Comstock v. Juul Labs Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Comstock
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc., Pax Labs Inc, Philip Morris USA Inc, James Monsees, Altria Enterprises LLC, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc, Hoyoung Huh, Adam Bowen, Eliquitech Inc, Riaz Valani, Citgo Petroleum Corporation, Altria Group Inc., Alternative Ingredients Inc, Nicholas Pritzker, Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Ploom Inc., McLane Company, Inc. and Tobacco Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv06170
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients Inc, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Inc., Adam Bowen, Citgo Petroleum Corporation, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Eliquitech Inc, Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc, Philip Morris USA Inc, Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants. Filed byJoshua Comstock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 9/9/2020) Modified on 9/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Re 19-md-2913 WHO. District of South Carolina, 8:20-cv-02779-MDL, Comstock v. Juul Labs Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-06170 WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 38 cc: JPMDL. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 8:20-cv-02779. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred to Northern District of California per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 38. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (alew, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Names and Addresses for Service)(alew, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joshua Comstock.(alew, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9246232.), filed by Joshua Comstock. Service due by 10/27/2020(alew, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/10/2020) (alew, ). Modified on 8/10/2020 to replace with corrected document provided by filing counsel (alew, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comstock v. Juul Labs Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pax Labs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Monsees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyoung Huh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliquitech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riaz Valani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citgo Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Ingredients Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eby-Brown Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ploom Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLane Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobacco Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Comstock
Represented By: John Horton Guerry
Represented By: James Wayne Lampkin, II
Represented By: Jerry Nicholas Theos
Represented By: Joseph Glenn VanZandt
Represented By: Andy D. Birchfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?