Tsantes v. BioMarin Pharmaceutical Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bill Tsantes
Defendant: BioMarin Pharmaceutical Inc., Brian R. Mueller, Henry J. Fuchs and Jean-Jacques Bienaime
Case Number: 3:2020cv06719
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy A. Lieberman. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Hood, II. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO VACATE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RESET ALL RELATEDDEADLINES AND EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Judge William H. Orrick granting #15 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Dwyer (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference and Reset All Related Deadlines and Extend Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Jean-Jacques Bienaime, BioMarin Pharmaceutical Inc., Henry J. Fuchs, Brian R. Mueller. (Santamaria, Jessica) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Addison Mills Litton (Litton, Addison) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jean-Jacques Bienaime, BioMarin Pharmaceutical Inc., Henry J. Fuchs, Brian R. Mueller identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc., Other Affiliate PRIMECAP Management Company, Other Affiliate Capital Research Global Investors, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate AMCAP Fund for BioMarin Pharmaceutical Inc.. and FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Santamaria, Jessica) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria (Santamaria, Jessica) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bill Tsantes. Service waived by Brian R. Mueller waiver sent on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bill Tsantes. Service waived by Henry J. Fuchs waiver sent on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bill Tsantes. Service waived by Jean-Jacques Bienaime waiver sent on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bill Tsantes. Service waived by BioMarin Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15039226.) filed by Bill Tsantes. (Hood, J) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15039090.) filed by Bill Tsantes. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jean-Jacques Bienaime, BioMarin Pharmaceutical Inc., Henry J. Fuchs, Brian R. Mueller. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jean-Jacques Bienaime, BioMarin Pharmaceutical Inc., Henry J. Fuchs, Brian R. Mueller ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14987615.). Filed byBill Tsantes. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Schedule A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/25/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsantes v. BioMarin Pharmaceutical Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioMarin Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Addison Mills Litton
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian R. Mueller
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Addison Mills Litton
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry J. Fuchs
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Addison Mills Litton
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Jacques Bienaime
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Addison Mills Litton
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Tsantes
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?