Federal Trade Commission v. Disruption Theory LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Marc Grisham individually and as Manager of Disruption Theory LLC doing business as inmatecall.com doing business as inmatecallsolutions.com also known as Mark Grisham, Courtney Grisham individually and as President, Director, and Ultimate Beneficial Owner of Disruption Theory LLC doing business as inmatecall.com doing business as inmatecallsolutions.com also known as Courtney Brooks, Disruption Theory LLC a limited liability company doing business as inmatecall.com doing business as inmatecallsolutions.com, Mark Grisham, Emergent Technologies LLC a limited liability company doing business as inmatecall.com doing business as inmatecallsolutions.com and Courtney Brooks
Case Number: 3:2020cv06919
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Trade Commission re #11 Notice (Other) (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #1 Redacted Certificate of Service) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND EXPIRATION OF TEMPORARY SEAL by Federal Trade Commission. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Emailed copy of #9 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 4 Motion for EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITH ASSET FREEZE AND OTHE EQUITABLE RELIEF, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE, to N. Diana Chang, Emily Burton, and Sarah Schroeder on 10/6/2020. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #4 Motion for EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITH ASSET FREEZE AND OTHE EQUITABLE RELIEF, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Mailed copies of #7 Summons Issued and #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order to N. Diana Chang. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Disruption Theory LLC, Emergent Technologies LLC, Courtney Grisham, Marc Grisham. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #1 Redacted summons) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #5 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Temporarily Seal the Entire Case File. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Temporarily Seal the Entire Case File, filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support, #2 Proposed Order)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 EX PARTE MOTION FOR for Temporary Restraining Order with Asset Freeze and Other Equitable Relieve, and Order to Show Cause by a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Appendix of Exhibits in Support, #5 Appendix volume 2, #6 Appendix volume 3, #7 Notice of manual filing)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Chang, Emily Cope Burton, and Sarah Schroeder for Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Burton, #2 Schroeder)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Emergent, #2 Grisham, M., #3 Grisham, C.)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #4 Grisham, M. - Redacted, #5 Grisham, C - Redacted) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. No fee due. Filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Disruption Theory LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Grisham individually and as Manager of Disruption Theory LLC doing business as inmatecall.com doing business as inmatecallsolutions.com also known as Mark Grisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Grisham individually and as President, Director, and Ultimate Beneficial Owner of Disruption Theory LLC doing business as inmatecall.com doing business as inmatecallsolutions.com also known as Courtney Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disruption Theory LLC a limited liability company doing business as inmatecall.com doing business as inmatecallsolutions.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Grisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergent Technologies LLC a limited liability company doing business as inmatecall.com doing business as inmatecallsolutions.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Nair Diana Chang
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Schroeder
Represented By: Emily Cope Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?