Rose Court, LLC v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Appellee: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank NA and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Appellant: Rose Court, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv06213
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The unopposed request to enlarge time, Dkt. No. 6, is granted. Appellant's opening brief is due by December 4, 2020. Appellee's principal and response brief is due by January 8, 2021. Appellant's response and reply brief is due by February 8, 2021. Appellee's reply brief is due by February 22, 2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/27/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Order Enlarging Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief filed by Rose Court, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Woodruff, Kelly) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Robbins Coutts (Coutts, Melissa) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel; [Proposed] Order by Kelly Ann Woodruff (Woodruff, Kelly) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF USBC RECORD ON APPEAL: Bankruptcy Record on Appeal is Available Electronically at https://ecf.canb.uscourts.gov/. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2020: #1 Additional Record on Appeal) (tnS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL & SCHEDULING ORDER. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION from United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-31225 DM 11., Adversary No. 19-03058. File Received. Filed by Rose Court, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Docket Report, #(2) Notice of Appeal & Statement of Election, #(3) Notice of Appeal Documents) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose Court, LLC v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Sunny S. Sarkis
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank NA
Represented By: Sunny S. Sarkis
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Kelly Kaufmann
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rose Court, LLC
Represented By: Vince Duc Nguyen
Represented By: Vinod Nichani
Represented By: Kelly Ann Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?