Goodrich v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Sandra Goodrich
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv06500
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Southern District of Ohio, 2:20-cv-04558, Goodrich v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 20-cv-6500 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 233 cc: JPMDL (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Cases associated: Create association to 3:16-md-02741-VC. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04558. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 15, 2020 Case transferred to District of California Northern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-233): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is to be transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 9/14/2020; certified by CAND on 9/14/2020. (er)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-233): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the USDC for the Northern District of California. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 9/14/2020. (er)
September 10, 2020 NOTICE: The Initial Conference set for 9/16/2020 is VACATED (ECF No. #5 ). (agm)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 9/16/2020 03:00 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed in Franklin County Common Pleas Court by Sandra Goodrich against Monsanto Company (kk2)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Monsanto Company. (Dennis, Madeline)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Defendant Monsanto Company. (Dennis, Madeline) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (kk2)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas, case number 20CV-07-004977 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7637749), filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Franklin County Common Pleas Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Franklin County Probate Court Filings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Dennis, Madeline) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodrich v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Goodrich
Represented By: George Demetrios Jonson
Represented By: Matthew E Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Represented By: Madeline B. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?