Hollman v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC et al
Plaintiff: Ruth Hollman
Defendant: Lupin Ltd., Endo international PLC., Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories LTD, Mallinckrodt PLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Holdings USA, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Lupin Inc., Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc, Wockhardt USA LLC, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,, Wockhardt LTD and Mallinckrodt LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv06491
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Of Defendants WOCKHARDT LTD.; MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC,; WOCKHARDT USA LLC; MALLINCKRODT PLC; AND MALLINCKRODT LLC ONLY by Ruth Hollman (Lee, Cory) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 24 Copy of docket sheet and Notice of Related Action to MDL Panel (MDL 2966). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 23 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 15, 2020, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (82 in 3:20-cv-04056-VC) Transcript Order, (81 in 3:20-cv-04056-VC) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 22 Case reassigned toJudge Vince Chhabria. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE MOTION TO RELATE, MOTION TO TRANSFER, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, AND CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/16/2020. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 20 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Mallinckrodt LLC, and Mallinckrodt plc by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #11 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDINGDEFENDANTS RESPONSE DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/8/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kathryn J. Mims ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15040380.) filed by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jack E. Pace ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15040324.) filed by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Burke (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC for Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. and Local Rule 3-15 Certification (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS RESPONSE DEADLINES filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/7/2020) Modified on 10/8/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ruth Hollman.. (Lee, Cory) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2020 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo international PLC., Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc, MALLINCKRODT LLC., Mallinckrodt PLC, Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,, ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC., Ranbaxy Laboratories LTD, Sun Pharmaceutical Holdings USA, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Watson Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Wockhardt LTD, Wockhardt USA LLC. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Ruth Hollman Amended. (Lee, Cory) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lee, Cory) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14948468.). Filed byRuth Hollman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet: Refiled at Doc #3 )(Lee, Cory) (Filed on 9/16/2020) Modified on 9/18/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollman v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo international PLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranbaxy Laboratories LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Holdings USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurohealth (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Kathryn J. Mims
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Kathryn J. Mims
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Kathryn J. Mims
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Kathryn J. Mims
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Hollman
Represented By: Cory Gavin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?