant Defendant's motions. Plaintiff may replead the dismissed claims in each case if Plaintiff are able to gather the sufficient facts during fact discovery to support such an allegation. To the extent parties need the Court's intervention on discovery issues related to these claims (or any other issue), the parties are directed to contact the law clerk. Order will be forthcoming. Plaintiff also stated on the record it was withdrawing its claims for injunctive relief. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(am)
January 31, 2020 Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #72 Opposed MOTION for Discovery and Expedited Motion to Authorize Limited Venue Discovery from Google and LGOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Respond to Transfer Motions filed by Plaintiff Parus Holdings Inc. (Everingham, Charles)
January 28, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paige Arnette Amstutz on behalf of Google LLC, LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Amstutz, Paige)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER RESETTING MOTION HEARING, Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2020 09:00 AM in Austin before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
January 28, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Charles Everingham, IV added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (Everingham, Charles)
January 25, 2020 Filing 95 LG's Reply in Support of its Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California. (am)
January 25, 2020 Filing 94 Google LLC's Reply in Support of its Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Supplemental Declaration of Shannon Shaper) (am)
January 25, 2020 Filing 93 Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Opposed Motion to Transfer for Forum Non Conveniens (am)
January 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #90 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's office is directed to file Defendant LG's Reply in Support of its Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #89 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's office is directed to file Defendant Google LLC's Reply in Support of its Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California, as well as the Supplemental Declaration of Shannon Shaper attached as an exhibit thereto, under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #88 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant Apple's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's office is directed to remove Elizabeth Ann Patterson as an attorney representing the Apple in this case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #87 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's Office is hereby directed to file Samsung's Reply in Support of Its Opposed Motion to Transfer for Forum Non Conveniens under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 24, 2020 Filing 92 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Google LLC, LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., re #72 Opposed MOTION for Discovery and Expedited Motion to Authorize Limited Venue Discovery from Google and LGOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Respond to Transfer Motions filed by Plaintiff Parus Holdings Inc. Defendants Google and LG's Opposition to Parus's Motion for Venue Discovery (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bill Trac, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
January 24, 2020 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #90 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document Supplemental Declaration of Hongsun Yoon by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Amstutz, Paige)
January 24, 2020 Filing 90 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document LG's Reply in Support of its Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue) (Amstutz, Paige)
January 24, 2020 Filing 89 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document Defendant Google LLC's Reply in Support of Its Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Sealed Document Declaration) (Amstutz, Paige)
January 24, 2020 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elizabeth Ann Patterson by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rahebi, Bita)
January 24, 2020 Filing 87 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Ex. 1 - Reply ISO MTTV, #2 Proposed Order) (Jones, Michael)
January 21, 2020 Filing 86 Sealed Document filed. (mc5)
January 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #82 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff Parus Holdings Inc.'s ("Parus") Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Samsung Defendants' Opposed Motion to Transfer for Forum Non Conveniens. The Court GRANTS the Motion. It is therefore ORDERED that Parus's Opposition to Samsung Defendants' Opposed Motion to Transfer be filed under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SCHEDULING ORDER: Full day Markman Hearing on 8/21/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 10/2/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2020, Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 4/23/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2021, Predicted Jury Selection/Trial 7/12/2021 7/30/2021. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re #64 Proposed Scheduling Orders, filed by Parus Holdings Inc. The Court ORDERS that the deadline for Defendants to serve their invalidity contentions is March 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
January 17, 2020 Filing 83 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to Response to Opposed Motion to Transfer for Forum Non Conveniens to #82 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Henry, Claire)
January 17, 2020 Filing 82 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Exhibit 1 - Response to Samsung's Motion to Transfer, #2 Proposed Order) (Henry, Claire)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is the Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants Google LLC, LG Electronics Inc., and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (1) to Reply in Support of Their Motions to Transfer Venue and (2) to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion to Authorize Limited Venue Discovery. The Court GRANTS the Motion. It is therefore ORDERED that the following extensions of time are entered: (a) Google's reply brief in support of its motion to transfer venue is due on or before January 24, 2020; (b) LG's reply brief in support of its motion to transfer venue is due on or before January 24, 2020; (c) Google's and LG's opposition to Paruss motion to authorize limited venue discovery is due on or before January 24, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 1) to Reply in Support of Their Motions to Transfer Venue and 2) Oppose Plaintiff's Motion to Authorize Limited Venue Discovery by Google LLC, LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #80 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk's Office is directed to file Plaintiff Parus Holdings Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Transfer (Dkt. No. 69) and Plaintiff Parus Holdings Inc.'s Opposition to LG Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (filed as Dkt. Nos. 70, 73, and 74) under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 13, 2020 Filing 80 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #2 Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #3 Sealed Document Exhibit 3, #4 Sealed Document Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order proposed order) (Henry, Claire)
January 13, 2020 Filing 79 Samsung's Sealed Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ji Soo Yi) (am)
January 13, 2020 Filing 78 Sealed Document filed: Declaration of Robert C. McConnell in Support of Parus Holdings Inc.'s Opposition to the Google and LG Defendants' Motions to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (am) Modified on 1/13/2020 (am).
