Cropsey v. Saul
Plaintiff: Mark O Cropsey
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv06034
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Kim (Kim, Paul) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 09/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark O Cropsey.. (Freinkel, Heather) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/11/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/10/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 28, 2020 Summons and waiver emailed to SSA. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark O Cropsey. (Freinkel, Heather) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byMark O Cropsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freinkel, Heather) (Filed on 8/27/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cropsey v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Patrick William Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark O Cropsey
Represented By: Heather Michele Freinkel
Represented By: Paul Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?