Thompson v. Trump et al
Defendant: Donald Trump, Michael Pompeo, William P. Barr and Chad Wolf
Petitioner: Scott Alexander Thompson
Case Number: 3:2020cv06049
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/3/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Alexander Thompson.. (Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/11/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14872619). Filed byScott Alexander Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Zachary Nightingale, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 8/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Alexander Thompson
Represented By: Zachary Miller Nightingale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?