January 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #76 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendants Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s ("Samsung") Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Samsung's Motion to Transfer and the Declaration of Ji Soo Yi. Because it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's Office is directed to file under seal Samsung's Motion to Transfer and the Declaration of Ji Soo Yi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #71 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff Parus Holdings Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal the Declaration of Robert C. McConnell. The Court has considered this motion. Because it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's Office is directed to file under seal the Declaration of Robert C. McConnell. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #40 Motion for Hearing entered by Judge Alan D Albright. In light of ECF No. 66, the Court moots this motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #67 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The motion is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is directed to terminate Kristina R. Cary from this case, and the original member cases as needed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE Apple's Statement re Pending Transfer Motions by Apple Inc. (Rahebi, Bita)
January 10, 2020 Filing 76 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Motion to Transfer - SEALED, #2 Ex 2 - Yi Declaration - SEALED, #3 Proposed Order) (Jones, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Filing 75 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue for Forum Non Conveniens by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Yi Declaration, #2 PUBLIC - Ducca Decl iso Motion to Transfer, #3 PUBLIC - Ex 1 - 123119 Infringement Contentions, #4 PUBLIC - Ex 2 - 121119 Preliminary Infringement Contentions, #5 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Filing 74 SECOND AMENDED Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #62 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California filed by Consol Defendant LG Electronics, Inc., Consol Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. McNamara, #2 Exhibit A to McNamara Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to McNamara Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to McNamara Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to McNamara Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to McNamara Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to McNamara Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to McNamara Declaration, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire) Modified on 1/13/2020 (am).
January 10, 2020 Filing 73 First Amended Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #62 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California filed by Consol Defendant LG Electronics, Inc., Consol Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. McNamara, #2 A to McNamara Declaration, #3 B to McNamara Declaration, #4 C to McNamara Declaration, #5 D to McNamara Declaration, #6 E to McNamara Declaration, #7 F to McNamara Declaration, #8 G to McNamara Declaration, #9 Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire) Modified on 1/13/2020 (am).
January 10, 2020 Filing 72 Opposed MOTION for Discovery and Expedited Motion to Authorize Limited Venue Discovery from Google and LG, Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Respond to Transfer Motions by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Parus Holdings Inc.'s Interrogatories to Defendant Google LLC Relating to Venue, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff Parus Holdings Inc.'s Interrogatories Relating to Venue to the LG Defendants, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
January 10, 2020 Filing 71 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Confidential Declaration of Robert C. McConnell, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Henry, Claire)
January 10, 2020 Filing 70 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #62 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California filed by Consol Defendant LG Electronics, Inc., Consol Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. McNamara, #2 Exhibit A to McNamara Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to McNamara Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to McNamara Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to McNamara Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to McNamara Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to McNamara Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to McNamara Declaration, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
January 10, 2020 Filing 69 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #60 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California filed by Consol Defendant Google LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. McNamara, #2 Exhibit A to McNamara Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to McNamara Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to McNamara Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to McNamara Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to McNamara Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to McNamara Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to McNamara Declaration, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
January 9, 2020 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Support, filed by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., re #53 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Consol Defendant LG Electronics, Inc., Consol Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc. Defendant LG's Reply in Support of its Renewed Rule 12 (b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims of Willful Infringement, Induced Infringement, and Injunctive Relief (Amstutz, Paige)
January 8, 2020 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Cary, Kristina)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER SETTING MOTION HEARING, Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, on the Sixth Floor, United States Courthouse, 501 West Fifth Street, Austin, TX before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
January 6, 2020 Filing 65 Declaration of Shannon Shaper is attached as an exhibit to Defendant Google LLCs Opposed Motion #60 , under seal. (am) Modified on 1/6/2020 (am).
