(HC) Sandoval v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Julio Sandoval
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 3:2020cv06371
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: PSLC LLH
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/23/2020. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re new case number in this Court. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01224. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 1, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Julio Sandoval. (Jessen, A)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/1/2020. (Jessen, A)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Julio Sandoval. (Jessen, A)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Julio Sandoval. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Sandoval v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julio Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?