Melton v. Regional Center of the East Bay, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Selena Melton
Defendant: California Department of Developmental Services (DDS), Arlene's Residential Care #3 and Regional Center of the East Bay, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv06613
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia R. Jackson (Jackson, Julia) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION Continuing the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading filed by Arlene's Residential Care #3. (Mintz, Kevin) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Selena Melton. Arlene's Residential Care #3 served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Gettleman, Deborah) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/20/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Selena Melton. Regional Center of the East Bay, Inc. served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. #11 Stip to Extend Resp Due November 20, 2020 (Gettleman, Deborah) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Selena Melton. California Department of Developmental Services (DDS) served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. #12 Stip to Extend Resp Due November 25, 2020 (Gettleman, Deborah) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION Continuing the Deadline for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading filed by California Department of Developmental Services (DDS). (Jackson, Julia) (Filed on 11/4/2020) Modified on 11/9/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE filed by Regional Center of the East Bay, Inc.. (Lawrence, Cynthia) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Selena Melton identifying Other Affiliate Beverley Cannon Mosier for Selena Melton. as her Guardian ad Litem (Gettleman, Deborah) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Selena Melton.. (Gettleman, Deborah) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/23/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendants Arlene's Residential Care #3, California Department of Developmental Services (DDS), Regional Center of the East Bay, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #2 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Gettleman, Deborah) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Selena Melton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah Gettleman In Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Verification and Consent of Nominee)(Gettleman, Deborah) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES: The Americans with Disabilities Act Title II, 42 U.S.C. 12131 et seq.; Section 504 of the Rehabilitation Act of 1973, 29 U.S.C. 794 et seq.; The Americans with Disabilities Act Title III, 42 U.S.C. 12182 et seq.; The Fair Housing Act, 42 U.S.C. 3601 et seq.; California Government Code 11135; Unruh Civil Rights Act, Cal. Civil Code 51 et seq.; California Disabled Persons Act, Cal. Civil Code 54 et seq.; Neglect and Abuse Under the Elder Abuse & Dependent Adult Civil Protection Act, Welf. & Inst. Code 15610.17 and 15657 et seq.; Negligence, and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14967759). Filed by Selena Melton. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Gettleman, Deborah) (Filed on 9/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melton v. Regional Center of the East Bay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Developmental Services (DDS)
Represented By: Julia R. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene's Residential Care #3
Represented By: Kevin Randall Mintz
Represented By: Julia R. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Center of the East Bay, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Gill Lawrence
Represented By: Julia R. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Melton
Represented By: Deborah Darrow Gettleman
Represented By: Celia Louise McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?