January 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #61 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court GRANTS the Motion. The Clerk's Office is directed to file the Declaration of Shannon Shaper, which is attached as an exhibit to Defendant Google LLCs Opposed Motion, under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 3, 2020 Filing 64 Proposed Scheduling Order by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B - Email dated December 13, 2019, #3 Exhibit B-1 - attachment to Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C - Email dated December 16, 2019, #5 Exhibit C-1 - attachment to Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D - Email dated December 27, 2019, #7 Exhibit D-1 -, #8 Exhibit E - Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order)(Henry, Claire)
January 3, 2020 Filing 63 ATTACHMENT Supplement to #60 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F-4, #2 Exhibit F-5)(Amstutz, Paige)
January 3, 2020 Filing 62 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
January 3, 2020 Filing 61 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Order) (Amstutz, Paige)
January 3, 2020 Filing 60 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Bill Trac Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Sealed Document Shannon Shaper Declaration in Support (sealed document), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D1, #7 Exhibit D2, #8 Exhibit E1, #9 Exhibit E2, #10 Exhibit E3, #11 Exhibit F1, #12 Exhibit F2, #13 Exhibit F3, #14 Exhibit G1, #15 Exhibit G2, #16 Exhibit H, #17 Exhibit I, #18 Exhibit J, #19 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
January 2, 2020 Filing 59 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #53 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Consol Defendant LG Electronics, Inc., Consol Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Cary, Kristina)
December 31, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Claire Abernathy Henry added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (Henry, Claire)
December 30, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., re #54 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Consol Defendant Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Consol Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
December 24, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., re [27 in consolidated action 6:19cv428] Reurged MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Willful and Indirect Infringement and Request for Injunctive Relief filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Jones, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #42 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Rahebi, Bita)
December 23, 2019 Filing 49 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 12-20-19, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Scheduling Conference Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/13/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2020, (kd)
December 20, 2019 Google LLC, LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Amazon.Com, Inc. added.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate 6:19-cv-00432, 6:19-cv-00433, 6:19-cv-00437, 6:19-cv-00438, and 6:19-cv-00454, where 6:19-cv-00432 is the lead case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
December 20, 2019 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright. Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2019. Case called for Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Parties have agreed upon a full day Markman Hearing on August 21. The Court reviewed his normal Markman Hearing procedures. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(bw)
December 19, 2019 Filing 53 LG's Opposed Renewed Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Willful Infringement, Induced Infringement, and Injunctive Relief by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (mc5)
December 19, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. McNamara on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Michael J. McNamara added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (McNamara, Michael)
December 19, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Renaud on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Michael Renaud added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (Renaud, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Filing 44 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #42 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
December 9, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE - Request for Oral Hearing by Apple Inc. re #42 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case (Rahebi, Bita)
December 9, 2019 Filing 42 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Jaynes, #2 Affidavit of Rose Lee, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Proposed Order)(Rahebi, Bita)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCES, Telephone Conference set for 12/20/2019 10:40 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
December 3, 2019 Filing 54 Samsung's Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Willful and Indirect Infringement and Request for Injunctive Relief by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (mc5)
November 27, 2019 Filing 40 Motion for Hearing - Request for Oral Hearing by Apple Inc. re #35 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss Parus's Claims for Willful Infringement, Indirect Infringement, and Injunctive Relief (Rahebi, Bita) Modified to Motion on 12/2/2019 (lad).
November 26, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #35 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss Parus's Claims for Willful Infringement, Indirect Infringement, and Injunctive Relief filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Ravel, J.)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE, Telephone Conference set for 12/20/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
November 19, 2019 Filing 37 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #35 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss Parus's Claims for Willful Infringement, Indirect Infringement, and Injunctive Relief filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Fair, Andrea)
November 12, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION of Defendant Amazon.com to Dismiss First Amended Complaint For Failure To State a Claim by Amazon.Com, Inc. (mc5)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #34 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. In light of Defendant's corrected filing at ECF No. 35, the Court MOOTS this motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Readiness by Parus Holdings Inc. (Fair, Andrea)
November 5, 2019 Filing 35 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss Parus's Claims for Willful Infringement, Indirect Infringement, and Injunctive Relief by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 52 Defendant Google LLC's Renewed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims of Willful Infringement, Induced Infringement, and Injunctive Relief by Google LLC. (mc5)
November 4, 2019 Filing 34 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Parus's Claims for Willful Infringement, Indirect Infringement, and Injunctive Relief by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristina R. Cary on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc. (Cary, Kristina)
October 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #27 Motion for Hearing entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion for Hearing. Defendant filed a Notice of Withdrawal of its Motion for Hearing. ECF No. 32. Accordingly, the Court moots Defendant's Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #26 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. 28), Defendant filed a Notice of Withdrawal of its Motion to Dismiss. ECF No. 32. Accordingly, the Court moots Defendants's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant may re-file a motion to dismiss in response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Apple Inc. re #27 MOTION for Hearing , #26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Willful Infringement and Indirect Infringement (Rahebi, Bita)
October 24, 2019 Filing 55 Opposed MOTION for Intra-District Transfer To the Austin Division of The Western District of Texas by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tim Thompson, #2 Affidavit Saina S. Shamilov, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Proposed Order)(mc5)
October 23, 2019 Filing 31 ATTACHMENT to #28 Amended Complaint by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,076,431, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,451,084)(Fair, Andrea)
October 22, 2019 Filing 30 Pro Hac Vice Letter. (am)
October 21, 2019 Filing 29 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Willful Infringement and Indirect Infringement filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Fair, Andrea)
October 21, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. amending, filed by Parus Holdings Inc..(Fair, Andrea)
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Hearing by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Willful Infringement and Indirect Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 25 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Ravel, J.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.)
