FWK Holdings, LLC v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: FWK Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC, E.R. Squibb & Sons, LLC and Gilead Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv06793
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Appointing Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel for the Direct-Purchaser Class. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/23/2020. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 447 in case 3:19-cv-02573-EMC Plaintiffs FWK and KPH's Motion for Appointment of Counsel and for Entry of Prior Orders. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING CASE. Related to 3:19-2573-EMC, Staley et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/6/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #7 Michael L. Roberts Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #6 Dianne M. Nast's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Case division and case location information are incorrect. The correct information is Oakland Division and the case number should be 4:20-cv-6793 DMR and should be corrected on all future filings. Re: #7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice [Michael L. Roberts] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15016435.) filed by FWK Holdings, LLC, #6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice [Dianne M. Nast] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15016400.) filed by FWK Holdings, LLC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice [Michael L. Roberts] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15016435.) filed by FWK Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice [Dianne M. Nast] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15016400.) filed by FWK Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, E.R. Squibb & Sons, LLC, Gilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Patrick B. Clayton. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Complaint filed by F WK Holdings, LLC). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. Please re-file the SUMMONS ONLY in its entirety. Re:[1-2] Summons filed by FWK Holdings, LLC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/13/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-15001748). Filed by F WK Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet, #(2) Summons)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/29/2020) Modified on 9/30/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FWK Holdings, LLC v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences Ireland UC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.R. Squibb & Sons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FWK Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Francis Onofrei Scarpulla
Represented By: Patrick Bradford Clayton
Represented By: Michael L. Roberts
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?