Toc Jiatz v. Saul
Plaintiff: Florestina Toc Jiatz
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv05918
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to meet and confer regarding statement(s) of the administrative record. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 5, 2020. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 10/02/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Florestina Toc Jiatz.. (Hart, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO NOTIFY THE COURT IF THEY CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Consent/Declination due by 9/16/2020. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 2, 2020. (Attachments: #1 consent form)(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Marriott, Michael) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 25, 2020 Summons, Complaint and Social Security Procedural Order e-mailed to United States Attorney's Office. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Waiver of Service, Complaint, and Social Security Procedural Order e-mailed to Social Security Administration. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Andrew M. Saul on 8/25/2020. Waiver of Service due by 10/24/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Florestina Toc Jiatz. (Hart, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byFlorestina Toc Jiatz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hart, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toc Jiatz v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Michael Kramer Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florestina Toc Jiatz
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?