Graham et al v. Noom, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Audra Graham and Stacy Moise
Defendant: Noom, Inc. and FullStory, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv06903
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FullStory, Inc... (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #22 Stipulation to Set Deadlines for Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Complaint and to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Parties must notice their motions for hearing not less than 35 days from filing. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 1/14/2021 is reset to 3/4/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SET DEADLINES FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #13 , [13-1] filed by FullStory, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Emily Johnson Henn)(Henn, Emily) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 12/31/2020 is reset to 1/14/2021 at 9:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2021. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant FullStory, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/2/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Christopher Wong (Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Noom, Inc. (Wood, Charles) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Noom, Inc... (Wood, Charles) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Wood (Wood, Charles) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Aarti G. Reddy (Reddy, Aarti) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to set deadlines for briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Complaint and to continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by FullStory, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Of Emily Johnson Henn)(Henn, Emily) (Filed on 10/26/2020) Modified on 10/26/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by FullStory, Inc. (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R. Carey (Carey, Patrick) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon J. Frankel (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Johnson Henn (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audra Graham, Stacy Moise. FullStory, Inc. served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audra Graham, Stacy Moise. Noom, Inc. served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Audra Graham, Stacy Moise.. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendants FullStory, Inc., Noom, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/31/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/16/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against FullStory, Inc., Noom, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-15018971). Filed by Audra Graham, Stacy Moise. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Joel) (Filed on 10/2/2020) Modified on 10/5/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham et al v. Noom, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noom, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A. Wood
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Aarti G. Reddy
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FullStory, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel
Represented By: Patrick R. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Graham
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: L. Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Moise
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: L. Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?