August 22, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Apple Inc. Answer due 10/7/2019. (am)
August 22, 2019 Text Order GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if she has not already done so, shall immediately apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have until October 7, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rahebi, Bita)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Elizabeth Patterson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 600025404. (am)
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Patterson for Apple Inc.. (am)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Matthew C. Callahan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 600025399. (am) (Main Document 19 replaced on 8/16/2019) (am).
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Rose S Lee. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 600025400. (am) (Main Document 18 replaced on 8/16/2019) (am).
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Hector G. Gallegos. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 600025401. (am) (Main Document 17 replaced on 8/16/2019) (am).
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Bita Rahebi. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 600025398. (am) (Main Document 16 replaced on 8/16/2019) (am).
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew C. Callahan for Apple Inc.. (am)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rose S. Lee for Apple Inc.. (am)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hector G. Gallegos for Apple Inc.. (am)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bita Rahebi for Apple Inc.. (am)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parus Holdings Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Fair, Andrea)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear for Tiffany M. Knapp to appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea L. Fair on Behalf of Tiffany M. Knapp ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12393229) by on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (bw)
July 23, 2019 Notice of Correction: Request for Issuance of Summons #5 and #2 were filed with mistakes. Request for Issuance of Summons #6 is the correct document and therefore will be issued. (bw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bw)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L. Fair on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Andrea L. Fair added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (Fair, Andrea)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12377647), filed by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,076,431, #3 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,451,084)(Ward, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parus Holdings Inc. v. LG Electronics Inc et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Hector G. Gallegos
Represented By: J Stephen Ravel
Represented By: Rose S Lee
Represented By: Elizabeth Patterson
Represented By: Bita Rahebi
Represented By: Matthew C. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Mark Liang
Represented By: Luann L. Simmons
Represented By: Stephen Burbank
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Bill Trac
Represented By: Darin W Snyder
Represented By: David S. Almeling
Represented By: Daniel Silverman
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Luann Loraine Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc
Represented By: Mark Liang
Represented By: Luann L. Simmons
Represented By: Stephen Burbank
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Bill Trac
Represented By: Darin W Snyder
Represented By: David S. Almeling
Represented By: Daniel Silverman
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Luann Loraine Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Mark Liang
Represented By: Luann L. Simmons
Represented By: Stephen Burbank
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Bill Trac
Represented By: Darin W Snyder
Represented By: David S. Almeling
Represented By: Daniel Silverman
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Min Wu
Represented By: Dargaye Churnet
Represented By: Saina S. Shamilov
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Represented By: Ravi Ranganath
Represented By: J. David Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Mark Liang
Represented By: Luann L. Simmons
Represented By: Bill Trac
Represented By: Victoria F. Maroulis
Represented By: Darin W Snyder
Represented By: David S. Almeling
Represented By: Daniel Silverman
Represented By: Caleb R. Braley
Represented By: Todd M. Briggs
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Marissa Ducca
Represented By: Michael E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
Represented By: Mark Liang
Represented By: Luann L. Simmons
Represented By: Bill Trac
Represented By: Victoria F. Maroulis
Represented By: Darin W Snyder
Represented By: David S. Almeling
Represented By: Daniel Silverman
Represented By: Caleb R. Braley
Represented By: Todd M. Briggs
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Marissa Ducca
Represented By: Michael E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parus Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea L. Fair
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Tiffany M. Knapp
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Michael Renaud
Represented By: Courtney Herndon
Represented By: T. John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Sean M. Casey
Represented By: Michael J. McNamara
Represented By: Kristina R. Cary
Represented By: Andrew H. DeVoogd
Represented By: Andrew H DeVoogd,
Represented By: Courtney Herndon,
Represented By: Sean Michael Casey,
Represented By: Adrian Kwan
Represented By: Philip C. Ducker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?